Great West Casualty Company et al v. Greyhound Lines Inc et al
Plaintiff: Great West Casualty Company and Long Trucking, LLC
Defendant: Greyhound Lines Inc
Case Number: 2:2024cv00690
Filed: July 8, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Matthew L Garcia
Referring Judge: Jerry H Ritter
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1441 Petition for Removal- Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2024 Filing 16 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: No. 5. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (kg)
August 27, 2024 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Greyhound Lines Inc First Supp Disclosure Statement (Schmehl, Jeramy)
August 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter. Discovery terminates 4/30/2025. Discovery motions due by 5/7/25. Pretrial motions due by 6/11/2025. Other deadlines contained herein. Counsel are advised that the presiding district judge, the Hon. Matthew L. Garcia, does not allow remote appearances absent extraordinary circumstances. (ama)
August 22, 2024 Filing 13 Clerk's Minutes for telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference held before Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter on 8/22/2024. Attorney Mingjie Hoemmen appeared for Plaintiffs and attorney Ryan Vetter appeared for Defendant. The parties reported no issues with initial disclosures. The Court informed the parties of its discovery dispute procedure of an informal telephonic conference with the Court prior to filing motions. No motions are pending at this time. Discovery deadlines and parameters were set as reflected in the forthcoming Scheduling Order filed separately. The parties intend to proceed with private mediation at this juncture. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (ama)
August 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter DIRECTING PARTIES to amended telephonic conference call-in instructions for Rule 16 Conference set for Thursday, August 22, 2024, at 10:00 AM per #6 . Parties shall call my toll-free AT&T conference line at (888) 278-0296, enter access code 9998216, and press #, then when prompted enter the security code 3334 and press # to be joined to the conference. Conference shall otherwise proceed as scheduled.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (ama)
August 20, 2024 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Mingjie L Hoemmen on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Hoemmen, Mingjie)
August 15, 2024 Filing 10 Joint Status Report by Greyhound Lines Inc (Schmehl, Jeramy)
August 15, 2024 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Great West Casualty Company, Long Trucking, LLC of Initial Disclosures (Quintero, Penelope)
August 15, 2024 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Greyhound Lines Inc Initial Disclosures (Schmehl, Jeramy)
August 12, 2024 Filing 7 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge Matthew L. Garcia as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bc)
July 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter SETTING a telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for Thursday, August 22, 2024, at 10:00 a.m. Mountain Time. Counsel shall call 888-278-0296 (access code: 9998216#) to connect to the proceeding. Joint Status Report and Initial Disclosures are due by August 15, 2024. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than August 8, 2024. Consent is strictly voluntary. (ama)
July 15, 2024 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) for Subrogation, Negligence, Negligence per se, Damages and Costs by Greyhound Lines Inc. (Schmehl, Jeramy)
July 8, 2024 Filing 3 Filing fee: $ 405, receipt number ANMDC-9438047 re #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Greyhound Lines Inc from Twelfth Judicial District Court, case number D-1215-CV-2024-00398. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Greyhound Lines Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Schmehl, Jeramy) filed by Greyhound Lines Inc (arp)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
July 8, 2024 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
July 8, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Greyhound Lines Inc from Twelfth Judicial District Court, case number D-1215-CV-2024-00398. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Greyhound Lines Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Schmehl, Jeramy)
July 8, 2024 Office code correction. Case office code has been changed from 1 (Albuquerque) to 2 (Las Cruces). (dr)
July 8, 2024 United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea and United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter assigned. (dr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Great West Casualty Company et al v. Greyhound Lines Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Great West Casualty Company
Represented By: Richard M Padilla
Represented By: Penelope M. Quintero
Represented By: Mingjie L Hoemmen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Long Trucking, LLC
Represented By: Richard M Padilla
Represented By: Penelope M. Quintero
Represented By: Mingjie L Hoemmen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greyhound Lines Inc
Represented By: Ryan William Vetter
Represented By: Jeramy Schmehl
Represented By: Jeff Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?