Robinson v. Federal Bureau Of Prisons et al
Plaintiff: Jack Robinson
Defendant: Federal Bureau Of Prisons and United States Government
Case Number: 1:2008cv00902
Filed: February 22, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Office: Civil Rights: Other Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Lois Bloom
Presiding Judge: Nicholas G. Garaufis
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 133 MEMORANDUM & ORDER: The court ADOPTS the portion of the 132 Report and Recommendations addressing Jimenez's motion for summary judgment; accordingly, Jimenez's motion for summary judgment is GRANTED. Robinson's "Re-Submitted Revised Motion for Summary Judgment" is DENIED. Robinson's "Demand for Damages upon Finding for Summary Judgment against Defendants" is DENIED as moot. Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 3/26/2012. (c/m to pro se; fwd'd for jgm) (Lee, Tiffeny)
October 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER endorsed on doc.# 78 : As the Court has already granted the extension requested by defendants, plaintiff's opposition to the request is noted, but denied as moot. SO ORDERED. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom, on 10/19/2010) C/mailed. (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)
August 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER: By letter dated 7/28/2010, plaintiff moves for an order to compel defendant to produce certain documents. By letter dated 7/29/2010, counsel for defendant states that the documents at issue were sent to plaintiff's current address. Accord ingly, the Court denies plaintiff's 71 motion to compel. If plaintiff did not receive this delivery, he should contact FedEx and/or defendant's counsel. No hearing is necessary at this time. Therefore, plaintiff's 73 request is denied. Plaintiff must first contact defendant's counsel, not the Court to resolve discovery disputes. SO ORDERED. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom, on 8/17/2010) C/mailed. (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)
June 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER denying plaintiff's 68 motion to order "the government to depose all health care providers." Plaintiff should serve his request on defendant's counsel, not the Court. Defendant's 69 request for an extension to 7/18/10 to serve initial disclosures on plaintiff is granted. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 6/24/2010. C/M (Manuel, Germaine)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robinson v. Federal Bureau Of Prisons et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Bureau Of Prisons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Government
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?