Spiteri v. Camacho et al
Plaintiff: Carmel Spiteri
Defendant: Unknown Several Law Emforcement Personnel for Ventura County, State of California, Unknown Several Law Enforcement Personnel fir Riverside County, State of California, Unknown Several Law Enforcement Personnel Sonoma County, State of California, Michael C. Green, Michelle Mulligan, New York State Division of Criminal Justice System, New York State Sex Offender Board of Examiners, Eric Charles Rosenbaum, John Russo, Sex Offender Monitoring Unit of the New York City Police Department's Special Victims Division, Arthur G. Trakas, Andrew M. Cuomo, Does 1 throu 25, Inclusive, Judith V. Condo, Richard A. Brown and Fernando Camacho
Case Number: 1:2012cv02780
Filed: May 31, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Office: Brooklyn Office
Presiding Judge: Margo K. Brodie
Presiding Judge: Roanne L. Mann
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER granting 131 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting 135 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting 138 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying 149 Motion for Leave to Appeal in form a pauperis; denying 63 MOTION for Permanent Injunction. For the reasons set forth within the attached Memorandum and Order, the State Defendants' motion to dismiss the Complaint is granted and the Complaint is dismissed with prejudice in its entirety as to all the State Defendants Governor Andrew Cuomo, Judge Fernando Camacho, Michelle Harrington, Michelle Mulligan and New York State. In addition, Plaintiff's application for injunctive and declaratory relief as to the State De fendants is denied. The Attorney Defendants' motions to dismiss as to Plaintiff's federal claims RICO, RICO conspiracy and FLSA is granted and these claims are dismissed with prejudice. The Court declines to exercise supplemental jurisd iction over Plaintiff's state law claims for unjust enrichment, fraud, deceit and misrepresentation, fraudulent concealment, legal malpractice, unpaid wages, unpaid overtime and spread of hours and these claims are dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiff's remaining motion to strike is denied and his motion for the court to take judicial notice of various documents is denied. Ordered by Judge Margo K. Brodie on 9/7/2013. (Thomas, Alora)
January 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 119 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re 110 and 111 . For the reasons set within the attached Memorandum and Order, the State Defendants are ordered to file Exhibit C under seal and to redact any information in its papers that rely on information contained in Ex hibit C. Plaintiffs request to strike the exhibits and statements contained in the papers submitted by the State Defendants in support of their motion is denied. Plaintiffs request that this Court command the State Defendants to provide statistical data is also denied. Ordered by Judge Margo K. Brodie on 1/14/2013. (Thomas, Alora) (Main Document 119 replaced on 1/14/2013) (Francis, Ogoro).
January 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 117 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re 105 Letter filed by Carmel Spiteri. For the reasons set forth within the attached Memorandum and Order, the Court declines to modify its earlier decisions. Ordered by Judge Margo K. Brodie on 1/9/2013. (Thomas, Alora)
November 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 101 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. For the reasons set forth within the attached opinion, Plaintiffs request to amend the complaint is denied. If Plaintiff believes amendment would cure any of the deficiencies in the complaint raised in the Defendants motions to dismiss papers, Plaintiff is granted leave to renew his request to amend the complaint in regard to those deficiencies in his opposition papers to the motions to dismiss. Ordered by Judge Margo K. Brodie on 11/30/2012. (Thomas, Alora)
November 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 89 MEMORANDUM & ORDER. For the reasons set forth within the attached memorandum and order, Plaintiff has not properly served Governor Cuomo. Plaintiff's application for an extension of time to serve Governor Cuomo is granted. Plaintiff shall have 14 days from the date of this order to properly serve Governor Cuomo. Ordered by Judge Margo K. Brodie on 11/6/2012. (Thomas, Alora)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spiteri v. Camacho et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Several Law Emforcement Personnel for Ventura County, State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Several Law Enforcement Personnel fir Riverside County, State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Several Law Enforcement Personnel Sonoma County, State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael C. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Mulligan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York State Division of Criminal Justice System
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York State Sex Offender Board of Examiners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Charles Rosenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Russo
Represented By: John L. Russo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sex Offender Monitoring Unit of the New York City Police Department's Special Victims Division
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur G. Trakas
Represented By: John L. Russo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Cuomo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 throu 25, Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judith V. Condo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard A. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fernando Camacho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmel Spiteri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?