Ciliberti v. International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers local 3 et al
Plaintiff: Vincent Ciliberti
Defendant: International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers local 3 and Austin McCann
Case Number: 1:2008cv04262
Filed: October 20, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Office: Civil Rights: Jobs Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Cheryl L. Pollak
Presiding Judge: David G. Trager
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1331 Fed. Question

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MEMORANDUM & ORDER: For the reasons set forth above, defendants' motion for summary judgment as to plaintiff's claim against the Union is granted. The Court declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over plaintiff's state law claim against McCann. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 7/10/2012. (fwd'd for jgm) (Lee, Tiffeny)
March 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: For the reasons stated at oral argument and summarized in this Memorandum and Order, defendants' motions to dismiss under FRCP 12(b)(1) and (6) are denied. Ordered by Senior Judge Frederic Block on 3/11/2011. (Chee, Alvin)
August 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER re 12 . Plaintiff shall serve and file his amended complaint within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this order. Once plaintiff files an amended complaint, the pending motion to dismiss will be denied as moot. Defendants shall respond wi thin twenty-eight (28) days of being served with the amended complaint. If defendants wish to file a motion in lieu of an answer, defendants need not file any pre-motion conference letter prior to filing the motion. Ordered by Senior Judge David G. Trager on 8/3/2009. (Terranova, Robert).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ciliberti v. International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers local 3 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent Ciliberti
Represented By: Michael J. Borrelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers local 3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Austin McCann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?