Super Express USA Publishing Corp., et al v. Spring Publishing Corp., et al

Plaintiff: Presspublica SP. Z O.O., Repropol-Polish Association of Publishers and Super Express USA Publishing Corp.
Defendant: Andrzej Czuj, Janusz Czuj and Spring Publishing Corp.
Case Number: 1:2013cv02814
Filed: May 10, 2013
Court: New York Eastern District Court
Office: Brooklyn Office
Presiding Judge: Dora Lizette Irizarry
Referring Judge: James Orenstein
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 30, 2018 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 54 Motion for Default Judgment; denying 75 Motion for Damages; adopting in part Report and Recommendations as to 88 Report and Recommendations -- On February 23, 2018, the Hon. James Orenstein, U.S.M.J., issued a Report and Re commendations ("R & R") on Plaintiffs' motions for default judgment against defendant Spring Publishing Corp. ("Spring") and for damages against all defendants. Defendants timely objected and Plaintiffs did not respond to De fendants' objections. Upon due consideration and review, for the reasons discussed in the ATTACHED WRITTEN MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, Defendants' objections to the R&R are overruled in part and sustained in part, and the remainder of the R& R is adopted and modified as follows: Defendants' objection with respect to the magistrate judge's recommendation that Plaintiffs had not shown exclusive copyright is overruled; Defendants' objection with respect to the magistrate jud ge's recommendation that the Court award statutory damages is sustained; and Defendants' objection to the magistrate judge's determination that hypothetical licensing fees provide some approximation of actual damages is overruled in li ght of the recommendation that the Court not award actual damages, which recommendation this Court adopts. The R&R is adopted in all other respects and modified to the extent that no statutory damages are awarded to Plaintiffs. In sum, Plaintiffs w ill not be awarded damages. However, Plaintiffs are entitled to injunctive relief. As such, they are to submit for the Court's approval and endorsement a Permanent Injunction on or before April 30, 2018. Closure of this case is held in abeyance pending this Court's endorsement of the Permanent Injunction. SO ORDERED by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 3/30/2018. (Irizarry, Dora)
February 23, 2018 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 85 Motion for Sanctions. For the reasons set forth in the attached document, I deny the plaintiffs' motion for sanctions. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 2/23/2018. (Orenstein, James)
March 24, 2017 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 65 Motion for Summary Judgment -- For the reasons set forth in the ATTACHED WRITTEN OPINION AND ORDER, Plaintiff Repropol is dismissed from this case for lack of standing to proceed. In addition, Plaint iffs' motion for summary judgment is granted as to their copyright infringement claim and otherwise is denied. The parties are directed to contact U.S. Magistrate Judge James Orenstein's chambers within two weeks of the date of this Opinio n and Order to schedule a settlement conference. If settlement discussions are unsuccessful, within fourteen (14) days of the final settlement conference, Plaintiffs shall file their motion for damages, which must include at least the following: (i ) a chart, listing each instance of alleged copyright infringement; (ii) the exact amount of damages Plaintiffs seek; and (iii) case law supporting Plaintiffs' damages request. The chart shall be accompanied by: (a) a declaration or declaratio ns authenticating Plaintiffs ownership over each work and providing the legal and factual basis for the ownership claim; and (b) copies of, or the internet location of, each of Plaintiffs' works, and copies of, or the internet location of, the c orresponding infringing articles from Polska Gazeta. Within thirty (30) days of the final settlement conference, if settlement is unsuccessful, the parties must submit for the district judge's approval their Joint Pretrial Order. The Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate Plaintiff Repropol on the caption in this case. SO ORDERED by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 3/24/2017. (Irizarry, Dora)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Super Express USA Publishing Corp., et al v. Spring Publishing Corp., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrzej Czuj
Represented By: Garth Molander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janusz Czuj
Represented By: Garth Molander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spring Publishing Corp.
Represented By: Garth Molander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Presspublica SP. Z O.O.
Represented By: Paul Thomas Sabaj
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Repropol-Polish Association of Publishers
Represented By: Paul Thomas Sabaj
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Super Express USA Publishing Corp.
Represented By: Paul Thomas Sabaj
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?