Jones v. Brooklyn Hospital et al
Plaintiff: Jermaine Jones
Defendant: New York City Police Department, County of Kings, City of New York and Brooklyn Hospital
Case Number: 1:2013cv03504
Filed: June 19, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Office: Brooklyn Office
Presiding Judge: Roslynn R. Mauskopf
Presiding Judge: Viktor V. Pohorelsky
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. The complaint is dismissed without prejudice. The Clerk of the Court is directed to enter judgment accordingly, close this case, and mail copies of this Memorandum and Order, and the accompanying Judgment to pltf. at the address the docket list for him. The Court certifies pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for purposes of an appeal. Ordered by Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf on 1/13/2014. (Greene, Donna)
October 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting 8 Motion to Amend/Correct/Supplement; denying 8 Motion to Appoint Counsel: For the reasons set forth in the attached Memorandum and Order,the Court denies plaintiff's motion for reconsideration, and grants plaintiff an exte nsion of time until November 25, 2013 to file an amended complaint. Should plaintiff fail to make such filing, the Court will dismiss this action without prejudice. The Clerk of Court shall mail a copy of this Memorandum and Order to plaintiff and note the mailing on the docket. Ordered by Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf on 10/1/2013. (Mauskopf, Roslynn)
August 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and DISMISSING Complaint with leave to amend: For the reasons set forth in the attached Memorandum and Order, plaintiff's claims against Brooklyn Hospital Center, the City of New York, New York City Police Department and County of Kings are DISMISSED pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B). Plaintiff is granted thirty days from the date of this Order to submit an amended complaint as detailed above. No summons shall issu e at this time and all further proceedings shall be stayed for thirty days. If plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint within the allotted time, an order dismissing this action without prejudice shall be entered. The Court certifies pursuant t o 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for purpose of an appeal. The Clerk of Court shall mail a copy of this Order to plaintiff and note the mailing on the docket. Ordered by Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf on 8/5/2013. (Mauskopf, Roslynn)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Brooklyn Hospital et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York City Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Kings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brooklyn Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jermaine Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?