National American Insurance Company v. J C SERVICES, LLC et al
Plaintiff: National American Insurance Company
Defendant: J C Services, LLC and J&J Investments, LLC
Counter-Claimant: J&J Investments, LLC and J C Services, LLC
Counter-Defendant: National American Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2024cv01170
Filed: November 19, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Gregory J Fouratt
Referring Judge: Gregory B Wormuth
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Injunctive & Declaratory Relief
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 10, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2025 Filing 11 NAICO's ANSWER to #7 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, by National American Insurance Company.(Burke, Sonya)
December 18, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard E. Olson on behalf of J C Services, LLC, J&J Investments, LLC (Olson, Richard)
December 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. A Telephonic Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference is set for 2/18/2025, at 10:00 a.m. MST. Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan due by 2/11/2025. The parties shall call the WebEx conference line at (855) 244-8681 and dial access code 2313 888 6328 to connect to the proceedings. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 1/6/2025. (am)
December 16, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy B Rode on behalf of J C Services, LLC, J&J Investments, LLC (Rode, Timothy)
December 16, 2024 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, for Declaratory Relief, COUNTERCLAIM (s) against National American Insurance Company by J&J Investments, LLC, J C Services, LLC. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by National American Insurance Company.(Hnasko, Thomas)
December 16, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas M. Hnasko on behalf of All Defendants (Hnasko, Thomas)
December 2, 2024 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by National American Insurance Company. J&J Investments, LLC served on 11/25/2024, answer due 12/16/2024. (Noya, Jennifer)
December 2, 2024 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by National American Insurance Company. J C Services, LLC served on 11/25/2024, answer due 12/16/2024. (Noya, Jennifer)
November 19, 2024 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by National American Insurance Company (Noya, Jennifer)
November 19, 2024 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Chief Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (eh)
November 19, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Declaratory Relief against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by National American Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Noya, Jennifer)
November 19, 2024 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 405 receipt number ANMDC-9646044 re #1 Complaint, filed by National American Insurance Company (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Noya, Jennifer)
November 19, 2024 Office code correction. Case office code has been changed from 1 (Albuquerque) to 2 (Las Cruces). (eh)
November 19, 2024 United States Chief Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth and United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt assigned. (eh)
November 19, 2024 Summons Issued as to J C Services, LLC and J&J Investments, LLC. (eh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: National American Insurance Company v. J C SERVICES, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J C Services, LLC
Represented By: Timothy B Rode
Represented By: Thomas M. Hnasko
Represented By: Richard E. Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J&J Investments, LLC
Represented By: Timothy B Rode
Represented By: Thomas M. Hnasko
Represented By: Richard E. Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National American Insurance Company
Represented By: Jennifer A. Noya
Represented By: Sonya R. Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-claimant: J&J Investments, LLC
Represented By: Timothy B Rode
Represented By: Thomas M. Hnasko
Represented By: Richard E. Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-claimant: J C Services, LLC
Represented By: Timothy B Rode
Represented By: Thomas M. Hnasko
Represented By: Richard E. Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-defendant: National American Insurance Company
Represented By: Jennifer A. Noya
Represented By: Sonya R. Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?