Amerisource Corporation et al v. Rx USA International, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Amerisource Corporation
Defendant: Parson Center Pharmacy, Inc., Parson Medical Center Pharmacy, Inc. (II) and Rx USA International, Inc.
Petitioner: New York Credit & Financial Managment Group
Counter Defendant: Amerisource Corporation
Unknown: Jonathan D. Bennett, Morton R. Branzburg, Pina S. Wertzberger and Brian J. Oberman
Counter Claimant: Parson Center Pharmacy, Inc., Parson Medical Center Pharmacy, Inc. (II) and Rx USA International, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2002cv02514
Filed: January 30, 2009
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Office: Brooklyn Office
Presiding Judge: Joan M. Azrack
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 278 ORDER granting 269 Motion for Sanctions: for the reasons discussed in the attached Memorandum and Order, plaintiff's motion for sanctions is GRANTED and the defendants and Robert C. Drucker together are ORDERED to pay $50,000 to Amerisource and $50,000 to the Clerk of this Court. The defendants and Mr. Drucker shall be held jointly and severally liable for the burden of these sanctions. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joan M. Azrack on 7/6/2010.
May 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 275 FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW: for the reasons discussed in the attached Memorandum of Decision, the Court adopts the Jury's advisory verdict in favor of plaintiff regarding the breach of contract claims and awards plaintiff damages, prejudgment interest, and attorneys fees as described in the Memorandum. The Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment accordingly. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joan M. Azrack on 5/26/2010. Hard copy forwarded for judgment on 5/26/2010. (Bhatt, Tina)
January 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 235 ORDER granting 188 Motion in Limine to Exclude Certain Hearsay Evidence: For the reasons discussed in the attached Order, Amerisource's motion is granted and the exhibits and testimony regarding conversations between RxUSA representatives and employees of non-party distributors are excluded from trial. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joan M. Azrack on 1/29/2009. (Bhatt, Tina) Modified on 1/30/2009 (Bhatt, Tina).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Amerisource Corporation et al v. Rx USA International, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Amerisource Corporation
Represented By: Paul G. Nofer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amerisource Corporation
Represented By: William R. Hinchman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Jonathan D. Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Morton R. Branzburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Pina S. Wertzberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Brian J. Oberman
Represented By: Leonard Weintraub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: New York Credit & Financial Managment Group
Represented By: Jared I. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Parson Center Pharmacy, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Parson Medical Center Pharmacy, Inc. (II)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Rx USA International, Inc.
Represented By: Michael L. Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parson Center Pharmacy, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher J. Kellar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parson Medical Center Pharmacy, Inc. (II)
Represented By: Michael L. Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rx USA International, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher J. Kellar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?