Belgravia Hartford Capital Inc. et al v. Polynatura Corp
Plaintiff: Belgravia Hartford Capital Inc., Belgravia Hartford Gold Assets Corp, IC Potash Corp and Intercontinental Potash Corp
Defendant: Polynatura Corp
Case Number: 2:2021cv00918
Filed: September 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Carmen E Garza
Referring Judge: Gregory B Wormuth
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2021 Filing 23 REFUSAL TO CONSENT to Proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge (Draper, Matthew)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
November 16, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE of Redacted Complaint by Belgravia Hartford Capital Inc., Belgravia Hartford Gold Assets Corp re 19 Amended Complaint Redacted Copy of Complaint (Kanan, Stephanie) Modified text on 11/17/2021 (vh).
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza granting #20 Motion to Seal. (ke)
November 12, 2021 Filing 20 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Amended Complaint and Jury Demand by Belgravia Hartford Capital Inc., Belgravia Hartford Gold Assets Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Amended Complaint and Jury Demand_Redacted, #2 Exhibit B - Royalty Agreement, #3 Proposed Order) (Kanan, Stephanie)
November 1, 2021 Filing 18 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. Joint Status Report is due by 12/7/2021. A Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 12/14/2021 at 11:00 AM before Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. [Parties shall call Judge Garza's AT&T Teleconference line at (877) 810-9415, follow the prompts, and enter access code 7467959, to be connected to the proceedings.] Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 11/22/2021. (ke)
October 29, 2021 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Polynatura Corp (Draper, Matthew)
October 29, 2021 Filing 16 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Polynatura Corp. (Draper, Matthew)
October 29, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE by Polynatura Corp re 13 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, 14 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, Certification of Good Standing (Draper, Matthew)
October 28, 2021 Filing 14 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendant Polynatura Corp by Matthew Draper on behalf of: Marcel Engholm Cardoso Chaffetz Lindsey LLP 1700 Broadway 33rd FlNew York, NY 10019 646 685 4792 m.engholm@chaffetzlindsey.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Draper, Matthew)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
October 28, 2021 Filing 13 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendant Polynatura Corp by Matthew Draper on behalf of: Peter Chaffetz Chaffetz Lindsey LLP 1700 Broadway, 33rd FlNew York, NY 10019 212 257 6961 Peter.Chaffetz@chaffetzlindsey.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Draper, Matthew)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
October 28, 2021 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7965874 re: # 13 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Polynatura Corp (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Draper, Matthew)
October 28, 2021 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7965876 re: # 14 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Polynatura Corp (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Draper, Matthew)
October 7, 2021 Filing 12 STIPULATION re #10 Affidavit of Service By Parties to Extend Time For Defendant to Answer, Move, or Respond to Complaint by Polynatura Corp (Draper, Matthew)
October 7, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Draper on behalf of Polynatura Corp (Draper, Matthew)
September 27, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Belgravia Hartford Capital Inc., Belgravia Hartford Gold Assets Corp. Polynatura Corp served on 9/23/2021, answer due 10/14/2021. (Kanan, Stephanie) Modified text as per Attorney Stephanie Kanan on 9/28/2021 (nr).
September 27, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE by Belgravia Hartford Capital Inc., Belgravia Hartford Gold Assets Corp re 1 Complaint Redacted Copy of Complaint (Kanan, Stephanie)
September 24, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Byeongsook Seo on behalf of Belgravia Hartford Capital Inc., Belgravia Hartford Gold Assets Corp (Seo, Byeongsook)
September 24, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Ciera Gonzalez on behalf of Belgravia Hartford Capital Inc., Belgravia Hartford Gold Assets Corp (Gonzalez, Ciera)
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza granting #2 Motion to Seal. (ke)
September 21, 2021 Summons Issued as to Polynatura Corp. (arp)
September 20, 2021 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Belgravia Hartford Gold Assets Corp identifying Corporate Parent Belgravia Hartford Capital Inc. for Belgravia Hartford Gold Assets Corp. (Kanan, Stephanie)
September 20, 2021 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Belgravia Hartford Capital Inc. (Kanan, Stephanie)
September 20, 2021 Filing 3 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp)
September 20, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to Seal Complaint and Jury Demand by Belgravia Hartford Capital Inc., Belgravia Hartford Gold Assets Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - redacted Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Royalty Agreement) (Kanan, Stephanie)
September 20, 2021 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-7899383 re 1 Complaint filed by Belgravia Hartford Gold Assets Corp, Belgravia Hartford Capital Inc. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Kanan, Stephanie)
September 20, 2021 United States Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth and United States Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza assigned. (arp)
September 20, 2021 Office code correction. Case office code has been changed from 1 (Albuquerque) to 2 (Las Cruces). (arp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Belgravia Hartford Capital Inc. et al v. Polynatura Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Belgravia Hartford Capital Inc.
Represented By: Byeongsook Seo
Represented By: Ciera Gonzalez
Represented By: Stephanie Kanan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Belgravia Hartford Gold Assets Corp
Represented By: Byeongsook Seo
Represented By: Ciera Gonzalez
Represented By: Stephanie Kanan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IC Potash Corp
Represented By: Byeongsook Seo
Represented By: Ciera Gonzalez
Represented By: Stephanie Kanan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Intercontinental Potash Corp
Represented By: Byeongsook Seo
Represented By: Ciera Gonzalez
Represented By: Stephanie Kanan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Polynatura Corp
Represented By: Matthew Draper
Represented By: Marcel Engholm
Represented By: Peter Chaffetz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?