Torres v. Covington et al
Plaintiff: Tomas Torres
Defendant: James Malcom Covington and Dixie Express LLC
Case Number: 2:2022cv00433
Filed: June 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Kea W Riggs
Referring Judge: Kevin R Sweazea
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2022 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Tomas Torres Plaintiff's Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures (Acosta, Alejandro)
July 26, 2022 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Dixie Express LLC Initial Disclosures (Sedillo, Raul)
July 18, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: No. 7. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (kg)
July 14, 2022 Filing 8 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to District Judge Kea W. Riggs as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
July 5, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2), the parties are reminded that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are advised that this matter will be reassigned to a district judge as presiding judge if written consents from all parties have not been filed by July 13, 2022. The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. (rh)
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea. Joint Status Report due by August 9, 2022. Scheduling Conference set for August 16, 2022 at 10:30 AM. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than July 13, 2022. (atc)
June 14, 2022 Filing 4 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) for Personal Injury Damages by Dixie Express LLC. (Sedillo, Raul) Modified text to remove James Covington as per Attorney Raul Sedillo on 6/23/2022 (nr).
June 8, 2022 Filing 3 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
June 8, 2022 Filing 2 APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT re #1 Notice of Removal, by Dixie Express LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Sedillo, Raul) Modified text to remove James Covington as per Attorney Raul Sedillo on 6/23/2022 (nr).
June 8, 2022 Office code correction. Case office code has been changed from 1 (Albuquerque) to 2 (Las Cruces). (jg)
June 8, 2022 United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar and United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea assigned. (jg)
June 7, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Dixie Express LLC, from Third Judicial District Court, County of Dona Ana, case number D-307-CV-2022-00596. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Dixie Express LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Sedillo, Raul) Modified text to remove James Covington as per Attorney Raul Sedillo on 6/23/2022 (nr).
June 7, 2022 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-8307799 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by James Malcom Covington, Dixie Express LLC (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Sedillo, Raul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Torres v. Covington et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tomas Torres
Represented By: Alejandro Acosta, III
Represented By: Daisy Chaparro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Malcom Covington
Represented By: Raul P Sedillo
Represented By: Fernando Castillo Palomares
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dixie Express LLC
Represented By: Raul P Sedillo
Represented By: Fernando Castillo Palomares
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?