Hardin v. Vdex Diabetes Holdings, Inc.
Plaintiff: Sarah Hardin
Defendant: Vdex Diabetes Holdings, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv00908
Filed: September 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Carmen E Garza
Referring Judge: Kea W Riggs
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza granting #15 Motion to Extend. (ke)
November 3, 2021 Filing 15 Joint MOTION to Extend (other) Deadline Under Local Rule 26.6 by Vdex Diabetes Holdings, Inc.. (Gonzalez, Jose)
October 25, 2021 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sarah Hardin of Plaintiff's Second Set of Discovery (Furth, Ben)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Setting Telephonic Status Conference for 1/4/2022 at 11:00 AM before Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. [Parties shall call Judge Garza's AT&T Teleconference line at (877) 810-9415, follow the prompts, and enter access code 7467959, to be connected to the proceedings.] (ke)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. Discovery due by 5/19/2022. Pretrial Motions due by 6/20/2022. (ke)
October 21, 2021 Filing 11 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza: Scheduling Conference held on 10/21/2021. (ke)
October 20, 2021 Filing 10 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to United States District Judge Kea W. Riggs as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
October 18, 2021 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Vdex Diabetes Holdings, Inc. (Gonzalez, Jose)
October 15, 2021 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sarah Hardin of Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures (Furth, Ben)
October 12, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF CONSENT SUBMISSION DEADLINE: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2), the parties are reminded that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are advised that this matter will be reassigned to a district judge as the trial judge if written consents from all parties have not been filed by October 19, 2021. The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. (gbg)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
October 12, 2021 Filing 6 Joint Status Report by Sarah Hardin (Furth, Ben)
September 24, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to #3 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Counterclaim by Sarah Hardin.(Furth, Ben)
September 17, 2021 Filing 4 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. Joint Status Report is due by 10/14/2021. A Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 10/21/2021 at 10:30 AM before Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. [Parties shall call Judge Garza's AT&T Teleconference line at (877) 810-9415, follow the prompts, and enter access code 7467959, to be connected to the proceedings.] Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 10/8/2021. (ke)
September 17, 2021 Filing 3 Original ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) First Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Sarah Hardin by Vdex Diabetes Holdings, Inc.. (Gonzalez, Jose)
September 16, 2021 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp)
September 16, 2021 United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt and United States Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza assigned. (arp)
September 15, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Third Judicial District Court, case number D-307-CV-2021-01295. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (settlement demand), #2 Exhibit B (declaration), #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Appendix State court docs part 1, #5 Appendix State court docs part 2, #6 Appendix State court docs part 3)(Gonzalez, Jose)
September 15, 2021 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-7893222 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Vdex Diabetes Holdings, Inc. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Gonzalez, Jose)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hardin v. Vdex Diabetes Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Hardin
Represented By: Ben Stearman Furth
Represented By: Paul Darby Hibner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vdex Diabetes Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Jose A Gonzalez
Represented By: Clara B Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?