Navarro v. Bilano et al
Plaintiff: Jessica Navarro
Defendant: Henry Pete Bilano, Cretic Energy Services, L.L.C. and Forbes Energy Services, LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv01002
Filed: October 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Gregory J Fouratt
Referring Judge: Stephan M Vidmar
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Forbes Energy Services, LLC. Related document: #5 Amended Complaint filed by Jessica Navarro.(Kugler, Aaron)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT OF JESSICA NAVARRO against All Defendants., filed by Jessica Navarro. (Hutcheson, Erik)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Forbes Energy Services, LLC, Improperly Named as Cretic Energy Services, LLC's ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Cretic Energy Services, L.L.C.. (Kugler, Aaron)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Erik Hutcheson on behalf of Jessica Navarro (Hutcheson, Erik)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Forbes Energy Services, LLC ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Forbes Energy Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kugler, Aaron)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-7941762 re #1 Notice of Removal filed by Forbes Energy Services, LLC (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Kugler, Aaron)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar and United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt assigned. (arp)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Office code correction. Case office code has been changed from 1 (Albuquerque) to 2 (Las Cruces). (arp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Navarro v. Bilano et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Navarro
Represented By: Erik Hutcheson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Pete Bilano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cretic Energy Services, L.L.C.
Represented By: Aaron Randall Kugler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forbes Energy Services, LLC
Represented By: Aaron Randall Kugler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?