Ellis v. State of New Meixico
Petitioner: Johnny Ellis
Respondent: State of New Meixico
Case Number: 2:2021cv00947
Filed: September 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Kea W Riggs
Referring Judge: Jerry H Ritter
2 Judge: Margaret I Strickland
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2021 Filing 6 AMENDED PETITION UNDER 28:2254 re #1 Petition for 2254 Relief by Johnny Ellis (bc)
November 5, 2021 Filing 5 Filing Fee: $ 5.00, receipt number ALB051186 (snw)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
October 28, 2021 Filing 4 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to District Judge Margaret I. Strickland as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. District Judge Kea W. Riggs no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (meq)
October 21, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Inmate Account by Johnny Ellis (bap)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER to Cure Deficiencies by Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter. Petitioner is ordered to cure the deficiencies within thirty (30) days of entry of this Order. (cd)
September 28, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION Under 28 U.S.C. 2254 for a Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Johnny Ellis. (dr)
September 28, 2021 United States District Judge Kea W. Riggs and United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter assigned. (dr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ellis v. State of New Meixico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Johnny Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State of New Meixico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?