Kimble v. EOG Resources, Inc.
Plaintiff: Steven Kimble
Defendant: EOG Resources, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2022cv00674
Filed: September 13, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Gregory J Fouratt
Referring Judge: William P Johnson
2 Judge: Kevin R Sweazea
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2022 Filing 15 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to Chief District Judge William P. Johnson as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
November 1, 2022 Filing 14 MOTION to Strike by Steven Kimble. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Dunlap, Andrew)
October 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. Telephonic Rule 16(c) Hearing set for 11/29/2022 at 02:00 PM MST before Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. The parties shall call the Court's conference line at (888) 363-4735 and use access code 9873158 to connect to the proceedings. Client attendance is not required. Joint Status Report due by 11/22/2022. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 11/3/2022. (gbg)
October 11, 2022 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint Defendant EOG Resources, Inc.'s Original Answer and Affirmative and Other Defenses to Plaintiffs' Original Class and Collective Action Complaint by EOG Resources, Inc.. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Steven Kimble.(Sutphin, Robert)
October 5, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE by EOG Resources, Inc. re 8 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, Certificate Of Good Standing And Entry Of Appearance For Jesika Silva Blanco (Sutphin, Robert)
October 5, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE by EOG Resources, Inc. re 7 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, Certificate Of Good Standing And Entry Of Appearance For Kimberly Cheeseman (Sutphin, Robert)
October 5, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE by EOG Resources, Inc. re 6 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, Certificate Of Good Standing And Entry of Appearance For M. Carter Crow (Sutphin, Robert)
October 5, 2022 Filing 8 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendant EOG Resources, Inc. by Robert J Sutphin on behalf of: Jesika Silva Blanco Norton Rose Fulbright US LLP 1301 McKinney, Suite 5100Houston, TX 77010-3095 713-651-5151 Fax 713-651-5246 jesika.blanco@nortonrosefulbright.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Sutphin, Robert)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
October 5, 2022 Filing 7 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendant EOG Resources, Inc. by Robert J Sutphin on behalf of: Kimberly Cheeseman Norton Rose Fulbright US LLP 1301 McKinney, Suite 5100Houston, TX 77010-3095 713-651-5151 Fax 713-651-5246 kimberly.cheeseman@nortonrosefulbright.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Sutphin, Robert)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
October 5, 2022 Filing 6 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendant EOG Resources, Inc. by Robert J Sutphin on behalf of: M. Carter Crow Norton Rose Fulbright US LLP 1301 McKinney, Suite 5100Houston, TX 77010-3095 713-651-5151 Fax 713-651-5246 carter.crow@nortonrosefulbright.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Sutphin, Robert)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
October 5, 2022 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-8494708 re: # 8 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by EOG Resources, Inc. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Sutphin, Robert)
October 5, 2022 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-8494669 re: # 7 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by EOG Resources, Inc. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Sutphin, Robert)
October 5, 2022 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-8494540 re: # 6 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by EOG Resources, Inc. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Sutphin, Robert)
September 30, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE by EOG Resources, Inc. Entry of Appearance (Sutphin, Robert)
September 27, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Steven Kimble. EOG Resources, Inc. served on 9/19/2022, answer due 10/11/2022. (Josephson, Michael)
September 14, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew W Dunlap on behalf of Steven Kimble (Dunlap, Andrew)
September 14, 2022 Summons Issued as to EOG Resources, Inc.. (dr)
September 13, 2022 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
September 13, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against EOG Resources, Inc. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Steven Kimble. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Josephson, Michael)
September 13, 2022 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-8459051 re #1 Complaint filed by Steven Kimble (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Josephson, Michael)
September 13, 2022 United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea and United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt assigned. (dr)
September 13, 2022 Office code correction. Case office code has been changed from 1 (Albuquerque) to 2 (Las Cruces). (dr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kimble v. EOG Resources, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Kimble
Represented By: Richard Burch
Represented By: Michael A Josephson
Represented By: Andrew W Dunlap
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EOG Resources, Inc.
Represented By: John C. Anderson
Represented By: Little West
Represented By: Robert J Sutphin
Represented By: Jesika Blanco
Represented By: M. Carter Crow
Represented By: Kimberly Cheeseman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?