Aguilera v. City of Las Cruces et al
Plaintiff: Eddie Dan Aguilera
Defendant: City of Las Cruces, Miguel Domingues and Ken Miyagishima
Case Number: 2:2022cv00078
Filed: February 2, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Kevin R Sweazea
Referring Judge: David H Urias
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MOTION to Serve City of Las Cruces by Eddie Dan Aguilera. (arp)
March 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MOTION to Serve Miguel Dominguez by Eddie Dan Aguilera. (arp)
March 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION to Serve Ken Miyagishima by Eddie Dan Aguilera. (arp)
March 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Eddie Dan Aguilera. (arp)
March 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge David H. Urias denying #8 MOTION for Summary Judgment, denying #10 MOTION for Order to Show Cause, denying #9 MOTION for Summary Judgment, denying #11 MOTION for Order to Show Cause. Plaintiff shall, within 21 days of entry of this Order, file a second amended complaint. (arp)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION for Service of City of Las Cruces by Eddie Dan Aguilera. (arp)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION to Serve Miguel Dominguez by Eddie Dan Aguilera. (arp)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION to Serve Ken Miyagishima by Eddie Dan Aguilera. (arp)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Supporting Evidence and or Summary of Fact Finding by Eddie Dan Aguilera (arp)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Second MOTION for Order to Show Cause by Eddie Dan Aguilera. (arp)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION for Order to Show Cause by Eddie Dan Aguilera. (arp)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 AMENDED MOTION for Summary Judgment by Eddie Dan Aguilera. (arp)
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order United States District Judge David H. Urias assigned. (dr)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Eddie Dan Aguilera. (vh)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against City of Las Cruces, Ken Miyagishima, Miguel Domingues, filed by Eddie Dan Aguilera. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-A, #2 Exhibit 1-B)(vh)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and Order for Amended Complaint. (atc)
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea has been assigned for a 28 U.S.C. 1915 review. (jg)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REFUSAL TO CONSENT to Proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge (vh)
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CM/ECF Pro Se Notification Form to receive notification via email by Eddie Dan Aguilera (vh)
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Eddie Dan Aguilera. (vh)
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City of Las Cruces, Miguel Domingues, Ken Miyagishima, filed by Eddie Dan Aguilera. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(vh)
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea assigned. (vh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aguilera v. City of Las Cruces et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eddie Dan Aguilera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Las Cruces
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miguel Domingues
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Miyagishima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?