Gao et al v. Perfect Team Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Li Rong Gao and Xiao Hong Zheng
Defendant: Cheuk Ping Chen, Chun Kit Cheng, Ji Shiang, Inc., Feng Lin, Perfect Team Corporation and Jia Li Wang
Case Number: 1:2010cv01637
Filed: April 13, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Office: Brooklyn Office
Presiding Judge: Cheryl L. Pollak
Presiding Judge: Eric N. Vitaliano
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 336 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: In line with the foregoing, on her motion for attorney's fees and costs, Gao is awarded (1)attorney's fees in the amount of $173,287.01 from the Perfect Team Defendants and $46,946.00 fr om Ji Shiang and (2) costs in the amount of $8258.93 from the Perfect Team Defendants and $1081.00 from Ji Shiang. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment in favor of Gao (1) against the Perfect Team Defendants, that is. Perfect Te am Corporation, Chun Kit Cheng 2md Jia Li Wang, jointly and severally, in the amount of $250,431.64. comprising $22,619.69 in sanctions, $46,266.01 in damages and $181,545.94 in attorney's fees and costs, and (2) against Ji S hiang, Inc. in the amount of $78.354.35. comprising of $25,141.19 in sanctions, $5186.16 in damages and $48,027 in attorney's fees and costs. See (Sanctions Order, ECF No. 233; Summary Judgment Mem. &Order 34, ECF No. 282; Di smissal Mem. & Order, ECF No. 296; Damages Mem. & Order, ECF No. 301). With regard to the portion of the judgment representing amounts recoverable under NYLL § 663(1), that is, (1) the damages on Gao's NYLL claims ($27,304.31 for the P erfect Team Defendants and $2881.20 for Ji Shiang, Inc.) and (2) the attorney's fees and costs ($181,545.94 for the Perfect Team Defendants and $48,027.00 for Ji Shiang, Inc.), "if any amounts remain unpaid upon the expiratio n of ninety days following issuance of judgment, or ninety days after expiration of the time to appeal and no appeal therefrom is then pending. Whichever is later," that portion ($208,850.25 for the Perfect Team Defendants and $50,908. 20 for Ji Shiang, Inc.) "shall automatically increase by fifteen percent." NYLL § 663(4). The Clerk of Court is directed to close this case for administrative purposes. So Ordered by Judge Eric N. Vitaliano on 5/5/2017. (FWD for Judgment) (Almonte, Giselle)
April 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 301 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS, With notice given, no party has filed objections to the R&R, and the time in which to do so has, again, expired. In line with the foregoing, Magistrate Judge Pollak's report and recommendation, dated 2/ 9/16, is adopted in its entirety as the opinion of the Court. Pltff is ordered to, within two weeks of the entry of this memorandum and order on the docket, file her request, if any, for attorneys' fees and costs. That matter is respectfully referred to Magistrate Judge Pollak for a report and recommendation as to her findings. (Ordered by Judge Eric N. Vitaliano on 4/09/2016) c/m (Galeano, Sonia)
February 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 296 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, For the foregoing reasons, pltff's request to dismiss the sole disputed remaining claim is granted, the objection of the Perfect Team Defts is overruled, and that claim is indeed dismissed under Rule 41(a)(2). As noted earl ier, this matter has been respectfully referred to Magistrate Judge Pollak for a report and recommendation as to the calculation of pltff's statutory damages, attorneys' fees, and costs. Consideration of those matters may now proceed without impediment. (Ordered by Judge Eric N. Vitaliano on 1/29/16) c/m (Galeano, Sonia)
May 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 248 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: Accordingly, as recommended by Judge Pollak: (1) the Perfect Team defendants are ordered to pay plaintiff $22,619.69, representing $22,507.31 in attorney's fees and $112.3 8 in costs, and the Ji Shiang defendants are ordered to pay plaintiff $25,141.19, representing $25,028.81 in attorney's fees and $112.38 in costs,within 10 calendar days of the date this Order is entered on the docket; and (2) fai lure to comply shall serve as grounds for finding defendants in contempt of Court and subject them to possible civil and criminal penalties. These penalties may include the striking of their answer and the entry of judgment for plaintiff on default. Further, the Clerk of Court is directed to amend the caption of this case to reflect the voluntary dismissal with prejudice of plaintiff Zheng's claims, as well as the voluntary dismissal of claims against defendant Chen. Ordered by Judge Eric N. Vitaliano on 5/28/2014. (Fernandez, Erica)
December 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 233 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. As recommended by Magistrate Judge Pollak: (1) the Perfect Team defendants are ordered to pay plaintiffs a total of $22,619.69, representing $22,507.31 in attorney's fees and $112.38 in co sts; (2) the Ji Shiang defendants are ordered to pay plaintiffs $25,141.19, representing $25,028.81 in attorney's fees and $112.38 in costs; and (3) plaintiffs' proposed adverse inference is approved and will be considered when this case is submitted for determination. Ordered by Judge Eric N. Vitaliano on 12/31/2013. (Hanly, Elizabeth)
January 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 184 Motion for Sanctions. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 1/28/2013. (Klein, Jennifer)
August 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 146 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: Plaintiffs have failed to meet their burden in demonstrating that defendants have assigned, disposed of, encumbered, or secreted property (or are about to) with the intent to defraud creditors or frustrate the enforcement of a judgment that might be rendered in their favor. Accordingly, the motion for attachment is denied at this time. Ordered by Judge Eric N. Vitaliano on 8/11/2011. (Brucella, Michelle)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gao et al v. Perfect Team Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheuk Ping Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chun Kit Cheng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ji Shiang, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Feng Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perfect Team Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jia Li Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Li Rong Gao
Represented By: David Andrew Colodny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xiao Hong Zheng
Represented By: David Andrew Colodny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?