Hart v. Discount Liquors
Plaintiff: Myrtis Paulo Hart
Defendant: Discount Liquors
Case Number: 2:2021cv01014
Filed: October 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Judith C Herrera
Referring Judge: Steven C Yarbrough
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2021 Filing 6 FINAL JUDGMENT by District Judge Judith C. Herrera. (baw)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice by District Judge Judith C. Herrera. (baw)
November 1, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Myrtis Paulo Hart. (mjr)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough to seal complaint and cure deficiency. (cm)
October 19, 2021 Filing 3 REDACTED 1983 PRISONER'S CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendant Discount Liquors, filed by Myrtis Paulo Hart. (mjr) Modified filing date on 10/21/2021 (mjr).
October 19, 2021 Filing 1 1983 PRISONER'S CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Discount Liquors, filed by Myrtis Paulo Hart. (jg)
October 19, 2021 United States District Judge Judith C. Herrera and United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough assigned. (jg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hart v. Discount Liquors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Myrtis Paulo Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Discount Liquors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?