United States of America v. City of New York
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: City of New York
Case Number: 1:2007cv02067
Filed: May 21, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Office: Brooklyn Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge:
Presiding Judge: Nicholas G. Garaufis
Presiding Judge: Roanne L. Mann
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1703 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: Special Master Jones's 1653 Report and Recommendation is ADOPTED IN FULL. So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 8/3/2016. (Lee, Tiffeny)
June 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1696 MEMORANDUM & ORDER re (1673) Motion for Attorney Fees in case 1:07-cv-02067-NGG; and re (30) Motion for Attorney Fees in case 1:13-cv-03123-RJD-RLM : Plaintiff-Intervenors' motion for approval of the attorneys' fees and costs settlement is GRANTED. So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 6/15/2016. (Lee, Tiffeny)
November 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1647 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1623 . Before the court is Special Master Peace's Report and Recommendation, which finds that Claimant 200001350 is eligible for a compensatory damages award in the amount of $3 0,000. (Id. at 3.) There has been no objection to the R&R. The court has nonetheless reviewed the R&R and found no error. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 53; United States v. City of New York, No. 07-CV-2067(NGG) (RLM), 2013 WL 4516108, at *1 (E.D.N.Y. Aug. 19, 2013). Accordingly, the Report and Recommendation is ADOPTED IN FULL. So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 11/18/2015. (Lee, Tiffeny)
April 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1588 MEMORANDUM & ORDER re 1456 Motion for Disbursement of Funds/Motion For Order Requiring City To Pay Interest Due On Claimants' Minimum Employee Pension Contributions. The United State's Motion for an Order Requiring the City to Pay Inte rest Due on Claimants' Minimum Employee Pension Contributions is GRANTED. The City is hereby ORDERED to pay the interest due on claimants' minimum employee contributions as a necessary element of the retroactive seniority granted in the Final Relief Order. So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 4/16/2015. (Lee, Tiffeny)
March 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1571 ORDER granting 1467 Motion for Settlement; granting 1525 Motion to Amend/Correct/Supplement. For the reasons discussed in the accompanying Memorandum and Order: * Objections filed by claimants 200000216, 200000323, 200000459, 200000896, 20 0000431, 200000337, and 200007062 to the Monetary Relief Consent Decree and/or Proposed Relief Awards List are SUSTAINED. Additionally, Plaintiffs' request that claimant 200000337 be moved from the Hispanic Priority Hire List to the Black Prior ity Hire List is GRANTED; the court hereby MODIFIES its June 13, 2013, Order (Dkt. 1147, as modified by Dkt. 1235) accordingly. Plaintiffs are DIRECTED to see that claimant 200000337 receives notice documents regarding Plaintiff-Intervenors' In junctive Relief and Nonhire Victim Subclasses, and that he be permitted to submit a compensatory damages claim should he wish to do so. * All other objections are OVERRULED; and * Plaintiffs' Joint Motion for Final Entry of Amended Monet ary Relief Consent Decree (Dkt. 1467) and Plaintiffs' Joint Motion to Amend Attachments E & F to Amended Monetary Relief Consent Decree (Dkt. 1525) are GRANTED. The Amended Monetary Relief Consent Decree (Dkt. 1468), Attachments A through D the reto (Dkts. 1468-1 to -4), and Second Amended Attachments E & F (Dkts. 1468-1 and -2) are hereby deemed FINALLY APPROVED AND ENTERED. The Amended Proposed Relief Awards List (Dkt. 1468-1) is APPROVED as the Final Relief Awards List. Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 3/11/2015. (Day, Lori)
January 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1269 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: The court GRANTS IN PART Plaintiff-Intervenors' Application for Expert Fees and Costs. Scott+ Scott is awarded a total of $198,715.11; Levy Ratner is awarded a total of$5,856.00, and CCR is awarded a total of $33,642.00. So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 1/24/2014. (Lee, Tiffeny)
December 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1251 AMENDED MEMORANDUM & ORDER amending 1245 Memorandum & Order regarding specified motions for reconsideration. So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 12/11/2013. (Lee, Tiffeny)
December 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1245 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: For the reasons discussed above, Claimants 200004106, 20000777, 200004044, and 20005146's motions for reconsideration are DENIED. So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 12/3/2013. (Lee, Tiffeny)
November 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1236 ORDER ADOPTING 1230 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master Gonzalez and finding Claimant 200008298 eligible to be considered and eligible for monetary relief as a Nonhire Claimant. So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 11/18/2013. (Lee, Tiffeny)
August 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1190 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Masters Gonzalez and Peace that Claimants 200002006 and 200000551 are eligible as Nonhire Claimants for priority hiring and monetary relief. So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 8/19/2013. (Lee, Tiffeny)
August 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1182 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: 1181 is VACATED. For the reasons explained in the attached Memorandum & Order, the Special Masters' June 6, 2013, R&Rs, June 14, 2013, R&Rs, June 19, 2013, R&Rs, June 24, 2013, R&Rs, June 27, 2013, R&Rs, and June 28, 2013, R&Rs are ADOPTED IN FULL. Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 8/9/2013. (White, Sarah)
August 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1181 MEMORANDUM & ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: For the reasons explained in the attached Memorandum & Order, Special Master Hormozi's June 27, 2013, R&R is MODIFIED to reflect that Claimant 200001336 is ineligible for relief for the rea sons given herein rather than the reasons discussed in the R&R and otherwise ADOPTED, and the June 6, 2013, R&Rs, June 14, 2013, R&Rs, June 19, 2013, R&Rs, June 24, 2013, R&Rs, and June 28, 2013, R&Rs are ADOPTED IN FULL. Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 8/8/2013. (White, Sarah)
June 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1144 MEMORANDUM & ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: The Special Masters' April 19, 2013, R&Rs 1098 are ADOPTED IN FULL; the April 30, 2013, R&Rs 1103 are ADOPTED IN FULL, and the April 30, 2013, Good Conduct R&R 1104 is ADOPTED IN PART. Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 6/7/2013. (White, Sarah)
June 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1135 ORDER ADOPTING REPORTS AND RECOMMENDATIONS: The Special Masters' March 6, 2013, R&Rs are ADOPTED IN FULL; Special Master Gonzalez's March 13, 2013, R&R is MODIFIED to reflect that Claimant 200000580 is ineligible for priority hiring and mon etary relief because he was older than 29 on September 2, 1998, and the March 13, 2013, R&Rs are otherwise ADOPTED; the Special Masters' March 22, 2013, R&Rs are ADOPTED IN FULL; Special Master Hormozi's April 12, 2013, R&R is MODIFIED to the extent it relies on Claimant 200005228's prior felonies as the reason he is ineligible for relief, and the April 12, 2013, R&Rs are otherwise ADOPTED. Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 6/3/2013. (White, Sarah)
May 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1112 MEMORANDUM & ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: The Special Masters' February 19, 2013, and March 1, 2013, R&Rs are ADOPTED IN FULL. Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 5/9/2013. (White, Sarah)
May 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1106 MEMORANDUM & ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: The Special Masters' January 22, 2013, R&Rs are ADOPTED except as to as to Claimant 200000798, Claimant 200002006, Claimant 200000551, Claimant 200007146, and Claimant 200001685. Claimants 200000798, Claimant 200002006, Claimant 200000551 are to be considered in accordance with the court's March 1, 2013, Order, and the parties are directed to provide the court with an update as to Claimants 200001685 and 200007146. The Special Masters' February 5, 2013, R&Rs are ADOPTED IN FULL. Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 5/2/2013. (White, Sarah)
October 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1011 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER addressing objections to the court's Proposed Relief Order and directing the entry of the Final Relief Order. Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 10/26/2012. (White, Sarah)
September 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 986 MEMORANDUM & ORDER: The City's motion to use Exam 2000 in the manner described to create a list of eligible candidates for the position of entry-level firefighter is APPROVED. Mary Jo White is discharged from the role of Special Master with the court's thanks. Any duties that remain under the terms of the previous Order Appointing Special Master [Docket Entry # 448] are assigned toCourt Monitor Mark S. Cohen. So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 9/28/2012. (Lee, Tiffeny)
September 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 974 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: It is ORDERED that black victims of the City's discriminatory entry-level firefighter exams will be entitled to compensatory damages for noneconomic harm only if they can establish on an individualized basis one or more sp ecific forms of compensatory damages that have been previously recognized in the common law of tort. The noneconomic benefits of the job of New York City firefighter---on which the court held a bench trial in August 2011--are not relevant to the comp ensatory damages owed to claimants, and so the Special Masters shall not award damages based on a valuation of the differences between those benefits and claimants' actual life experiences. Claimants may attempt to obtain damages for emotional d istress, loss of enjoyment of life, inconvenience, and lost future earning capacity, in accordance with the definitions and case law discussed in this Memorandum and Order. They may also seek damages for forms of noneconomic harm that the court has n ot addressed, but may be awarded such damages only if an award would be consistent with the principles discussed above. The City's request that the court revisit its certification of the non-hire victim and delayed-hire victim subclasses is DENIED. So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 9/18/2012. (Lee, Tiffeny)
August 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 952 MEMORANDUM & ORDER: For the reasons discussed above, the City shall have the opportunity to prove that substantially equivalent employment, in the form of firefighter positions with similar pay, benefits, and scheduling flexibility, existed within a reasonable geographic distance of an individual Non-Hire Claimant's residence, but shall not offer evidence of other governmentpositions as substantially equivalent positions; the City shall not take discovery about collateral source payments bu t may offer evidence of payments it made to a particular claimant; the City may not take discovery regarding the likelihood that a particular Non-Hire Claimant may have left the FDNY; the City may take discovery regarding a claimant's interim ea rnings upon a showing of need to the Special Master presiding over that claimant's relief proceeding; and, the City may attempt to prove that particular Delayed-Hire Claimants caused a portion of their delay. The Special Masters are directed to develop an individual relief procedure that is consistent with the court's rulings. Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 8/22/2012. (Lee, Tiffeny)
August 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 946 MEMORANDUM & ORDER: Plaintiff-Intervenor's 912 Motion for Reconsideration is DENIED. Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 8/20/2012. (Lee, Tiffeny)
July 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 922 RELIEF ORDER. Fairness Hearing set for 10/1/2012 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4D South before Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis. So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 7/9/2012. (Lee, Tiffeny)
July 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 916 RELIEF ORDER, So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 7/5/2012. (Lee, Tiffeny)
June 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 907 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re Document 903 proposed notice documents for Fairness Hearing I and the Report and Recommendation of the Special Masters regarding the contents of the Proposed Relief Order. Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 6/21/2012. (Lee, Tiffeny)
June 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 902 ORDER. The court holds the Court Monitor has jurisdiction over the parties' dispute regarding the FDNY's response to, and investigation of, certain communications distributed through FDNY fax machines and bulletin boards. Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 6/18/2012. (Townsend, Jesse)
June 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 899 ORDER denying 895 Motion to Vacate and for Reconsideration. See attached Memorandum and Order for details. Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 6/11/2012. (Townsend, Jesse)
June 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 888 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. the court adopts the United States method of determining individual backpay awards; grants the United States and the Citys request that all putative priority hires be required to take and pass Exam 2000; grants the parties joi nt request that all individuals who took Exam 2000 receive notice of the anticipated fairness hearing; grants the United States and Plaintiff-Intervenors request that such individuals receive a thirty-day objection period; grants the parties joint re quest to stay consideration of the Special Masters recommendations; grants the United States request that the City reimburse it for the cost of obtaining information from the SSA; and grants the request of Levy Ratner, P.C., and the CCR for leave to represent claimants in the individual claims proceedings, subject to conditions. The court modifies the previously-determined relief phase timeline. The court orders the Special Masters for individual relief and the parties to engage in a meet-and-confer session. See Attached Memorandum and Order. Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 6/3/2012. (Townsend, Jesse)
May 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 883 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER confirming appointment of Special Masters. So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 5/22/2012. (Lee, Tiffeny)
April 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 861 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: In this Memorandum and Order, the court addresses how retroactive seniority is to be awarded to Non-Hire and Delayed-Hire Claimants; the time potential claimants and class members will be given to file claim forms and class opt-out forms; and the language of the notices, claim forms, and opt-out form. So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 4/19/2012. (Lee, Tiffeny)
April 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 846 MEMORANDUM & ORDER RE 843 Motion for Order to Show Cause. The court sees no reason to require a bond or stay the City's obligation to pay the Court Monitor. The City's request is therefore DENIED. Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 4/6/2012. (Lee, Tiffeny)
March 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 825 ORDER denying Plaintiffs' 534 Motion for Summary Judgment as to backpay liability; finding Plaintiffs have established aggregate gross wage backpay is in the amount of $128,696,803; granting City leave to amend its Answer to raise defense of failure of the duty to mitigate; granting joint request for the use of a definition of Non-Hire Claimant and Delayed-Hire Claimant and six additional hiring criteria; denying City's request for the use of additional criteria not agreed to by the other parties; selecting special masters and directing them to file affidavits required by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 53(3)(A-B); denying 817 City's motion to delay individual claims process; scheduling litigation management conference for March 22, 2012. Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 3/8/2012. (Townsend, Jesse)
February 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 802 ORDER denying 704 Uniformed Firefighters Association of Greater New York's first Motion to Intervene without prejudice; granting 789 Uniformed Firefighters Association of Greater New York's second Motion to Intervene; granting 776 Cit y of New York's Motion to to modify examination objection procedures; denying 771 Gregory Della Valle's Motion to Intervene; granting 797 Plaintiff-Intervenors' Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b). See attached Memorandum & Order for details. Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 2/1/2012. (Townsend, Jesse)
December 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 778 ORDER re 771 : An attorney claiming to represent a third party-Gregory Della Valle-has filed a letter request to intervene. (Letter Mot. (Docket Entry # 771) at 1.) The parties shall file written responses to this letter, advising the court whether the issues the letter references relate to this case and, if so, how the court should proceed. So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 12/14/2011. (Lee, Tiffeny)
December 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 765 ORDER: See attached Remedial Order and Partial Judgment, Permanent Injunction, and Order Appointing Court Monitor. This Order reflects the court's previous 741 Findings of Fact, 743 Memorandum & Order, and 758 Order Appointing Court Monit or. Court Monitor Mark S. Cohen has filed an 764 Affidavit pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 53(b)(3) and 28 U.S.C. § 455. Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 12/8/2011. (Chapuis, Emily) (Main Document 765 replaced on 12/8/2011) (Lee, Tiffeny).
November 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 758 ORDER APPOINTING COURT MONITOR: The court has appointed Mark S. Cohen to serve as the Court Monitor in this case. Please see attached. Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 11/9/2011. (Chapuis, Emily)
July 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 673 ORDER regarding the application forms for Exams 2000 and 2500. Please see attached. Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 7/13/2011. (Richardson, Ian)
July 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 665 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER GRANTING in part and DENYING in part 643 Plaintiff-Intervenors' MOTION to certify the Non-Hire Victim Subclass and Delayed-Hire Victim Subclass; GRANTING 655 the Injunctive Relief Subclass's MOTION to modify the cou rt's First Remedial Phase Class Certification Order to add additional subclass representatives; DENYING 575 Plaintiff-Intervenors' MOTION for Summary Judgment as to classwide compensatory damages for noneconomic losses; and ordering Plaintiff-Intervenors and the City to meet and confer regarding a bench trial on the characteristics of a firefighter's employment. Please see attached. Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 7/8/2011. (Richardson, Ian)
June 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 640 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER GRANTING in part and DENYING in part 615 Plaintiff-Intervenors' motion for continued class certification, with leave to file a motion to certify the non-hire victim and delayed-hire victim subclasses subject to the conditions imposed in this Opinion; DENYING 589 motion for permanent injunction, with leave to renew following trial; and setting a briefing and trial schedule. Please see attached. Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 6/6/2011. (Richardson, Ian)
October 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 569 PERMANENT INJUNCTION regarding Exam 6019. Please see attached. Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 10/19/2010. (Rosenbloom, Seth)
September 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 527 ORDER regarding interim hiring. Please see attached. Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 9/13/2010. (Murray, Sean)
September 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 523 ORDER regarding responses the the Special Master's Hiring Report. Please see attached. Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 9/7/2010. (Murray, Sean)
August 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 511 ORDER regarding conference before Special Master. Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 8/13/2010. (Murray, Sean)
August 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 505 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. Please see attached. Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 8/4/2010. (Murray, Sean)
July 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 496 ORDER regarding expert costs. Please see attached. Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 7/27/2010. (Murray, Sean)
July 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 494 ORDER granting in part and staying in part 485 Motion in Limine; denying 489 Motion in Limine; granting in part and staying in part 493 Motion in Limine. Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 7/19/2010. (Murray, Sean)
July 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 481 ORDER regarding Exam 6019 Hearing. Please see attached. Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 7/16/2010. (Murray, Sean)
July 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 471 ORDER regarding Exam 6019 Hearing. Please see attached. Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 7/12/2010. (Murray, Sean)
May 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 438 ORDER regarding Proposed Terms of Special Master Appointment. Please see attached. Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 5/19/2010. (Murray, Sean)
May 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 428 ORDER regarding appointment of a Special Master. Please see attached. Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 5/5/2010. (Murray, Sean)
March 31, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 415 ORDER denying 410 Letter Motion for Discovery. Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 3/31/2010. (Murray, Sean)
January 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 390 MEMORANDUM & ORDER addressing remedial-phase issues. Please see attached. SO ORDERED by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 1/21/2010.(Ross, Michael)
January 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 385 MEMORANDUM & ORDER GRANTING in part and DENYING in part 319 Motion for Summary Judgment, and GRANTING in part and DENYING in part 343 Motion for Summary Judgment. SO ORDERED by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 1/13/2010. (Murray, Sean)
September 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 327 MEMORANDUM & ORDER denying the UFA's 303 Motion to Intervene at this time without prejudice to the UFA renewing its motion with a response addressing the court's concerns. In the interim, the court shall permit the UFA to continue to participate in the case at the remedial phase as amicus curiae. Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 9/24/2009. (Lee, Tiffeny)
August 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 301 MEMORANDUM & ORDER granting 288 Motion to Set Aside and Motion to Compel. SO ORDERED by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 8/5/2009. (Ross, Michael)
July 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 294 MEMORANDUM & ORDER granting Summary Judgment for Plaintiff and Plaintiff-Intervenors. SO ORDERED by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 7/22/2009. (Ross, Michael)
January 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 231 MEMORANDUM & ORDER denying 155 Motion to Dismiss. SO ORDERED by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 1/28/2009. (Garaufis, Nicholas)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. City of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Elliot M. Schachner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?