Garfio De La Rosa v. Mulholland Energy Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Manuel Garfio De La Rosa
Defendant: Garfield Bowen, Mulholland Services Holdco, Inc., Mulholland Energy Services Equipment Leasing, LLC, Mulholland Employee Holdings, LLC, Energy Housing, LLC, Mulholland Energy Services, LLC and Mulholland Services Holding Co., LLC
Case Number: 2:2024cv01166
Filed: November 18, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Damian L Martinez
Referring Judge: Kevin R Sweazea
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 13, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2025 Filing 9 NOTICE by Manuel Garfio De La Rosa re #8 Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A) (Jones, David)
January 13, 2025 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants., filed by Manuel Garfio De La Rosa. (Jones, David)
January 6, 2025 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mulholland Energy Services, LLC (Meyers, Brandon)
December 31, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon Michael Meyers on behalf of Mulholland Energy Services, LLC (Meyers, Brandon)
December 30, 2024 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Mulholland Energy Services, LLC. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Manuel Garfio De La Rosa.(Meyers, Brandon)
November 19, 2024 Filing 4 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea as the pretrial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (eh)
November 19, 2024 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 405 receipt number ANMDC-9647446 re #1 Complaint filed by Manuel Garfio De La Rosa (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Jones, David)
November 19, 2024 Summons Issued as to Garfield Bowen, Energy Housing, LLC, Mulholland Employee Holdings, LLC, Mulholland Energy Services Equipment Leasing, LLC, Mulholland Energy Services, LLC, Mulholland Services Holdco, Inc. and Mulholland Services Holding Co., LLC. (eh)
November 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO AMEND by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. (am)
November 18, 2024 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Damian L. Martinez to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (eh)
November 18, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Manuel Garfio De La Rosa. (Jones, David)
November 18, 2024 Office code correction. Case office code has been changed from 1 (Albuquerque) to 2 (Las Cruces). (eh)
November 18, 2024 United States Magistrate Judge Damian L. Martinez and United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt assigned. (eh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garfio De La Rosa v. Mulholland Energy Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garfield Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mulholland Services Holdco, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mulholland Energy Services Equipment Leasing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mulholland Employee Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Energy Housing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mulholland Energy Services, LLC
Represented By: Brandon Michael Meyers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mulholland Services Holding Co., LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manuel Garfio De La Rosa
Represented By: Gregory L Gowan
Represented By: David L Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?