Steinberg v. Mount Sinai Medical Center, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Menachem Steinberg
Defendant: City of New York, Hatzolah of Williamsburg, Inc., John and Jane Does 1-20, John and Jane Roes 1-20, Mount Sinai Medical Center, Inc. and New York City Administration for Children's Services
Case Number: 1:2012cv00051
Filed: January 5, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Office: Brooklyn Office
Presiding Judge: James Orenstein
Presiding Judge: Sandra L. Townes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 115 MEMORANDUM & ORDER denying in part and granting in part the City's 112 application for costs. The costs incurred during the deposition are not taxable, but the docketing fees are properly allocated to Plaintiff. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to enter $20 in costs to the City pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §§ 1920 and 1923. Ordered by Judge Sandra L. Townes on 2/15/2017. (Barrett, C)
November 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 107 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: New York City's motion for summary judgment on M.S.'s § 1983 claims is granted. The motion to amend the complaint to add, as defendants, specific municipal employees is denied. The Court declines to exercise sup plemental jurisdiction over the remaining claims, and those claims are accordingly dismissed without prejudice against all parties. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to enter judgment and close the case. Ordered by Judge Sandra L. Townes on 11/8/2016. (Brucella, Michelle)
March 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER. For the reasons stated in the attached memorandum and order, the Court will release a redacted version of the NJ DCF records to the Parties via ECF. The documents will be filed under seal so that they are accessible only to the Parties via counsel and the Court. The Parties' use of these documents is subject to the terms of the 60 Confidentiality Order dated March 31, 2014. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 3/31/2014. (Rice, Liane)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Steinberg v. Mount Sinai Medical Center, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hatzolah of Williamsburg, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Does 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Roes 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mount Sinai Medical Center, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York City Administration for Children's Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Menachem Steinberg
Represented By: Elliot B. Pasik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?