Tropp v. Conair Corporation et al
Plaintiff: David A. Tropp
Defendant: Conair Corporation, Brookstone, Inc., Briggs & Riley Travelware LLC, Delsey Luggage Inc., Ebags, Inc., Eagle Creek, Inc., Fortune Brands, Inc., HP Marketing Corp. Ltd., L.C. Industries, LLC, Outpac Designs Inc., Magellan's International Travel Corporation, Samsonite Corporation, Titan Luggage USA, Travelpro International Inc., Tumi, Inc., Victorinox Swiss Army, Inc. and Defendant Wordlock, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2008cv04446
Filed: November 3, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Office: Brooklyn Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Roanne L. Mann
Presiding Judge: Eric N. Vitaliano
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 360 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, For the reasons that follow, Travel Sentry's 216 Motion for Summary Judgment on non-infringement (in the first action) is granted; deft's 312 motions for summary judgment on non-infringement (in the second action) is granted; Tropp's cross motions for infringement are denied in both actions; and the 239 Motions to strike in both actions are denied as moot. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgments accordingly and close these cases. (So Ordered by Judge Eric N. Vitaliano on 6/19/2016) c/m Fwd. for Judgment. (Galeano, Sonia)
April 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 278 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying in substantial part 274 Motion for Reconsideration. As set forth in the attached Memorandum and Order, the Court concludes that Tropp has not sustained his heavy burden to establish that the Court erred in concluding, in its 3/20/13 M&O, that he is not entitled to the lengthy discovery schedule proposed by him (which would delay motion practice until 2014). The Court will, however, exercise its discretion to allow the parties a modest amount of additional time in both cases to serve and discover information concerning events occurring since the District Court ruled on the motions for summary judgment in 2010. In addition, the parties in both cases are directed to file, by April 23, 2013, stipulations that Tropp's infringement claims may be deemed to include inducement as well as direct infringement. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 4/16/2013.(Williams, Jennifer)
February 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 255 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. Ordered by Judge Eric N. Vitaliano on 2/22/2012. (Siegfried, Evan)
August 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 242 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: Tropp's claims are barred by collateral estoppel and are dismissed with prejudice. Ordered by Judge Eric N. Vitaliano on 8/5/2011. (Fwd'd for judgment) (Brucella, Michelle)
July 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 210 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying, without prejudice 176 Motion to Compel; denying as moot 205 and 206 Motion to Compel. Defendant shall have until July 8, 2010, to file any objection to plaintiff's motion to extend discovery. Travel Sentry shall have until July 6, 2010 to address plaintiff's discovery issues. The ADR Clerk shall schedule mediation promptly. (Mann, Roanne)
April 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 180 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 176 Motion to Compel; denying as moot 178 Motion to Appear by Telephone. For the reasons stated in this Memorandum and Order, the defense response to the motion is not due until April 15, 2010. Under these circumsta nces, it does not make sense to proceed with the settlement conference until the discovery disputes have been resolved and defendants have made the requisite disclosures. Accordingly, Fridays settlement conference is adjourned sine die. The request of certain defendants to appear by telephone at the conference is denied as moot. the parties apparently have not agreed on a stipulated proposed confidentiality order, and this dispute has been impeding discovery. The parties are directed to conf er in good faith and, by April 19, 2010, to file via ECF a confidentiality agreement to be so-ordered by the Court or, if counsel are unable to reach agreement, each party's proposed confidentiality order and an explanation as to why the Court should approve that order as opposed to opposing counsel's proposal. (Maynard, Pat)
March 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 73 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: For the reasons stated in this Memorandum and Order, this Court concludes that no purpose would be served by proceeding with the initial conference on April 3rd, only two days after Judge Vitaliano will be provided with a comple te set of papers on the motion for a stay. Therefore, absent further order of the Court, the initial conference is adjourned to May 4, 2009, at 11:30 a.m. The remaining obligations imposed on the parties by the Court's February 20th order are subject to corresponding extensions of time. Plaintiff will not be unfairly prejudiced by this brief adjournment. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 3/17/2009. (Maynard, Pat)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tropp v. Conair Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David A. Tropp
Represented By: Ronald D. Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conair Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brookstone, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Briggs & Riley Travelware LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delsey Luggage Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ebags, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eagle Creek, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fortune Brands, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HP Marketing Corp. Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L.C. Industries, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Outpac Designs Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Magellan's International Travel Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsonite Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Titan Luggage USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelpro International Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tumi, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victorinox Swiss Army, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Defendant Wordlock, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?