Perpall et al v. Wheeler et al
Plaintiff: Barbara Ann Perpall and Paul U. Perpall
Defendant: William Stilphen and Richard A. Wheeler
Case Number: 1:2012cv00336
Filed: January 24, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Office: Brooklyn Office
Presiding Judge: Nicholas G. Garaufis
Presiding Judge: Roanne L. Mann
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER: For the reasons stated in the attached, the parties' motions [97,100] are denied and Plaintiffs will not be permitted to add a claim of negligent entrustment against Defendant Stilphen. The parties shall submit their proposed stipulation and Second Amended Joint Pretrial Order by June 22, 2018. The Court shall hold a pre-trial conference on July 10, 2018 at 2:00 p.m. Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 5/25/2018. (Hess, Alexandra)
May 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 82 Motion for Discovery. Plaintiff must be produced for a further deposition, on a mutually convenient date no later than May 26, 2017, to be examined about the facts surrounding the two falls and the co nsequences thereof. Defendants may, by June 19, 2017, serve a supplemental report from their expert opining on the significance of these falls vis-a-vis plaintiff's injuries. However, as defendants have not provided any evidentiary submission regarding the expert's need for a further independent medical examination, that aspect of defendants' motion is denied without prejudice. See attached for further discussion. Ordered by Chief Mag. Judge Roanne L. Mann on 5/11/2017. (Proujansky, Josh)
March 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 73 Motion for Summary Judgment: For the reasons stated in the attached Memorandum & Order, Defendants' motion for summary judgment is GRANTED with respect to Plaintiffs claims based on injuries to Pe rpall's shoulders and neck, and her claims of serious injury under the categories of fracture, 90/180 category, and significant disfigurement, but DENIED as to Plaintiffs' claims based on Perpall's back injuries. Furthermore, in order to recover non-economic damages, Perpall must show that any back injuries she suffered were "serious" and qualify as "permanent consequential limitation" or "significant limitations" as defined under New York Insurance Law. The parties shall file an Amended Joint Pretrial Order by May 11, 2017. Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 3/27/2017. (Lee, Helen)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perpall et al v. Wheeler et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Ann Perpall
Represented By: Lester B. Herzog
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul U. Perpall
Represented By: Lester B. Herzog
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Stilphen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard A. Wheeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?