United States of America v. Travis
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Howard D. Travis
Case Number: 2:2022cv00315
Filed: April 26, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Carmen E Garza
Referring Judge: Stephan M Vidmar
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7401 IRS: Tax Liability
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Howard D. Travis served on 6/11/2022, answer due 7/5/2022. (Church, Holly)
April 27, 2022 Filing 3 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
April 27, 2022 Summons Issued as to Howard D. Travis. (jg)
April 27, 2022 United States Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza and United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar assigned. (jg)
April 26, 2022 Filing 2 APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT re #1 Complaint Civil Cover Sheet by United States of America (Church, Holly)
April 26, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Howard D. Travis ( Filing Fee - Waived), filed by United States of America. (Church, Holly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Travis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Holly Michele Church
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard D. Travis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?