United States of America v. Pace Chesir et al

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Pace Chesir, New York State Dept. of Taxation & Finance and Morton Coleman
Case Number: 1:2008cv02552
Filed: June 26, 2008
Court: New York Eastern District Court
Office: Taxes Office
County: Kings
Referring Judge: Steven M. Gold
Presiding Judge: Eric N. Vitaliano
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Plaintiff
Jury Demanded By: 26:6702 IRS: Refund of Income Tax Penalty

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 22, 2016 97 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, For the foregoing reasons, Chabbott's motion to vacate the Court's 1/20/15 order, which vacated the 6/26/14 revised order approving the foreclosure sale, is granted. Chesir's motion to vacate the 6/26/14 order is denied. The gov't is directed to submit a revised order approving the foreclosure sale, setting a new date for Chesir to vacate the premises, providing for eviction if he fails to vacate, surcharging the costs of any eviction proceeding against Chesir's share of the proceeds and providing for the distribution of the balance of the proceeds from the sale in accordance with the 11/8/11 order of foreclosure and sale. The Clerk of Court is directed to maintain this action on the docket of closed cases for administrative purposes. (Ordered by Judge Eric N. Vitaliano on 3/19/2016) c/m (Galeano, Sonia)
June 29, 2012 53 Opinion or Order of the Court DECISION AND ORDER. See attached order for details. Ordered by Judge Eric N. Vitaliano on 6/28/2012. (Siegfried, Evan)
July 25, 2011 23 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: The Court finds Chief Magistrate Judge Gold's R&R to be correct, comprehensive, well-reasoned, and free of any clear error. The Court, therefore, adopts the R&R in its entirety as the opinion of the Court. Accordingly, for the reasons stated in the R&R, the government is awarded $321,023.68 in unpaid assessed taxes and $392,929.58 in penalties and interest, for a total of $713,953.26. Additionally, the government is awarded additional interest on the $713,953.26, to be calculated by the Clerk of the Court at the § 6621 rate, beginning from February 5, 2010 through the date of judgment. Finally, the government's applications for an order declaring its lien and an order of foreclosure and sale are granted. Proposed orders are to be submitted promptly for the Court's consideration. Ordered by Judge Eric N. Vitaliano on 7/20/2011. (Fwd'd for judgment) (Brucella, Michelle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Pace Chesir et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Bartholomew Cirenza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pace Chesir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York State Dept. of Taxation & Finance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morton Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?