Tummino et al v. Hamburg et al
Plaintiff: Angelica Jaffe, Robert Jaffe, Catherine Lederer-Plaskett, Erin T. Mahoney, Kelly Mangan, Gabrielle Marks, Jonathan Marks, National Latina Institute for Reproductive Health, Stephanie Seguin, Lori Tinney, Annie Tummino, Francie Hunt, Association of Reproductive Health Professionals, Jennifer Brown, Candace Churchill, Aurora DeMarco and Carol Giardina
Defendant: Kathleen Sebelius and Margaret Hamburg
Intervenor: Teva Women's Health, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2012cv00763
Filed: February 16, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Office: Brooklyn Office
Presiding Judge: Edward R. Korman
Presiding Judge: Viktor V. Pohorelsky
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 106 MEMORANDUM re 103 Letter filed by Margaret Hamburg, Kathleen Sebelius. Entered by Judge Edward R. Korman on 6/12/2013. (Casteel, Heather)
May 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER denying 91 Motion to Stay. A temporary stay is granted pending the hearing or submission of the defendants' motion for a stay in the Court of Appeals. Ordered by Judge Edward R. Korman on 5/10/2013. (Casteel, Heather)
April 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 86 MEMORANDUM & ORDER granting in part and denying in part 22 Motion to Intervene. So Ordered by Judge Edward R. Korman on 4/4/2013. (Lee, Tiffeny)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tummino et al v. Hamburg et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angelica Jaffe
Represented By: Andrea H Costello
Represented By: Janet Crepps
Represented By: Suzanne Ilene Novak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Jaffe
Represented By: Andrea H Costello
Represented By: Janet Crepps
Represented By: Suzanne Ilene Novak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine Lederer-Plaskett
Represented By: Andrea H Costello
Represented By: Janet Crepps
Represented By: Suzanne Ilene Novak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erin T. Mahoney
Represented By: Kirsten Clanton
Represented By: Andrea H Costello
Represented By: Janet Crepps
Represented By: Suzanne Ilene Novak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Mangan
Represented By: Kirsten Clanton
Represented By: Andrea H Costello
Represented By: Janet Crepps
Represented By: Suzanne Ilene Novak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabrielle Marks
Represented By: Andrea H Costello
Represented By: Janet Crepps
Represented By: Suzanne Ilene Novak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Marks
Represented By: Andrea H Costello
Represented By: Janet Crepps
Represented By: Suzanne Ilene Novak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Latina Institute for Reproductive Health
Represented By: Andrea H Costello
Represented By: Janet Crepps
Represented By: Suzanne Ilene Novak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Seguin
Represented By: Kirsten Clanton
Represented By: Andrea H Costello
Represented By: Janet Crepps
Represented By: Suzanne Ilene Novak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori Tinney
Represented By: Kirsten Clanton
Represented By: Andrea H Costello
Represented By: Janet Crepps
Represented By: Suzanne Ilene Novak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annie Tummino
Represented By: Kirsten Clanton
Represented By: Andrea H Costello
Represented By: Janet Crepps
Represented By: Suzanne Ilene Novak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francie Hunt
Represented By: Kirsten Clanton
Represented By: Andrea H Costello
Represented By: Janet Crepps
Represented By: Suzanne Ilene Novak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Association of Reproductive Health Professionals
Represented By: Suzanne Ilene Novak
Represented By: Janet Crepps
Represented By: Andrea H Costello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Brown
Represented By: Suzanne Ilene Novak
Represented By: Janet Crepps
Represented By: Andrea H Costello
Represented By: Kirsten Clanton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Candace Churchill
Represented By: Suzanne Ilene Novak
Represented By: Janet Crepps
Represented By: Andrea H Costello
Represented By: Kirsten Clanton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aurora DeMarco
Represented By: Andrea H Costello
Represented By: Janet Crepps
Represented By: Suzanne Ilene Novak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Giardina
Represented By: Kirsten Clanton
Represented By: Andrea H Costello
Represented By: Janet Crepps
Represented By: Suzanne Ilene Novak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen Sebelius
Represented By: F. Franklin Amanat
Represented By: Eric B. Beckenhauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margaret Hamburg
Represented By: F. Franklin Amanat
Represented By: Eric B. Beckenhauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Teva Women's Health, Inc.
Represented By: Steven Menashi
Represented By: Michael Shumsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?