Garcia v. Rios et al
Petitioner: Louis Garcia
Respondent: Hector Rios, Attorney General for the State of New Mexico and Hector Balderas
Case Number: 2:2022cv00507
Filed: July 8, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Kirtan Khalsa
Referring Judge: Kea W Riggs
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Louis Garcia. Related document: #1 Petition for 2254 Relief filed by Louis Garcia. (arp)
August 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION for a Short Extension by Louis Garcia. (arp)
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Letter by Louis Garcia (arp)
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Louis Garcia. Related document: #1 Petition for 2254 Relief filed by Louis Garcia. (arp)
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TO CURE DEFICIENCY by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. Within 30 days, Petitioner shall either pay the $5.00 filing fee or file an application to proceed in district court without prepaying fees or costs along with a 6-month inmate account statement. The Clerk is directed to mail Petitioner a copy of this Order and two copies of an Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs, with instructions. (kmt)
July 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PETITION Under 28 U.S.C. 2254 for a Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Louis Garcia. (dr)
July 8, 2022 Opinion or Order United States District Judge Kea W. Riggs and United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa assigned. (dr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garcia v. Rios et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Louis Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Hector Rios
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General for the State of New Mexico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Hector Balderas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?