Emmanuel T. Trucking, LLP et al v. JP Gomez Transport, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Emmanuel T. Trucking, LLP and Great West Casualty Company
Defendant: JP Gomez Transport, LLC, Mohamed Grana and Sentry Select Insurance
3Rd Party Defendant: Carlos Torres
Case Number: 2:2022cv00567
Filed: August 1, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Gregory J Fouratt
Referring Judge: Margaret I Strickland
2 Judge: Gregory B Wormuth
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER REGARDING PROPOSED JUDICIAL CONSOLIDATION / REASSIGNMENT by Chief Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth. Should counsel object to this order, they should file a notice of objection with the bases thereof within seven days of this order. (es)
September 20, 2022 Filing 23 Clerk's Minutes for Rule 16 Scheduling Conference held before Chief Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth on 9/20/2022. (es)
September 16, 2022 Filing 22 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Emmanuel T. Trucking, LLP, Great West Casualty Company, Great West Casualty Company, Carlos Torres re #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss Joint Motion to Dismiss Third-Party Complaint and Counterclaims for Failure to Previously State a Compulsory Counterclaim filed by Emmanuel T. Trucking, LLP, Great West Casualty Company, Carlos Torres (Grayson, Brian)
September 16, 2022 Filing 21 REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss Joint Motion to Dismiss Third-Party Complaint and Counterclaims for Failure to Previously State a Compulsory Counterclaim filed by Emmanuel T. Trucking, LLP, Great West Casualty Company, Great West Casualty Company, Carlos Torres, Carlos Torres. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Grana's Answer and Affirmative Defenses, #2 Exhibit Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit Gomez Answer, #4 Exhibit JSR, #5 Exhibit Scheduling Conference Minutes) (Grayson, Brian)
September 13, 2022 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mohamed Grana , JP Gomez, Sentry Select Initial Disclosures (Wilber, Lauren)
September 12, 2022 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Emmanuel T. Trucking, LLP, Great West Casualty Company, Great West Casualty Company, Carlos Torres, Carlos Torres of Initial Disclosures (Grayson, Brian)
September 6, 2022 Filing 18 Joint Status Report filed by Defendants Mohamed Grana, JP Gomez by JP Gomez Transport, LLC (Richards, Lance)
September 2, 2022 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss Joint Motion to Dismiss Third-Party Complaint and Counterclaims for Failure to Previously State a Compulsory Counterclaim filed by Defendants Mohamed Grana, JP Gomez and filed by Sentry Select Insurance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G) (Richards, Lance)
August 25, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: Nos. 11, 13 and 15. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (kg)
August 23, 2022 Filing 14 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to United States District Judge Margaret I. Strickland as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
August 22, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE OF CONSENT SUBMISSION DEADLINE by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. Because a dispositive motion has been filed in this case, the parties are reminded, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2), that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are advised that this matter will be reassigned to a district judge as the trial judge if written consents from all parties have not been filed by September 9, 2022. The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. (eps)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 19, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to Dismiss Joint Motion to Dismiss Third-Party Complaint and Counterclaims for Failure to Previously State a Compulsory Counterclaim by Emmanuel T. Trucking, LLP, Great West Casualty Company, Great West Casualty Company, Carlos Torres. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit Torres' Complaint for Negligence, #3 Exhibit Answer, #4 Exhibit JSR, #5 Exhibit Complaint, #6 Exhibit First Amended Complaint, #7 Exhibit Notice of Removal, #8 Exhibit Answer Counterlcaim and Third-Party Complaint) (Grayson, Brian)
August 19, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian G. Grayson on behalf of Carlos Torres (Grayson, Brian)
August 16, 2022 Filing 8 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed Acknowledgement filed by Carlos Torres. (Dominguez, Paul)
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth. Joint Status Report due September 6, 2022. Rule 16 Conference set for September 20, 2022, at 2:00 PM. Parties shall call Judge Wormuth's teleconference line at (877) 402-9753, access code 7578461, to be connected to the proceedings. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 8/25/2022. (emm)
August 1, 2022 Filing 6 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
August 1, 2022 Filing 5 APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT Civil Cover sheet by Mohamed Grana, JP Gomez Transport, LLC, Sentry Select Insurance (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Richards, Lance)
August 1, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Lance Dean Richards on behalf of Mohamed Grana, JP Gomez Transport, LLC, Sentry Select Insurance (Richards, Lance)
August 1, 2022 Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Mohamed Grana, JP Gomez Transport, LLC, Sentry Select Insurance (Richards, Lance)
August 1, 2022 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) , COUNTERCLAIM against Carlos Torres, Great West Casualty Company filed by Mohamed Grana, JP Gomez Transport, and Sentry Select against Emmanuel T. Trucking, LLP by Mohamed Grana. (Richards, Lance)
August 1, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Sentry Select Insurance from Eleventh Judicial District - McKinley County, case number d1113cv202200125. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Sentry Select Insurance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Richards, Lance)
August 1, 2022 Office code correction. Case office code has been changed from 1 (Albuquerque) to 2 (Las Cruces). (dr)
August 1, 2022 United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt and United States Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth assigned. (dr)
August 1, 2022 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-8392971 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Sentry Select Insurance (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Richards, Lance)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Emmanuel T. Trucking, LLP et al v. JP Gomez Transport, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emmanuel T. Trucking, LLP
Represented By: Brian G. Grayson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Great West Casualty Company
Represented By: Brian G. Grayson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Gomez Transport, LLC
Represented By: Lauren Rae Wilber
Represented By: Lance Dean Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mohamed Grana
Represented By: Lauren Rae Wilber
Represented By: Lance Dean Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sentry Select Insurance
Represented By: Lauren Rae Wilber
Represented By: Lance Dean Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Carlos Torres
Represented By: Paul M Dominguez
Represented By: Ricardo F. Roybal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?