E. Scott Family Limited Partnership v. Trisura Specialty Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: E. Scott Family Limited Partnership
Defendant: Palms Insurance Company Limited, Lancashire Insurance Company (UK) Limited, Summit Specialty Insurance Company, Gotham Insurance Company, QBE Specialty Insurance Company, Trisura Specialty Insurance Company and Indian Harbor Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2024cv01148
Filed: November 8, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Kenneth J Gonzales
Referring Judge: Gregory B Wormuth
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1442 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2024 Filing 17 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Trisura Specialty Insurance Company, QBE Specialty Insurance Company, Summit Specialty Insurance Company, Gotham Insurance Company, Lancashire Insurance Company (UK) Limited, Palms Insurance Company Limited, Indian Harbor Insurance Company re #4 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Gotham Insurance Company, Palms Insurance Company Limited, Lancashire Insurance Company (UK) Limited, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, Summit Specialty Insurance Company, Trisura Specialty Insurance Company, QBE Specialty Insurance Company, #3 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration filed by Gotham Insurance Company, Palms Insurance Company Limited, Lancashire Insurance Company (UK) Limited, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, Summit Specialty Insurance Company, Trisura Specialty Insurance Company, QBE Specialty Insurance Company (Ritenour, Megan)
December 13, 2024 Filing 16 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Trisura Specialty Insurance Company, QBE Specialty Insurance Company, Summit Specialty Insurance Company, Gotham Insurance Company, Lancashire Insurance Company (UK) Limited, Palms Insurance Company Limited, Indian Harbor Insurance Company. (Ritenour, Megan)
December 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER FINDING GOOD CAUSE TO DEFER THE ISSUANCE OF A SCHEDULING ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth. (dkk)
December 2, 2024 Filing 14 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bc)
November 29, 2024 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by E. Scott Family Limited Partnership. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Circelli, Vincent)
November 19, 2024 Filing 12 NOTICE by Gotham Insurance Company, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, Lancashire Insurance Company (UK) Limited, Palms Insurance Company Limited, QBE Specialty Insurance Company, Summit Specialty Insurance Company, Trisura Specialty Insurance Company re 8 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District,, Good Standing of Non-Member Attorney Karen Andersen Moran (Ritenour, Megan)
November 19, 2024 Filing 11 NOTICE by Gotham Insurance Company, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, Lancashire Insurance Company (UK) Limited, Palms Insurance Company Limited, QBE Specialty Insurance Company, Summit Specialty Insurance Company, Trisura Specialty Insurance Company re 7 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District,, Good Standing of Non-Member Attorney Jared T. Greisman (Ritenour, Megan)
November 19, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE by Gotham Insurance Company, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, Lancashire Insurance Company (UK) Limited, Palms Insurance Company Limited, QBE Specialty Insurance Company, Summit Specialty Insurance Company, Trisura Specialty Insurance Company re 6 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District,, Good Standing of Non-Member Attorney Eridania Perez (Ritenour, Megan)
November 19, 2024 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-9646730 re: # 8 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District,, filed by Gotham Insurance Company, Palms Insurance Company Limited, Lancashire Insurance Company (UK) Limited, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, Summit Specialty Insurance Company, Trisura Specialty Insurance Company, QBE Specialty Insurance Company (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Ritenour, Megan)
November 19, 2024 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-9646721 re: # 7 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District,, filed by Gotham Insurance Company, Palms Insurance Company Limited, Lancashire Insurance Company (UK) Limited, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, Summit Specialty Insurance Company, Trisura Specialty Insurance Company, QBE Specialty Insurance Company (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Ritenour, Megan)
November 19, 2024 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-9646716 re: # 6 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District,, filed by Gotham Insurance Company, Palms Insurance Company Limited, Lancashire Insurance Company (UK) Limited, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, Summit Specialty Insurance Company, Trisura Specialty Insurance Company, QBE Specialty Insurance Company (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Ritenour, Megan)
November 18, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2) and considering the pending dispositive motion, the parties are reminded that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are advised that the Clerk will reassign this matter to a district judge as the trial judge no later than 10 days from the entry of this notice unless consents from all parties have been filed. The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. NO DOCUMENTS ARE ATTACHED.] (ldm)
November 18, 2024 Filing 8 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendants Gotham Insurance Company, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, Lancashire Insurance Company (UK) Limited, Palms Insurance Company Limited, QBE Specialty Insurance Company, Summit Specialty Insurance Company, Trisura Specialty Insurance Company by Megan Elizabeth Ritenour on behalf of: Karen Andersen Moran Kennedys CMK LLP 30 South Wacker Drive, Suite 3650Chicago, Illinois 60606 312-800-5000 Karen.Andersenmoran@kennedyslaw.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Ritenour, Megan)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
November 18, 2024 Filing 7 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendants Gotham Insurance Company, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, Lancashire Insurance Company (UK) Limited, Palms Insurance Company Limited, QBE Specialty Insurance Company, Summit Specialty Insurance Company, Trisura Specialty Insurance Company by Megan Elizabeth Ritenour on behalf of: Jared T. Greisman Kennedys CMK LLP 570 Lexington Avenue, 8th FloorNew York, New York 10022 212-252-0004 Jared.Greisman@kennedyslaw.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Ritenour, Megan)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
November 18, 2024 Filing 6 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendants Gotham Insurance Company, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, Lancashire Insurance Company (UK) Limited, Palms Insurance Company Limited, QBE Specialty Insurance Company, Summit Specialty Insurance Company, Trisura Specialty Insurance Company by Megan Elizabeth Ritenour on behalf of: Eridania Perez Kennedys CMK LLP 570 Lexington Avenue, 8th FloorNew York, New York 10022 212-252-0004 Eridania.Perez@kennedyslaw.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Ritenour, Megan)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
November 18, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Vincent Circelli on behalf of E. Scott Family Limited Partnership (Circelli, Vincent)
November 15, 2024 Filing 4 MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Gotham Insurance Company, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, Lancashire Insurance Company (UK) Limited, Palms Insurance Company Limited, QBE Specialty Insurance Company, Summit Specialty Insurance Company, Trisura Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Memorandum In Support, #2 Affidavit Declaration of J. Greisman, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F) (Ritenour, Megan)
November 15, 2024 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration by Gotham Insurance Company, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, Lancashire Insurance Company (UK) Limited, Palms Insurance Company Limited, QBE Specialty Insurance Company, Summit Specialty Insurance Company, Trisura Specialty Insurance Company. (Ritenour, Megan)
November 8, 2024 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
November 8, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Ninth Judicial District, case number D-905-CV-2024-00420. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Corporate Disclosures)(Ritenour, Megan)
November 8, 2024 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 405 receipt number ANMDC-9632461 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Gotham Insurance Company, Palms Insurance Company Limited, Lancashire Insurance Company (UK) Limited, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, Summit Specialty Insurance Company, Trisura Specialty Insurance Company, QBE SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Ritenour, Megan)
November 8, 2024 United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea and Chief United States Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth assigned. (jg)
November 8, 2024 Office code correction. Case office code has been changed from 1 (Albuquerque) to 2 (Las Cruces). (jg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: E. Scott Family Limited Partnership v. Trisura Specialty Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E. Scott Family Limited Partnership
Represented By: Vincent Circelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Palms Insurance Company Limited
Represented By: Megan Elizabeth Ritenour
Represented By: Karen Andersen Moran
Represented By: Jared Greisman
Represented By: Eridania Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lancashire Insurance Company (UK) Limited
Represented By: Megan Elizabeth Ritenour
Represented By: Karen Andersen Moran
Represented By: Jared Greisman
Represented By: Eridania Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Summit Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Megan Elizabeth Ritenour
Represented By: Karen Andersen Moran
Represented By: Jared Greisman
Represented By: Eridania Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gotham Insurance Company
Represented By: Megan Elizabeth Ritenour
Represented By: Karen Andersen Moran
Represented By: Jared Greisman
Represented By: Eridania Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QBE Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Megan Elizabeth Ritenour
Represented By: Karen Andersen Moran
Represented By: Jared Greisman
Represented By: Eridania Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trisura Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Megan Elizabeth Ritenour
Represented By: Karen Andersen Moran
Represented By: Jared Greisman
Represented By: Eridania Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indian Harbor Insurance Company
Represented By: Megan Elizabeth Ritenour
Represented By: Karen Andersen Moran
Represented By: Jared Greisman
Represented By: Eridania Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?