Cruz v. AerSale, Inc.
Plaintiff: Will Cruz
Defendant: AerSale, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2022cv00857
Filed: November 10, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Gregory J Fouratt
Referring Judge: Kevin R Sweazea
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1938 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2022 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by AerSale, Inc.. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Will Cruz.(DePonte, Michael)
December 14, 2022 Filing 5 STIPULATION of Time to Answer Class Action Complaint Agreed to by Plaintiffs by AerSale, Inc. (DePonte, Michael)
November 29, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE by Will Cruz of Filing Consent (Burch, Richard)
November 29, 2022 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Will Cruz. AerSale, Inc. served on 11/23/2022, answer due 12/14/2022. (Burch, Richard)
November 15, 2022 Summons Issued as to AerSale, Inc.. (bp)
November 14, 2022 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
November 14, 2022 United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt and United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea assigned. (dr)
November 11, 2022 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-8551758 re #1 Complaint filed by Will Cruz (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Burch, Richard)
November 10, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AerSale, Inc. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Will Cruz. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Burch, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cruz v. AerSale, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Will Cruz
Represented By: Richard Burch
Represented By: Michael A Josephson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AerSale, Inc.
Represented By: Michael J. DePonte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?