Prepared Food Photos, Inc. v. Stansell & Jameson, Inc.
Plaintiff: Prepared Food Photos, Inc. and Adlife Marketing & Communications Co., Inc.
Defendant: Stansell & Jameson, Inc. doing business as Bobs Thriftway
Case Number: 2:2022cv00376
Filed: May 16, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Gregory J Fouratt
Referring Judge: Kea W Riggs
2 Judge: Gregory B Wormuth
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 13, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 13, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: No. 8. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (kg)
July 11, 2022 Filing 9 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to District Judge Kea W. Riggs as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
June 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. Telephonic Rule 16(c) Hearing set for 8/18/2022 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. The parties shall call the Court's conference line at (888) 363-4735 and use access code 9873158 to connect to the proceedings. Joint Status Report due by 8/11/2022. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 7/11/2022. (nmh)
June 15, 2022 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Stansell & Jameson, Inc.. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by Prepared Food Photos, Inc..(Newell, Michael)
June 2, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Prepared Food Photos, Inc.. Stansell & Jameson, Inc. served on 5/26/2022, answer due 6/16/2022. (DeSouza, Daniel)
May 23, 2022 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Prepared Food Photos, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate CopyCat Legal PLLC for Prepared Food Photos, Inc.. (DeSouza, Daniel)
May 17, 2022 Summons Issued as to Stansell & Jameson, Inc.. (dr)
May 16, 2022 Filing 3 Report re:copyright (dr)
May 16, 2022 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
May 16, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT PREPARED FOOD PHOTOS, INC. f/k/a ADLIFE MARKETING & COMMUNICATIONS CO., INC., against STANSELL & JAMESON, INC. d/b/a BOBS THRIFTWAY ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by PREPARED FOOD PHOTOS, INC. f/k/a ADLIFE MARKETING & COMMUNICATIONS CO., INC.,. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(DeSouza, Daniel)
May 16, 2022 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-8271273 re #1 Complaint, filed by PREPARED FOOD PHOTOS, INC. f/k/a ADLIFE MARKETING & COMMUNICATIONS CO., INC., (Payment made via Pay.gov)(DeSouza, Daniel)
May 16, 2022 United States Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth and United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt assigned. (dr)
May 16, 2022 Office code correction. Case office code has been changed from 1 (Albuquerque) to 2 (Las Cruces). (dr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Prepared Food Photos, Inc. v. Stansell & Jameson, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Prepared Food Photos, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel DeSouza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adlife Marketing & Communications Co., Inc.
Represented By: Daniel DeSouza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stansell & Jameson, Inc. doing business as Bobs Thriftway
Represented By: Christan Nichole Quiroz
Represented By: Michael Truett Newell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?