Oakley et al v. Servisair, LLC et al
Plaintiff: ANDRE GRIERSON, Douglas Levy, CHRISTOPHER MATTISON, JAMES DUNCAN, GREENDIGE ANDRE, MAYRA TRUJILLO, GARY SWAN, JOSE SANCHEZ MOYA, ANDRE DWAYNE DALEY, INOBERT DULCIO, WALLACE LUKE, GILBERTO MERCADO, JEFFREY THURSBY, GREGORY RAMSEY, DESDMONA MOSS, JOSNEL JOASSAINT, JOSE DE LA CRUZ, MARCELINE LOUIS CHARLES, HAROLD ROBERSON, JEAN CARENAN, Jorge Rodriguez, William Myers, JANETTE COLTER, Asuncion Corona, Stephanie Mendoza, WILMA ROMAN, RAFAEL CUAN, ENCEAU FATAL, MARC PIERRE, CARLOS FREYTES, HARRY M DAUTNUCHE, RAPHAEL MCLEOD, PATRICK BECKFORD, EMMANUEL LAURENT, MARCKENSON STVIL, CARLOS NEIRA, JEAN MOISES DELY, JUAN R GUZMAN, Garette Rockhead, BONNY NESLY, PHILLIP CAMPBELL, DARIO CORDERO, NICARDO HANSON, Fred Joseph, SERENA HALL, CLIVE OUTAR, JUANY JEAN LOUIS, GEORGE HARRIS, Vincent Williams, OMAR PHILLIPS, DENNIS DOLTAN, Josette Jones, MIGUEL ORDONEZ, MARK DAVIDSON, DUALEXTE SEWETEUS, RAFAEL PEREZ, Francisco Ortega, ISABEL RIVERA, JEAN LOUIS BAEAUVILET, Carlos W Prado, RUDOLPH BAILEY, ANTONIO E RODRIGUEZ, JOHN GRAY, FERNANDO HART, RICHEMANE ACADO, LACHHMAN SIEUNARINE, DEMETRIUS GIRLIE, KENNETH RAMJHON, Carlos Prado, Jr, ANGEL VAZQUEZ, EGBERT PRICE, WHITT LASEY, RODOLFO LOPEZ, RENE VERDEZA, ROBERTO PARRA, MANUEL MATALLANA, MEKONEN WELDERMARIAM, JOSEPH L. DESAMOIURS, GEORGE BREWSTER, CHARLES DULCIO, BRODERICK MIDDLEBROOK, Chaiyaporn Chalumporn, Larry Marcelus, ANTHONY ELDERFIELD, WILFREDO LOPEZ, MIGUEL ALARCON, DONORAN NELSON, BLOOBENS EDON, DEWONE L CURRIN, KENNY DAWSON, EDUARDO URQUESA, KENNNETH WAYNE JORDAN, Jose M Urena, WILSON LORA GRULLON, Miguel A. Iniguez, GARDFIELD GRAY, ROBERTO A TOBAR, FRANKLIN GONZALEZ, JEAN RICHARD, SYLVESTRE RODRIGUEZ, QUINTIN YEARBY, TIMOTHY GREEN, JONATHAN SILVA, Daniel Garland, VILMES JUSMA, RONALD MCCLAIN, EDWARD BOOTH, GEOVANNI MORALES, JONATHAN PRICE, KEVIN MANGAROO, JOHN HOBBS, CARLOS PEREZ, GILBERT GORDON, ELIECER COMPANIONI, PHILIPPE DAVIDSON, MICHAEL BLAKE, LOUIS G JEAN, Tammy Canty, JOSEPH VENUS, FREDDIE MORRIS, FITZROY DEWAR, ANTHONY GORDON, ROBERT WALKER, KIM GLOVER, LUIS SERRANO, LARRY JACKSON, CARLOS GUZMAN, MOHAMED AZELMAD, DUNCAN COLLIN, Adolphus Jordan, Jr., LAZARO RAMOS, Jose Oakley, LUCY MARTINEZ, MOHAMED ADERDOUR, Cesar Perez, DENNIS BELLAMY, KENNETH MORRISON, TOMAS HERNANDEZ, MARK PHILLIPS, SANDLY BIEN-AINE, RAYMOND ZIELINSKI, DELVA CLODOMIR, YUSI COMMINGS, ALLAN R. STERLING, ROSA COLON, ERIBERTO GONZALEZ, JOSE A GONZALEZ, VICENTE AGUILAR, JAMEL R WESTON, RAYMOND SALAZAR, CRESANTO BECK, WILNER SAINTIL, JAMES HOGG, FILIBERT DESROSIN, YDY RAMON DIAZ PAULINO and Antony C Samuel
Defendant: Derichbourg Multiservices, SWISSPORT CARGO SERVICES, L.P., SWISSPORT LOUNGE, LLC,, Matt Ellingson, SWISSPORT CARGO SERVICES, INC., Derichebourg SA, SWISSPORT INTERNATIONAL, LTD., SWISSPORT, U.S.A., INC, Servisair, LLC and SWISSPORT FUELING, INC.
Case Number: 1:2013cv04191
Filed: July 23, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Office: Brooklyn Office
Presiding Judge: Sanket J Bulsara
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Stipulation and Order: In light of the parties Stipulation of Dismissal #338 , the above caption is hereby closed. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 2/21/2019. (Manson, Eddie)
January 7, 2019 Filing 338 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Jose Oakley (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Shavitz, Gregg)
November 6, 2018 Filing 337 STATUS REPORT by Jose Oakley (Shavitz, Gregg)
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER: Motion for Extension of Time to File #336 is granted. The Parties to the settlement agreement are directed to file a Stipulation of Dismissal by 1/7/2019. The Parties are directed to provide a status report by 11/6/2018. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 8/8/2018. (Cardenas, Alex)
August 7, 2018 Filing 336 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Stipulation of Dismissal by Jose Oakley. (Kessler, Troy)
August 5, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER re #329 Settlement Agreement filed by Douglas Levy and Jose Oakley: I have reviewed the letter motion filed by Plaintiffs dated May 18, 2018, seeking approval of the settlement agreement reached by Plaintiffs and Defendants. A Fairness/Cheeks conference was held on 6/25/2018, and the parties have consented to jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. I have also reviewed the settlement agreement, Docket Entry 329. Having done so, I find that "the agreement reflects a reasonable compromise of disputed issues [rather] than a mere waiver of statutory rights brought about by an employer's overreaching." Le v. SITA Information Networking Computing, USA, Inc., 2008 WL 724155 (E.D.N.Y. Mar. 13, 2008) (internal quotations and citation omitted). See also Cheeks v. Freeport Pancake House, Inc., 796 F.3d 199 (2d Cir. 2015). In reaching this conclusion, I have considered, among other things, (1) that the settlement amount provides plaintiffs with a recovery that reflects the significant litigation risks and complications from the case, as reflected on the docket sheet and discussed on the record; (2) that the attorney's fees portion of the settlement is for an amount approximately equal to one-third of the total amount of the settlement; (3) that the release provided for in the agreement is limited in scope; and (4) that the settlement agreement does not impose a duty of confidentiality. The settlement is therefore approved. The Parties to the settlement agreement should file a Stipulation of Dismissal, and do so by 8/16/2018, indicating the status of each of the individual plaintiffs. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 8/5/2018. (Cardenas, Alex)
July 20, 2018 Filing 335 Letter from Gregg Shavitz to Judge Bulsara Regarding Settlement by Jose Oakley (Attachments: #1 Declaration) (Shavitz, Gregg)
July 20, 2018 Filing 334 NOTICE by Douglas Levy, Jose Oakley Of Withdrawal of Consent to Join (Jones, Camar)
June 29, 2018 Filing 333 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on June 25, 2018, before Judge Bulsara. Court Reporter/Transcriber Fiore Reporting and Transcription Service, Inc., Telephone number 203-929-9992. Email address: cmfiore@sbcglobal.net. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.File redaction request using event "Redaction Request - Transcript" located under "Other Filings - Other Documents". Redaction Request due 7/20/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/30/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/27/2018. (Hong, Loan)
June 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara: A Cheeks Conference was held on 6/25/2018. Counsel for all parties were present. The parties are directed to submit the documentation as discussed on the record. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. (FTR Log #4:32-5:19.) (Zhang, Fan)
June 4, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER: The Motion to Adjourn Conference #332 is granted. The in person Cheeks Motion Hearing scheduled for 6/27/2018 will now be held on 6/25/2018 at 4:30 P.M. in Courtroom 324N before Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 6/4/2018. (Manson, Eddie) .
May 31, 2018 Filing 332 Consent MOTION to Adjourn Conference (the Cheeks Motion Hearing) from June 27, 2018 at 5:00 pm to June 25, 2018 by Jose Oakley. (Kessler, Troy)
May 31, 2018 Opinion or Order RE-SCHEDULING ORDER: Due to a scheduling conflict, the in person Cheeks Motion Hearing scheduled for 7/2/2018 at 1:00 P.M. will now be held on 6/27/2018 at 5:00 P.M. before Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara in Courtroom 324N. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 5/31/2018. (Manson, Eddie)
May 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 331 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara to conduct all proceedings in this case relating to the settlement reached by the parties, including deciding Pltffs' forthcoming motion for settlement approval, and entering final judgment in accordance with the settlement, if appropriate. (Ordered by Judge Eric N. Vitaliano on 5/17/2018) (Galeano, Sonia)
May 24, 2018 Case no longer referred to Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. (Galeano, Sonia)
May 22, 2018 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: An in person Cheeks Motion Hearing will take place on 7/2/2018 at 1:00 P.M. before Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara in Courtroom 324N. Counsel are encouraged to consider whether they will file a form consenting to reassignment of this case to the undersigned Magistrate Judge for all purposes, including for review of the settlement agreement and to conduct the Cheeks hearing. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 5/22/2018. (Manson, Eddie)
May 18, 2018 Filing 330 MEMORANDUM in Support re #329 Notice of MOTION for Settlement Approval filed by Douglas Levy, Jose Oakley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8) (Shavitz, Gregg)
May 18, 2018 Filing 329 Notice of MOTION for Settlement Approval by Douglas Levy, Jose Oakley. (Shavitz, Gregg)
May 15, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER: Motion for Extension of Time to File #328 is granted. The parties are directed to file their joint motion for approval of the settlement agreement by 5/18/2018. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 5/15/2018. (Cardenas, Alex)
May 14, 2018 Filing 328 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion to Approve Settlement (Four Days) by SWISSPORT CARGO SERVICES, INC., SWISSPORT CARGO SERVICES, L.P., SWISSPORT FUELING, INC., SWISSPORT INTERNATIONAL, LTD., SWISSPORT LOUNGE, LLC,, SWISSPORT, U.S.A., INC. (Muldowney, Patrick)
May 14, 2018 Filing 327 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Jose Oakley. (Kessler, Troy)
May 8, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER: Motion for Extension of Time to File #326 is granted. The parties are directed to file their joint motion for approval of the settlement agreement by 5/14/2018. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 5/8/2018. (Cardenas, Alex)
May 7, 2018 Filing 326 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Motion for Approval of Settlement Agreement by SWISSPORT CARGO SERVICES, INC., SWISSPORT CARGO SERVICES, L.P., SWISSPORT FUELING, INC., SWISSPORT LOUNGE, LLC,, SWISSPORT, U.S.A., INC. (Muldowney, Patrick)
April 27, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER: Motion for Extension of Time to File #325 is granted. The parties are directed to file their joint motion for approval of the settlement agreement by 5/7/2018. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 4/27/2018. (Cardenas, Alex)
April 26, 2018 Filing 325 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Joint Motion for Approval of the Settlement Agreement by SWISSPORT CARGO SERVICES, INC., SWISSPORT CARGO SERVICES, L.P., SWISSPORT FUELING, INC., SWISSPORT LOUNGE, LLC,, SWISSPORT, U.S.A., INC. (Muldowney, Patrick)
April 5, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER: Motion for Extension of Time to File #323 is granted. The parties are directed to file their joint motion for approval of the settlement agreement by 4/27/2018. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 4/5/2018. (Cardenas, Alex)
April 4, 2018 Filing 324 NOTICE by Douglas Levy, Jose Oakley of Filing Consent to Join (Jones, Camar)
April 4, 2018 Filing 323 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Joint Motion for Approval of the Settlement Agreement by SWISSPORT CARGO SERVICES, INC., SWISSPORT CARGO SERVICES, L.P., SWISSPORT FUELING, INC., SWISSPORT LOUNGE, LLC,, SWISSPORT, U.S.A., INC. (Muldowney, Patrick)
March 1, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER: In light of the Status Report #322 filed by the parties advising the Court that this matter has settled, counsel shall file a motion for approval as required by Cheeks v. Freeport Pancake House, Inc., 796 F.3d 199 (2d Cir. 2015), by 4/6/2018. Counsel are encouraged to consider whether they will file a form consenting to reassignment of this case to the undersigned Magistrate Judge for all purposes, including for review of the settlement agreement and to conduct the Cheeks hearing. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 3/1/2018. (Manson, Eddie)
March 1, 2018 Filing 322 STATUS REPORT by Jose Oakley (Kessler, Troy)
February 15, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER: The Motion to Adjourn Conference #321 is granted. The in person settlement conference scheduled for 2/21/2108 at 2:00 P.M. is adjourned sine die. The parties are directed to file a Joint Status Report letter on or before 3/2/2018. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 2/15/2018. (Manson, Eddie)
February 14, 2018 Filing 321 MOTION to Adjourn Conference on consent of all parties by Jose Oakley. (Kessler, Troy)
December 21, 2017 Filing 320 NOTICE by Douglas Levy, Jose Oakley Of Filing Consents To Join Of Opt-In Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Jermehia Curtis, #2 Exhibit Anthony Curtis, #3 Exhibit Cecil Harris, #4 Exhibit Michael Ojugbana, #5 Exhibit Joseph Key, #6 Exhibit Desmond Mitchell) (Palitz, Michael)
November 30, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER: The Motion to adjourn conference #319 is granted. The in person status conference scheduled for 12/1/2017 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 324N before Judge Bulsara is adjourned sine die. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 11/30/2017. (Manson, Eddie)
November 29, 2017 Filing 319 Joint MOTION to Adjourn Conference Currently Set For December 1, 2017 by Servisair, LLC. (Anthony, William)
November 27, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER: An in-person settlement conference will take place on 2/21/2018 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Bulsara in Courtroom 324N. The parties are directed to follow Judge Bulsaras Individual Practices Regarding Settlement Conferences which are available on the Courts website. The request to appear by telephone #317 is granted, and Defendant Derichebourg SA is directed to call 15 minutes before the scheduled conference at 718-804-2714. SO Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 11/27/2017. (Cardenas, Alex)
November 27, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER: In light of the Parties' stipulated submission #316 , the following dates are set: (1) all Motions to amend pleadings are due by 1/12/2018; (2) fact discovery shall close by 6/29/2018; and (3) the Parties shall identify any experts in writing, providing the name of the expert to be used and a description of the anticipated subject areas of the report, by 3/16/2018. SO Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 11/27/2017. (Cardenas, Alex)
November 27, 2017 PRO HAC VICE FILING FEE: re #314 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Camar R. Jones Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0207-9978890. $ 150, receipt number 0207-10003761 (Jones, Camar)
November 27, 2017 Filing 318 NOTICE of Appearance by Camar R. Jones on behalf of Douglas Levy, Jose Oakley (aty to be noticed) (Jones, Camar)
November 21, 2017 Filing 317 Letter seeking leave to participate in prospective Settlement Conference by phone by DERICHBOURG MULTISERVICES (Ricardo, Shawn)
November 20, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER: Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #314 for attorney Camar R. Jones is granted. The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at the NYEDs homepage. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure that the 150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee. SO Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 11/20/2017. (Cardenas, Alex)
November 17, 2017 Filing 316 STIPULATION re Order,,, Regarding Second Phase Discovery by Douglas Levy, Jose Oakley (Palitz, Michael)
November 15, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER: Motion to Withdraw as Attorneys #313 is granted. Attorneys Jodi J. Jaffe and Andrew I. Glenn are terminated. SO Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 11/15/2017. (Cardenas, Alex)
November 15, 2017 Filing 315 NOTICE by Douglas Levy, Jose Oakley re #314 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Camar R. Jones Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0207-9978890. Of Filing Proposed Order On Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice Of Camar R. Jones (Palitz, Michael)
November 14, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER: The parties have now submitted two stipulations regarding the discovery schedule in the case. Neither complies with this Court's order of September 14, 2017 or the order dated October 19, 2017, both of which directed the parties to submit a proposal for the remaining schedule for discovery. The parties may not unilaterally determine the discovery schedule and then again extend the schedule on their own without Court approval. In addition, neither submission responds to the Court's inquiry about a settlement conference. The parties are directed to file a joint proposal for second phase of discovery, which provides reasons why the initial schedule submitted on October 2, 2017 is to be altered, and the parties views on the timing of a settlement conference. The Court denies approval of the submitted discovery stipulations. SO Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 11/14/2017. (Cardenas, Alex)
November 14, 2017 Filing 314 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Camar R. Jones Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0207-9978890. by Douglas Levy, Jose Oakley. (Palitz, Michael)
November 14, 2017 Filing 313 First MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Douglas Levy, Jose Oakley. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Jaffe, Jodi)
November 13, 2017 Filing 312 STIPULATION re #305 Stipulation Regarding Second Phase Discovery by Douglas Levy, Jose Oakley (Palitz, Michael)
October 26, 2017 Filing 311 NOTICE by Douglas Levy, Jose Oakley Of Filing Consents To Join Of Opt-In Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Eric Anders, #2 Exhibit Richemane Acado) (Palitz, Michael)
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER: The motion to adjourn scheduled status conference #310 for 11/27/2017 at 10:00 AM is granted. Status Conference will be held at 2:00 PM on 12/1/2017 in Courtroom 324N before Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 10/24/2017. (Manson, Eddie) .
October 23, 2017 Filing 310 Letter MOTION to Adjourn Conference Scheduled for November 27, 2017 by SWISSPORT CARGO SERVICES, INC., SWISSPORT CARGO SERVICES, L.P., SWISSPORT FUELING, INC., SWISSPORT LOUNGE, LLC,, SWISSPORT, U.S.A., INC. (Muldowney, Patrick)
October 19, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER: Due to a scheduling conflict the status conference scheduled for 11/10/2017 at 10:00 AM is rescheduled to 11/27/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 324N before Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. In the parties' joint proposal for the remaining discovery schedule, they should provide a proposed date for a settlement conference. Should the parties wish that the November status conference be used for a settlement conference, they should so indicate.So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 10/19/2017. (Manson, Eddie)
October 18, 2017 Filing 309 NOTICE by Douglas Levy, Jose Oakley Of Filing Consents To Join Opt-In Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Christopher Parker, #2 Exhibit Isaiah Jones, #3 Exhibit Nico Foster, #4 Exhibit Damine Jemison) (Palitz, Michael)
October 10, 2017 Filing 308 NOTICE by Douglas Levy, Jose Oakley Of Filing Consents To Join Of Opt-In Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Kimberly Davis) (Palitz, Michael)
October 4, 2017 Filing 307 NOTICE by Douglas Levy, Jose Oakley Of Filing Consents To Join Opt-In Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Darryl Lindsey, #2 Exhibit Joseph Pierre, #3 Exhibit Tony Upshaw) (Palitz, Michael)
October 3, 2017 Filing 306 NOTICE by Douglas Levy, Jose Oakley Of Filing Consents To Join Of Opt-In Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Adolphus Jordan, #2 Exhibit Dwight Gardner, #3 Exhibit Ryan Wilson, #4 Exhibit Ted Nemtzow, #5 Exhibit Robert Hoyt, #6 Exhibit Dominic Joseph, #7 Exhibit Carlos Guzman) (Palitz, Michael)
October 2, 2017 Filing 305 STIPULATION re Set Deadlines Second Phase Discovery by Douglas Levy, Jose Oakley (Palitz, Michael)
September 27, 2017 Filing 304 NOTICE by Douglas Levy, Jose Oakley Of Filing Consents To Join Of Opt-In Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Jeremy Thomason, #2 Exhibit Mekonen Weldemariam, #3 Exhibit Charles E. Thomas II) (Palitz, Michael)
September 27, 2017 Filing 303 NOTICE by Douglas Levy, Jose Oakley Of Filing Consents To Join Of Opt-In Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Hernan Arguello) (Palitz, Michael)
September 26, 2017 Filing 302 NOTICE by Douglas Levy, Jose Oakley Of Filing Consents To Join Of Opt-In Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Jackie Paskel, #2 Exhibit Antonio Heredia-Viveros, #3 Exhibit Ronald McClain, #4 Exhibit Ryan Dunkin, #5 Exhibit Vernon Henderson, #6 Exhibit Marshawn Henry, #7 Exhibit Gerald Parks, #8 Exhibit Stephen Harris, #9 Exhibit Charles Dulcio, #10 Exhibit Samuel Valadez) (Palitz, Michael)
September 25, 2017 Filing 301 NOTICE by Douglas Levy, Jose Oakley Of Filing Consents To Join Of Opt-In Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Johnny Anderson, #2 Exhibit Abelardo Cordoba, #3 Exhibit Timothy Green, #4 Exhibit Gary Robbins, #5 Exhibit Deshawngton Gordon, #6 Exhibit Andrew Barbee, #7 Exhibit Jermaine D. Davis, #8 Exhibit Nikolas Korder Rogers, II) (Palitz, Michael)
September 22, 2017 Filing 300 NOTICE by Douglas Levy, Jose Oakley Of Filing Consents To Join Of Opt-In Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Jamilet Salazar) (Palitz, Michael)
September 21, 2017 Filing 299 NOTICE by Douglas Levy, Jose Oakley Of Filing Consents To Join Opt-In Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ricky Jones, #2 Exhibit Edgar Arciniega Calderon, #3 Exhibit Cyrus R. Wooldridge, #4 Exhibit Thomas Warren, #5 Exhibit Biser Dzhelepski, #6 Exhibit Ali Hasan) (Palitz, Michael)
September 20, 2017 Filing 298 NOTICE by Douglas Levy, Jose Oakley Of Filing Consents to Join Of Opt-In Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Fernando Hart) (Palitz, Michael)
September 19, 2017 Filing 297 NOTICE by Douglas Levy, Jose Oakley Of Filing Consents To Join Of Opt-In Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Patricia Robinson, #2 Exhibit Charles R. Lewis, #3 Exhibit Mark D. Trent, Jr., #4 Exhibit Robert D. Mays, #5 Exhibit Alex Alban) (Palitz, Michael)
September 18, 2017 Filing 296 NOTICE by Douglas Levy, Jose Oakley Of Filing Consents To Join Opt-In Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Nicholas Trapp, #2 Exhibit Hector J. Santana, #3 Exhibit James C. Brooks, #4 Exhibit Krasimir Velev, #5 Exhibit Dwain J. Smalley, #6 Exhibit Rahman O'Brien) (Palitz, Michael)
September 15, 2017 Filing 295 NOTICE by Douglas Levy, Jose Oakley Of Filing Consents To Join Opt-In Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Chanyaporn Chalumporn) (Palitz, Michael)
September 14, 2017 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: An in person Status Conference will be held at 10:00 AM on 11/10/2017 in Courtroom 324N before Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. In the parties' joint proposal for the remaining discovery schedule, they should provide a proposed date for a settlement conference. Should the parties wish that the November status conference be used for a settlement conference, they should so indicate. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 9/14/2017. (Manson, Eddie)
September 14, 2017 Filing 294 NOTICE by Douglas Levy, Jose Oakley Of Filing Consents To Join Of Opt-In Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Jermaine Smith, #2 Exhibit Martez Love, #3 Exhibit Robert Bausemer, #4 Exhibit Roberto Moschitto, #5 Exhibit James Sullivan, #6 Exhibit Salvador Garcia) (Palitz, Michael)
September 13, 2017 Filing 293 CONSENT to become party in a collective action. by Jose Oakley (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Brian Odom, #2 Exhibit Julio Gutierrez, #3 Exhibit Samuel Byrd, #4 Exhibit Omar Gonzalez, #5 Exhibit Yves Bellevue, #6 Exhibit Alfonzo Moore, #7 Exhibit Said Ennahiri, #8 Exhibit Egbert Pryce, #9 Exhibit Kelvin Walker, #10 Exhibit Victor Reed, #11 Exhibit Leroy Hogan, #12 Exhibit Michael Smith, #13 Exhibit Juan Arriago, #14 Exhibit Kenneth Holmes, #15 Exhibit James Ferrell, #16 Exhibit Andrew Stetzer, #17 Exhibit Henry Vernon Hollingsworth) (Kessler, Troy)
September 13, 2017 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo no longer assigned to the case. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Mahoney, Brenna)
September 8, 2017 Filing 292 NOTICE by Jose Oakley (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Andre Grierson, #2 Exhibit Benjamin Mendoza, #3 Exhibit Clive Outar, #4 Exhibit Deolall Sukhdeo, #5 Exhibit Doltan Dennis, #6 Exhibit George Murdaugh, #7 Exhibit James Nelson, #8 Exhibit Jason Davis, #9 Exhibit Javier Pena, #10 Exhibit Julenne Jones, #11 Exhibit Marlo Yearsley, #12 Exhibit Philip Campbell, #13 Exhibit Robert Frackiel, #14 Exhibit Rudolph Bailey) (Kessler, Troy)
September 7, 2017 Filing 291 NOTICE by Douglas Levy, Jose Oakley Of Filing Consents To Join Of Opt-In Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Joab Ramirez) (Palitz, Michael)
September 6, 2017 Filing 290 NOTICE by Douglas Levy, Jose Oakley Of Filing Consents To Join Of Opt-In Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Curtis Ross, #2 Exhibit DeMarkus Smith, #3 Exhibit Marcelin Louis Charles, #4 Exhibit Prince Dukes, #5 Exhibit Joseph A. Demattin, #6 Exhibit Cesar Gonzalez, #7 Exhibit Miles Blaney, #8 Exhibit Kim Glover, #9 Exhibit Adam Londono, #10 Exhibit Estate of Jose De La Cruz, #11 Exhibit Andre Garcia, #12 Exhibit Eduardo Anthony Cruz, Jr., #13 Exhibit Enrique A. Zepeda, #14 Exhibit Salvatore Bongiovanni, #15 Exhibit Mark Phillips) (Palitz, Michael)
September 5, 2017 Filing 289 NOTICE by Douglas Levy, Jose Oakley Of Filing Consents To Join Of Opt-In Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Sanford Fields, #2 Exhibit Byron J. Caples, #3 Exhibit Matthew Townsend, #4 Exhibit Myron Thomas, Jr., #5 Exhibit Anthony Thaice, Sr., #6 Exhibit Carlos W. Prado) (Palitz, Michael)
September 1, 2017 Filing 288 NOTICE by Douglas Levy, Jose Oakley of Filing Consents to Join of Opt-In Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Willie Iglesias Consent, #2 Warren Jackson Consent) (Palitz, Michael)
August 31, 2017 Filing 287 NOTICE by Douglas Levy, Jose Oakley of Filing Consents to Join of Opt-In Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Jose A Martinez Consent, #2 Domingo Garcia Consent, #3 Christopher Clemente Consent, #4 Anthony Banks Consent, #5 Ernesto Taylor Consent, #6 Elier Rivera Consent, #7 Floyd Conway Consent, #8 Alfonzo Howard Consent, #9 Alejandro Fundora Consent, #10 Eduardo Urquiza Consent, #11 Carlos Prado Consent, #12 Dinitia Yvonne Consent) (Palitz, Michael)
August 30, 2017 Filing 286 NOTICE by Douglas Levy, Jose Oakley Of Filing Consents To Join Of Opt-In Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Emmanuel Laurent, #2 Exhibit Arvin Mabutas, #3 Exhibit Rachid Benjdiya, #4 Exhibit Julio Rivera, #5 Exhibit Edwin Ramos, #6 Exhibit Jose Diaz, #7 Exhibit Francisco Morales, #8 Exhibit Chibueze Chima) (Palitz, Michael)
August 29, 2017 Filing 285 NOTICE by Douglas Levy, Jose Oakley Of Filing Consents To Join Of Opt-In Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Marcus Watson, #2 Exhibit Dean Brian Parker, #3 Exhibit Terrance Carter, #4 Exhibit Ray Harris, #5 Exhibit Michael F Toye, Jr., #6 Exhibit Cornelius Anderson, #7 Exhibit Tony Franklyn, #8 Exhibit L.T. Malone) (Palitz, Michael)
August 28, 2017 Filing 284 NOTICE by Douglas Levy, Jose Oakley Of Filing Consents To Join Of Opt-In Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Eriberto Gonzalez) (Palitz, Michael)
August 25, 2017 Filing 283 NOTICE by Douglas Levy, Jose Oakley Of Filing Consents To Join Opt-In Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Arsenio Sanchez, #2 Exhibit Aron W. Calhoun, #3 Exhibit Serena Hall, #4 Exhibit Trevor Holmes) (Palitz, Michael)
August 24, 2017 Filing 282 NOTICE by Douglas Levy, Jose Oakley Of Filing Consents To Join Of Opt-In Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Manuel Quiroga, #2 Exhibit Ronald Beck, #3 Exhibit Rickey Adams, #4 Exhibit Kyle Gross, #5 Exhibit Paul Dunlap, #6 Exhibit Robert Ryan, #7 Exhibit John Arnold, #8 Exhibit Carlos Gomez, #9 Exhibit John Gonzales, #10 Exhibit Edgar Parra, #11 Exhibit Samuel Dougnon) (Palitz, Michael)
August 23, 2017 Filing 281 NOTICE by Douglas Levy, Jose Oakley Of Filing Consents To Join Of Opt-In Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Paul Gregory Taylor, #2 Exhibit Gilberto Mercado) (Palitz, Michael)
August 22, 2017 Filing 280 NOTICE by Douglas Levy, Jose Oakley Of Filing Consents To Join Of Opt-In Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Charles Hughes, #2 Exhibit Bloobens Edon, #3 Exhibit Paul Ramgobin, #4 Exhibit Tony Lee, #5 Exhibit Ismael Hernandez, #6 Exhibit Nesly Bonny, #7 Exhibit Victor Nieto, #8 Exhibit Alexander Chute, #9 Exhibit Bryce Greene, #10 Exhibit Alonzo Vasquez, #11 Exhibit DeAndre L. Florence, #12 Exhibit Timothy Holmes, Jr., #13 Exhibit Roberson Pierre) (Palitz, Michael)
August 21, 2017 Filing 279 NOTICE by Douglas Levy, Jose Oakley Of Filing Consents To Join Of Opt-In Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Floyd Gill, III, #2 Exhibit Eliecer Companioni, #3 Exhibit Haiane Oiad, #4 Exhibit Juan Martinez, #5 Exhibit Feoner C. Asemy, #6 Exhibit Cynthia Padilla) (Palitz, Michael)
August 18, 2017 Filing 278 NOTICE by Douglas Levy, Jose Oakley Of Filing Consents To Join Of Opt-In Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Jarian Brown, #2 Exhibit Aris Dolce, #3 Exhibit Tameshwar Shrikishun, #4 Exhibit Heriberto Gomez, #5 Exhibit Sanjai Jagdish, #6 Exhibit Steven Wade, #7 Exhibit Ricardo Narbona, #8 Exhibit Joseph Papandrea, #9 Exhibit Stephen Johnson, #10 Exhibit Darnell McGhee, #11 Exhibit Marlon Woods, #12 Exhibit Floyd T. Goforth, #13 Exhibit Ryan Goforth, #14 Exhibit Michael J. Shanahan, #15 Exhibit Ryan McQuitter, #16 Exhibit Donovan Nelson, #17 Exhibit Jose A. Navas, #18 Exhibit Mohammad Saeed) (Palitz, Michael)
August 17, 2017 Filing 277 NOTICE by Douglas Levy, Jose Oakley Of Filing Consents To Join Of Opt-In Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Francisco Ortega, #2 Exhibit Dewone Currin, #3 Exhibit Kionel Lovie) (Palitz, Michael)
August 16, 2017 Filing 276 NOTICE by Douglas Levy, Jose Oakley Of Filing Consents To Join Of Opt-In Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Kevin Payne, #2 Exhibit Daniel Garland, #3 Exhibit Timothy A. Hatcher, #4 Exhibit Ashley Smith, #5 Exhibit Arthur L. Jones, #6 Exhibit Gregory Moore, Jr., #7 Exhibit Joeffrey Mazo, #8 Exhibit Timothy Giles, #9 Exhibit Jerry Adams, #10 Exhibit Julian Guy, #11 Exhibit Daniel Gawdzik, #12 Exhibit Kevin Sheldon Scott, #13 Exhibit Mohamed Aderdour, #14 Exhibit Raymond Bledsoe, #15 Exhibit Tyrone Smith, #16 Exhibit Brandon Ridgell, #17 Exhibit Rodney Pryor, #18 Exhibit Pascual Agosto, #19 Exhibit Samer Jaber) (Palitz, Michael)
August 15, 2017 Filing 275 NOTICE by Douglas Levy, Jose Oakley Of Filing Consents to Join Of Opt-In Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Johnnie Laramore, #2 Exhibit Byron K. Jones, #3 Exhibit Reginald Watkins, Jr., #4 Exhibit Reginald Gittens, #5 Exhibit Andonte Lynch, #6 Exhibit Marcos A Ramos, #7 Exhibit Wilfredo Valencia-Argueta, #8 Exhibit Jamel Weston, #9 Exhibit Joseph D'Angelo, #10 Exhibit Christopher Diaz, #11 Exhibit Oscar Gonzalez, #12 Exhibit Stephen Simmons, #13 Exhibit Bergelin Jean Louis) (Palitz, Michael)
August 11, 2017 Filing 274 NOTICE by Douglas Levy, Jose Oakley Of Filing Consents To Join Of Opt-In Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit George Santo Domingo, #2 Exhibit Renaldo Navarro, #3 Exhibit Osmar A. Chaviano) (Palitz, Michael)
August 10, 2017 Filing 273 NOTICE by Douglas Levy, Jose Oakley Of Filing Consents To Join Of Opt-In Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Jason Houser, #2 Exhibit Michael Lawson, #3 Exhibit Kenneth Moody, #4 Exhibit Jeffrey R. Quatman, #5 Exhibit Dieuverson Fanfan, #6 Exhibit Erold Pierre, #7 Exhibit Daryl L. Brown, #8 Exhibit Leroy Newton IV) (Palitz, Michael)
August 9, 2017 Filing 272 NOTICE by Douglas Levy, Jose Oakley Of Filing Consents To Join Opt-In Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Revo J. Harris, #2 Exhibit Juany Jean Louis, #3 Exhibit Rodrick Williams, #4 Exhibit Jacob Taylor, #5 Exhibit Pablo Rodriguez, #6 Exhibit Orval A. Zellmer, #7 Exhibit Glenn Washington, #8 Exhibit Urbano Merlos Padilla, #9 Exhibit John T. Lomax, #10 Exhibit Eric Thomas, #11 Exhibit Jeffrey D. Rakowski, #12 Exhibit Treseans Freeman, #13 Exhibit Yancy Collins, #14 Exhibit Gary Bell, #15 Exhibit Juan Chiquete, #16 Exhibit Brandon Lou-Anthony Higgins-Haire, #17 Exhibit Gregory Ramsey, #18 Exhibit Geovanni Arriaga, #19 Exhibit Mikhail Dawson, #20 Exhibit David W. Brandi, #21 Exhibit Farai Mudokwani, #22 Exhibit Luis Lora Rodriguez, #23 Exhibit Fred Joseph, #24 Exhibit Marcos A. Ramos, #25 Exhibit Alexis Reynoso) (Palitz, Michael)
August 8, 2017 Filing 271 NOTICE by Douglas Levy, Jose Oakley Of Filing Consents to Join of Opt-In Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Robert Helmer, #2 Exhibit Manuel Matallana, #3 Exhibit Eric Ordoukhanian, #4 Exhibit Bryant Reid, #5 Exhibit Rivo Skeen, #6 Exhibit Larry Freeman, #7 Exhibit Bernard Hudson, #8 Exhibit Carolyn Anderson, #9 Exhibit Winthrop Thomas, #10 Exhibit Jacob Caldwell, #11 Exhibit Abderrahmane Oubal, #12 Exhibit Ronald Coward, #13 Exhibit Jesus Carvajal, #14 Exhibit Oscar Carvajal, #15 Exhibit Juan Chan, #16 Exhibit Hasan Hamaiyel, #17 Exhibit Kamran Qaiser, #18 Exhibit Walter Cordova, #19 Exhibit Dwayne Stephens, #20 Exhibit Jeffrey Jackson, #21 Exhibit Hector Galindez, #22 Exhibit Anthony Elderfield, #23 Exhibit Javan Woods, #24 Exhibit Courtney Robinson, #25 Exhibit Derrick Jefferson, #26 Exhibit Torry Hudson, #27 Exhibit John Shaw, #28 Exhibit Edward Lomax, Jr., #29 Exhibit George McMullen, #30 Exhibit Daniel Lukowski) (Palitz, Michael)
August 7, 2017 Filing 270 NOTICE by Douglas Levy, Jose Oakley Of Filing Consents to Join of Opt-In Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Robert J. Biancardi, #2 Exhibit Tariq Epkins, #3 Exhibit Fitzroy Dewar, #4 Exhibit Pablo Salgueiros) (Palitz, Michael)
August 4, 2017 Filing 269 NOTICE by Douglas Levy, Jose Oakley Of Filing Consents to Join of Opt-In Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Lorenzo Williams) (Palitz, Michael)
August 3, 2017 Filing 268 NOTICE by Douglas Levy, William Myers, Jose Oakley of Filing Consents to Join of Opt-In Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Quentin Gill, #2 Exhibit Yesmin Mejia, #3 Exhibit David Peters, #4 Exhibit Freddy Tobon) (Jones, Camar)
August 2, 2017 Filing 267 NOTICE by Douglas Levy, William Myers, Jose Oakley Of Filing Consents to Join of Opt-In Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Joe Murphy, #2 Exhibit Daunte Combs) (Jones, Camar)
July 26, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER: The parties are directed to file a joint Proposed Scheduling Order by October 2, 2017. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 7/26/2017. (Riquelme, Claudia)
July 25, 2017 Filing 266 STATUS REPORT by Jose Oakley (Kessler, Troy)
July 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 265 ORDER as to #262 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court, filed by Swissport Cargo Services, L.P., Swissport Cargo Services, Inc., Swissport Lounge, Llc,, Swissport Fueling, Inc., Swissport, U.S.A., Inc. Finding the Order of Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo requiring the posting of notices in defendants' workplaces, from which Swissport has taken appeal, is neither clearly erroneous nor contrary to law, the Order is affirmed and the appeal is dismissed. So Ordered by Judge Eric N. Vitaliano on 7/11/2017. (Lee, Tiffeny)
June 16, 2017 Filing 264 EXHIBIT A to PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS SWISSPORT CARGO SERVICES, INC., SWISSPORT CARGO SERVICES, L.P., SWISSPORT FUELING, INC., SWISSPORT LOUNGE, LLC AND SWISSPORT, U.S.A., INC.S OBJECTION TO THE MAGISTRATE JUDGES MAY 25, 2017 MINUTE ORDER by Jose Oakley. Related document: #263 Memorandum in Opposition filed by Jose Oakley. (Palitz, Michael)
June 16, 2017 Filing 263 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #262 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court, filed by Jose Oakley. (Palitz, Michael)
June 8, 2017 Filing 262 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court by SWISSPORT CARGO SERVICES, INC., SWISSPORT CARGO SERVICES, L.P., SWISSPORT FUELING, INC., SWISSPORT LOUNGE, LLC,, SWISSPORT, U.S.A., INC re Order on Motion to Certify FLSA Collective Action,,,,,,,,,,,, Motion Hearing,,,,, (Muldowney, Patrick)
June 8, 2017 Filing 261 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on May 25, 2017, before Judge Kuo. Court Transcriber: Transcription Plus II. Email address: laferrara44@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.File redaction request using event "Redaction Request - Transcript" located under "Other Filings - Other Documents". Redaction Request due 6/29/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/10/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/6/2017. (Rocco, Christine)
May 25, 2017 Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo. Motion Hearing held on 5/25/2017. Attorneys Gregg Shavitz, Michael Palitz, Troy Kessler, Andrew Glenn, Jodi Jaffe, and Garrett Kaske for Plaintiffs. Attorney William Anthony for Defendant Servisair, LLC. Attorney Patrick Muldowney for the Swissport Defendants. Attorney Preston Ricardo for Defendant Derichebourg SA. For the reasons stated on the record, Plaintiffs' Motion for Conditional Collective Action Certification #229 and Motion for Equitable Tolling #253 are granted. The period tolled is from May 17, 2016 through June 5, 2017. The language "join or not join" may appear in the Collective Action Notice; the "153 other Fuelers...." language may not appear. Defendants are to provide to Plaintiffs the names, addresses, phone numbers (work and personal), e-mail addresses (work, if applicable, and personal), and work locations of the potential opt-in plaintiffs, and are to post the agreed-upon notice at all work locations. The parties are directed to confer regarding the proposed electronic portal and the opt-in reminder notice. Within fourteen (14) days of the end of the opt-in period, the parties are to jointly file a proposed schedule for the remainder of discovery. (Tape #2:28-3:15.) (Feldman, Shira)
May 23, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER denying #260 Motion to Adjourn Conference. The Court is not available at the requested time. The hearing will proceed as scheduled at 2:00 p.m. on May 25, 2017. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 5/23/2017. (Feldman, Shira)
May 23, 2017 Filing 260 MOTION to Adjourn Conference /Change the Start Time of Conference on May 25, 2017 by Jose Oakley. (Shavitz, Gregg)
May 19, 2017 Filing 259 Letter to Judge Kuo Regarding Proposed Notice of Lawsuit by Jose Oakley (Palitz, Michael)
April 28, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #257 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Plaintiffs may file a reply memorandum of no more than ten (10) pages. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 4/28/2017. (Feldman, Shira)
April 28, 2017 Filing 258 REPLY in Support re #253 MOTION to Certify FLSA Collective Action (Motion for Equitable Tolling) filed by Douglas Levy, Jose Oakley. (Attachments: #1 Declaration) (Palitz, Michael)
April 28, 2017 Filing 257 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Jose Oakley. (Palitz, Michael)
April 21, 2017 Filing 256 RESPONSE to Motion re #253 MOTION to Certify FLSA Collective Action (Motion for Equitable Tolling) filed by SWISSPORT CARGO SERVICES, INC., SWISSPORT CARGO SERVICES, L.P., SWISSPORT FUELING, INC., SWISSPORT LOUNGE, LLC,, SWISSPORT, U.S.A., INC. (Muldowney, Patrick)
April 21, 2017 Filing 255 RESPONSE in Opposition re #253 MOTION to Certify FLSA Collective Action (Motion for Equitable Tolling) filed by Derichebourg SA, Servisair, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2) (Anthony, William)
April 10, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #254 Motion to Adjourn Conference. The motion hearing scheduled for April 12, 2017 is rescheduled to May 25, 2017 at 2:00 pm, in Courtroom 11C South, before Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo. The proposed briefing schedule at #25 is So-Ordered. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 4/10/2017. (Riquelme, Claudia)
April 10, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER REFERRING MOTION: Plaintiffs' MOTION to Certify FLSA Collective Action (Motion for Equitable Tolling) #253 is respectfully referred to the Honorable Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo. Ordered by Judge Eric N. Vitaliano on 4/10/2017. Motions referred to Peggy Kuo. (Simeone, Julie)
April 10, 2017 Filing 254 Joint MOTION to Adjourn Conference and motion hearing, presently scheduled for April 12, 2017 by Jose Oakley. (Kessler, Troy)
April 7, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER: In light of Plaintiffs' Motion #253 for equitable tolling, the parties are to file by April 10, 2017 a joint letter informing the Court whether they wish to proceed with the motion hearing scheduled for April 12, 2017, or whether the hearing should be postponed until after the motion for equitable tolling is fully briefed. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 4/7/2017. (Feldman, Shira)
April 7, 2017 Filing 253 MOTION to Certify FLSA Collective Action (Motion for Equitable Tolling) by Jose Oakley. Responses due by 4/21/2017 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support) (Palitz, Michael)
April 7, 2017 Filing 252 Proposed Scheduling Order by Jose Oakley (Palitz, Michael)
March 24, 2017 Filing 251 Letter to Magistrate submitting proposed alternate notice to potential collective members pursuant to the Court's Order by SWISSPORT CARGO SERVICES, INC., SWISSPORT CARGO SERVICES, L.P., SWISSPORT FUELING, INC., SWISSPORT LOUNGE, LLC,, SWISSPORT, U.S.A., INC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - proposed Notice to Potential Collective Members) (Muldowney, Patrick)
March 17, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #250 Motion to Adjourn Conference. The Motion Hearing and Discovery Conference scheduled for March 28, 2017 are rescheduled to April 12, 2017 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 11C South before Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 3/17/2017. (Feldman, Shira)
March 17, 2017 Filing 250 Letter MOTION to Adjourn Conference (unopposed) from March 28, 2017 to April 12, 2017 by SWISSPORT CARGO SERVICES, INC., SWISSPORT CARGO SERVICES, L.P., SWISSPORT FUELING, INC., SWISSPORT LOUNGE, LLC,, SWISSPORT, U.S.A., INC. (Muldowney, Patrick)
March 16, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER: If the Swissport Defendants wish to submit an alternative proposed Collective Action Notice for the Court to consider in the event that it grants conditional certification (see Swissport Defendants' Mem. of Law at 14 n.9, Dkt. 236), they should file the Notice by March 24, 2017, or discuss their proposed changes with Plaintiffs' counsel. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 3/16/2017. (Feldman, Shira)
March 15, 2017 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: A Discovery Conference, and a Motion Hearing regarding #229 Plaintiffs' Motion for Conditional Certification, are scheduled for March 28, 2017 at 12:00 p.m. in Courtroom 11C South before Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 3/15/2017. (Feldman, Shira)
March 3, 2017 Filing 249 Letter regarding Plaintiffs' Motion for Conditional Certification of a Collective Action Pursuant to Section 216(b) of the FLSA. by Jose Oakley (Kessler, Troy)
January 31, 2017 Filing 248 Letter regarding Plaintiffs' Motion for Conditional Certification of a Collective Action Pursuant to Section 216(b) of the FLSA, and requesting an initial conference by Jose Oakley (Kessler, Troy)
November 23, 2016 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #247 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Andrew I. Glenn is permitted to appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of plaintiffs Jose Oakley and Douglas Levy. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 11/23/2016. (Riquelme, Claudia)
November 22, 2016 Filing 247 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Andrew I Glenn Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0207-9087602. by Douglas Levy, Jose Oakley. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit NJ Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit FL Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Proposed Order) (Jaffe, Jodi)
November 15, 2016 Filing 246 NOTICE of Change of Address: 677 Broadway, 9th Floor, Albany, New York 12207; Phone: (518) 512-8700; Fax: 518-242-7730 by William J. Anthony (Anthony, William)
July 11, 2016 Filing 245 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re #229 Notice of MOTION to Certify FLSA Collective Action filed by Douglas Levy, Jose Oakley. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration, #3 Declaration) (Palitz, Michael)
July 11, 2016 Filing 244 REPLY in Support re #229 Notice of MOTION to Certify FLSA Collective Action filed by Douglas Levy, Jose Oakley. (Palitz, Michael)
July 5, 2016 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #243 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Plaintiffs' request to retroactively extend the parties' page limits for Plaintiffs' memorandum of law in support, and Defendants' opposition to, Plaintiffs' Motion for Conditional Certification. ECF Nos. #236 (Pls. Mem. of Law); ECF No. #237 (Swissport's Mem. of Law); ECF No. #239 (Servisairs Mem. of Law) is GRANTED. Plaintiffs' request for their reply brief to be up to 15 pages is also GRANTED. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 7/5/2016. (Riquelme, Claudia)
July 1, 2016 Filing 243 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages - on consent of all parties by Jose Oakley. (Kessler, Troy)
June 27, 2016 Filing 242 DECLARATION re #236 Memorandum in Opposition, to Plaintiffs' Motion for Conditional Certification by SWISSPORT CARGO SERVICES, INC., SWISSPORT CARGO SERVICES, L.P., SWISSPORT FUELING, INC., SWISSPORT LOUNGE, LLC,, SWISSPORT, U.S.A., INC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E) (Muldowney, Patrick)
June 27, 2016 Filing 241 DECLARATION re #236 Memorandum in Opposition, to Plaintiffs' Motion for Conditional Certification by SWISSPORT CARGO SERVICES, INC., SWISSPORT CARGO SERVICES, L.P., SWISSPORT FUELING, INC., SWISSPORT LOUNGE, LLC,, SWISSPORT, U.S.A., INC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Muldowney, Patrick)
June 27, 2016 Filing 240 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Opposition re #229 Notice of MOTION to Certify FLSA Collective Action filed by Servisair, LLC. (Briton, Roger)
June 27, 2016 Filing 239 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #229 Notice of MOTION to Certify FLSA Collective Action filed by Servisair, LLC. (Briton, Roger)
June 27, 2016 Filing 238 DECLARATION re #236 Memorandum in Opposition, to Plaintiffs' Motion for Conditional Certification by SWISSPORT CARGO SERVICES, INC., SWISSPORT CARGO SERVICES, L.P., SWISSPORT FUELING, INC., SWISSPORT LOUNGE, LLC,, SWISSPORT, U.S.A., INC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E) (Muldowney, Patrick)
June 27, 2016 Filing 237 DECLARATION re #236 Memorandum in Opposition, to Plaintiff's Motion for Conditional Certification by SWISSPORT CARGO SERVICES, INC., SWISSPORT CARGO SERVICES, L.P., SWISSPORT FUELING, INC., SWISSPORT LOUNGE, LLC,, SWISSPORT, U.S.A., INC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Muldowney, Patrick)
June 27, 2016 Filing 236 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #230 Memorandum in Support of Motion for Conditional Certification filed by SWISSPORT CARGO SERVICES, INC., SWISSPORT CARGO SERVICES, L.P., SWISSPORT FUELING, INC., SWISSPORT LOUNGE, LLC,, SWISSPORT, U.S.A., INC. (Muldowney, Patrick)
June 20, 2016 Filing 235 NOTICE by CRESANTO BECK (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent to Join) (Jaffe, Jodi)
June 20, 2016 Filing 234 NOTICE by RAPHAEL MCLEOD (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent to Join) (Jaffe, Jodi)
June 16, 2016 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #233 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. The deadline for Defendants' Response regarding #229 is extended to June 27, 2016. The deadline for Plaintiffs' Reply is extended to July 11, 2016. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 6/16/2016. (Feldman, Shira)
June 14, 2016 Filing 233 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #229 Notice of MOTION to Certify FLSA Collective Action by SWISSPORT CARGO SERVICES, INC., SWISSPORT CARGO SERVICES, L.P., SWISSPORT FUELING, INC., SWISSPORT INTERNATIONAL, LTD., SWISSPORT LOUNGE, LLC,, SWISSPORT, U.S.A., INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Muldowney, Patrick)
May 26, 2016 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #232 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Meagan Martin is permitted to appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of defendants SWISSPORT CARGO SERVICES, INC., SWISSPORT CARGO SERVICES, L.P., SWISSPORT FUELING, INC., SWISSPORT LOUNGE, LLC, and SWISSPORT, U.S.A., INC. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 5/26/2016. (Riquelme, Claudia)
May 25, 2016 Filing 232 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0207-8634960. by SWISSPORT CARGO SERVICES, INC., SWISSPORT CARGO SERVICES, L.P., SWISSPORT FUELING, INC., SWISSPORT LOUNGE, LLC,, SWISSPORT, U.S.A., INC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Affidavit) (Martin, Meagan)
May 17, 2016 Filing 231 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re #229 Notice of MOTION to Certify FLSA Collective Action filed by Douglas Levy, Jose Oakley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2 - 14 (Declarations), #3 Exhibit 15 -31 (Declarations), #4 Exhibit 32, #5 Exhibit 33, #6 Exhibit 34, #7 Exhibit 35, #8 Exhibit 36, #9 Exhibit 37, #10 Exhibit 38) (Palitz, Michael)
May 17, 2016 Filing 230 MEMORANDUM in Support re #229 Notice of MOTION to Certify FLSA Collective Action filed by Douglas Levy, Jose Oakley. (Palitz, Michael)
May 17, 2016 Filing 229 Notice of MOTION to Certify FLSA Collective Action by Douglas Levy, Jose Oakley. Responses due by 6/17/2016 (Palitz, Michael)
May 17, 2016 Filing 228 NOTICE of Appearance by Garrett D. Kaske on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Kaske, Garrett)
May 16, 2016 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: The proposed briefing schedule at #227 is so-ordered. Pursuant to Magistrate Judge Kuo's Individual Practice Rules, the parties are to file each submission via the Court's electronic filing system by each deadline specified. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 5/16/2016. (Feldman, Shira)
May 11, 2016 Filing 227 Letter to District Judge Eric N. Vitaliano Regarding Proposed Briefing Schedule for Plaintiffs' Motion for Conditional Certification and Court-Authorized Notice Pursuant to Section 216(b) of the Fair Labor Standards Act by Jose Oakley (Palitz, Michael)
January 15, 2016 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #226 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Andrew Glenn terminated. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 1/15/2016. (Feldman, Shira)
January 5, 2016 Filing 226 First MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Andrew I. Glenn by RICHEMANE ACADO, MOHAMED ADERDOUR, VICENTE AGUILAR, MIGUEL ALARCON, GREENDIGE ANDRE, MOHAMED AZELMAD, JEAN LOUIS BAEAUVILET, RUDOLPH BAILEY, PATRICK BECKFORD, DENNIS BELLAMY, SANDLY BIEN-AINE, MICHAEL BLAKE, EDWARD BOOTH, GEORGE BREWSTER, PHILLIP CAMPBELL, JEAN CARENAN, MARCELINE LOUIS CHARLES, DELVA CLODOMIR, DUNCAN COLLIN, ROSA COLON, JANETTE COLTER, YUSI COMMINGS, ELIECER COMPANIONI, DARIO CORDERO, RAFAEL CUAN, DEWONE L CURRIN, Tammy Canty, Chaiyaporn Chalumporn, Asuncion Corona, ANDRE DWAYNE DALEY, HARRY M DAUTNUCHE, MARK DAVIDSON, PHILIPPE DAVIDSON, KENNY DAWSON, JOSE DE LA CRUZ, JEAN MOISES DELY, JOSEPH L. DESAMOIURS, FILIBERT DESROSIN, FITZROY DEWAR, YDY RAMON DIAZ PAULINO, DENNIS DOLTAN, CHARLES DULCIO, INOBERT DULCIO, JAMES DUNCAN, BLOOBENS EDON, ANTHONY ELDERFIELD, ENCEAU FATAL, CARLOS FREYTES, DEMETRIUS GIRLIE, KIM GLOVER, JOSE A GONZALEZ, ERIBERTO GONZALEZ, FRANKLIN GONZALEZ, ANTHONY GORDON, GILBERT GORDON, GARDFIELD GRAY, JOHN GRAY, TIMOTHY GREEN, ANDRE GRIERSON, WILSON LORA GRULLON, CARLOS GUZMAN, JUAN R GUZMAN, Daniel Garland, SERENA HALL, NICARDO HANSON, GEORGE HARRIS, FERNANDO HART, TOMAS HERNANDEZ, JOHN HOBBS, JAMES HOGG, Miguel A. Iniguez, LARRY JACKSON, LOUIS G JEAN, JOSNEL JOASSAINT, KENNNETH WAYNE JORDAN, VILMES JUSMA, Josette Jones, Adolphus Jordan, Jr., Fred Joseph, WHITT LASEY, EMMANUEL LAURENT, RODOLFO LOPEZ, WILFREDO LOPEZ, JUANY JEAN LOUIS, WALLACE LUKE, Douglas Levy, KEVIN MANGAROO, LUCY MARTINEZ, MANUEL MATALLANA, CHRISTOPHER MATTISON, RONALD MCCLAIN, GILBERTO MERCADO, BRODERICK MIDDLEBROOK, GEOVANNI MORALES, FREDDIE MORRIS, KENNETH MORRISON, DESDMONA MOSS, WILLIAM MYERS, Larry Marcelus, Stephanie Mendoza, CARLOS NEIRA, DONORAN NELSON, BONNY NESLY, MIGUEL ORDONEZ, CLIVE OUTAR, Jose Oakley, Francisco Ortega, ROBERTO PARRA, CARLOS PEREZ, CESAR PEREZ, RAFAEL PEREZ, MARK PHILLIPS, OMAR PHILLIPS, MARC PIERRE, EGBERT PRICE, JONATHAN PRICE, Carlos Prado, Jr, Carlos W Prado, KENNETH RAMJHON, LAZARO RAMOS, GREGORY RAMSEY, JEAN RICHARD, ISABEL RIVERA, HAROLD ROBERSON, JORGE RODRIGUEZ, SYLVESTRE RODRIGUEZ, ANTONIO E RODRIGUEZ, WILMA ROMAN, Garette Rockhead, WILNER SAINTIL, RAYMOND SALAZAR, JOSE SANCHEZ MOYA, LUIS SERRANO, DUALEXTE SEWETEUS, LACHHMAN SIEUNARINE, JONATHAN SILVA, ALLAN R. STERLING, MARCKENSON STVIL, GARY SWAN, Antony C Samuel, JEFFREY THURSBY, ROBERTO A TOBAR, MAYRA TRUJILLO, JOSE M URENA, EDUARDO URQUESA, ANGEL VAZQUEZ, JOSEPH VENUS, RENE VERDEZA, ROBERT WALKER, MEKONEN WELDERMARIAM, JAMEL R WESTON, Vincent Williams, QUINTIN YEARBY, RAYMOND ZIELINSKI. (Jaffe, Jodi)
January 5, 2016 Filing 225 NOTICE of Change of Address by Jodi Jill Jaffe (Jaffe, Jodi)
November 5, 2015 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #223 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Keith Michael Stern terminated; granting #224 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 11/4/2015. (Riquelme, Claudia)
November 3, 2015 Filing 224 Notice of MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0207-8143378. by Servisair, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Tasos C. Paindiris in Support of Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice, #2 Proposed Order) (Paindiris, Tasos)
October 28, 2015 Filing 223 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Keith M. Stern by Douglas Levy, Jose Oakley. (Shavitz, Gregg)
October 18, 2015 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo. Magistrate Judge Viktor V. Pohorelsky no longer assigned to the case.Please continue to follow the individual practices of Magistrate Judge Pohorelsky, located on our #website, where applicable until further notice.Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Mahoney, Brenna)
October 12, 2015 Filing 222 NOTICE of Appearance by Marijana F Matura on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Matura, Marijana)
October 9, 2015 Filing 221 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael John Palitz on behalf of Jose Oakley (aty to be noticed) (Palitz, Michael)
September 30, 2015 Filing 220 NOTICE of Appearance by Troy L. Kessler on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Kessler, Troy)
July 22, 2015 Filing 219 NOTICE by Chaiyaporn Chalumporn Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent to Join) (Jaffe, Jodi)
July 22, 2015 Filing 218 NOTICE by ELIECER COMPANIONI Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent to Join) (Jaffe, Jodi)
March 16, 2015 Filing 217 ANSWER to #208 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,, /Answer of Defendant Derichebourg SA to Fourth Amended Collective and Class Action Complaint by Derichebourg SA. (Ricardo, Shawn)
March 4, 2015 Filing 216 CONSENT to become party in a collective action. by WILFREDO LOPEZ (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent to Join) (Jaffe, Jodi)
February 24, 2015 Filing 215 NOTICE by Servisair, LLC Requesting AttorneyTermination From Case (Briton, Roger)
February 20, 2015 Filing 214 ANSWER to #208 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,, - FOURTH AMENDED by SWISSPORT CARGO SERVICES, INC., SWISSPORT CARGO SERVICES, L.P., SWISSPORT FUELING, INC., SWISSPORT LOUNGE, LLC,, SWISSPORT, U.S.A., INC. (Muldowney, Patrick)
February 19, 2015 Filing 213 ANSWER to #208 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,, by Servisair, LLC. (Anthony, William)
February 12, 2015 Filing 212 STIPULATION Regarding service upon, and time for responsive pleading from, defendant Derichebourg, SA by Douglas Levy, Jose Oakley (Shavitz, Gregg)
February 12, 2015 Filing 211 NOTICE of Appearance by Shawn P. Ricardo on behalf of Derichebourg SA (aty to be noticed) (Ricardo, Shawn)
February 12, 2015 Filing 210 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey T. Golenbock on behalf of Derichebourg SA (aty to be noticed) (Golenbock, Jeffrey)
February 5, 2015 Filing 209 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by RICHEMANE ACADO, MOHAMED ADERDOUR, VICENTE AGUILAR, MIGUEL ALARCON, GREENDIGE ANDRE, MOHAMED AZELMAD, JEAN LOUIS BAEAUVILET, RUDOLPH BAILEY, PATRICK BECKFORD, DENNIS BELLAMY, SANDLY BIEN-AINE, MICHAEL BLAKE, EDWARD BOOTH, GEORGE BREWSTER, PHILLIP CAMPBELL, JEAN CARENAN, MARCELINE LOUIS CHARLES, DELVA CLODOMIR, DUNCAN COLLIN, ROSA COLON, JANETTE COLTER, YUSI COMMINGS, DARIO CORDERO, RAFAEL CUAN, DEWONE L CURRIN, Tammy Canty, Asuncion Corona, ANDRE DWAYNE DALEY, HARRY M DAUTNUCHE, MARK DAVIDSON, PHILIPPE DAVIDSON, KENNY DAWSON, JOSE DE LA CRUZ, JEAN MOISES DELY, JOSEPH L. DESAMOIURS, FILIBERT DESROSIN, FITZROY DEWAR, YDY RAMON DIAZ PAULINO, DENNIS DOLTAN, CHARLES DULCIO, INOBERT DULCIO, JAMES DUNCAN, BLOOBENS EDON, ANTHONY ELDERFIELD, ENCEAU FATAL, CARLOS FREYTES, DEMETRIUS GIRLIE, KIM GLOVER, JOSE A GONZALEZ, ERIBERTO GONZALEZ, FRANKLIN GONZALEZ, ANTHONY GORDON, GILBERT GORDON, GARDFIELD GRAY, JOHN GRAY, TIMOTHY GREEN, ANDRE GRIERSON, WILSON LORA GRULLON, CARLOS GUZMAN, JUAN R GUZMAN, Daniel Garland, SERENA HALL, NICARDO HANSON, GEORGE HARRIS, FERNANDO HART, TOMAS HERNANDEZ, JOHN HOBBS, JAMES HOGG, Miguel A. Iniguez, LARRY JACKSON, LOUIS G JEAN, JOSNEL JOASSAINT, KENNNETH WAYNE JORDAN, VILMES JUSMA, Josette Jones, Adolphus Jordan, Jr., Fred Joseph, WHITT LASEY, EMMANUEL LAURENT, RODOLFO LOPEZ, JUANY JEAN LOUIS, WALLACE LUKE, Douglas Levy, KEVIN MANGAROO, LUCY MARTINEZ, MANUEL MATALLANA, CHRISTOPHER MATTISON, RONALD MCCLAIN, GILBERTO MERCADO, BRODERICK MIDDLEBROOK, GEOVANNI MORALES, FREDDIE MORRIS, KENNETH MORRISON, DESDMONA MOSS, WILLIAM MYERS, Larry Marcelus, Stephanie Mendoza, CARLOS NEIRA, DONORAN NELSON, BONNY NESLY, MIGUEL ORDONEZ, CLIVE OUTAR, Jose Oakley, Francisco Ortega, ROBERTO PARRA, CARLOS PEREZ, CESAR PEREZ, RAFAEL PEREZ, MARK PHILLIPS, OMAR PHILLIPS, MARC PIERRE, EGBERT PRICE, JONATHAN PRICE, Carlos Prado, Jr, Carlos W Prado, KENNETH RAMJHON, LAZARO RAMOS, GREGORY RAMSEY, JEAN RICHARD, ISABEL RIVERA, HAROLD ROBERSON, JORGE RODRIGUEZ, SYLVESTRE RODRIGUEZ, ANTONIO E RODRIGUEZ, WILMA ROMAN, Garette Rockhead, WILNER SAINTIL, RAYMOND SALAZAR, JOSE SANCHEZ MOYA, LUIS SERRANO, DUALEXTE SEWETEUS, LACHHMAN SIEUNARINE, JONATHAN SILVA, ALLAN R. STERLING, MARCKENSON STVIL, GARY SWAN, Antony C Samuel, JEFFREY THURSBY, ROBERTO A TOBAR, MAYRA TRUJILLO, JOSE M URENA, EDUARDO URQUESA, ANGEL VAZQUEZ, JOSEPH VENUS, RENE VERDEZA, ROBERT WALKER, MEKONEN WELDERMARIAM, JAMEL R WESTON, Vincent Williams, QUINTIN YEARBY, RAYMOND ZIELINSKI WITHOUT PREJUDICE (Jaffe, Jodi)
February 5, 2015 Filing 208 AMENDED COMPLAINT FOURTH CLASS AND COLLECTIVE ACTION against All Defendants, filed by EMMANUEL LAURENT, JOSEPH VENUS, JEAN MOISES DELY, JEAN RICHARD, JOSE SANCHEZ MOYA, SANDLY BIEN-AINE, JOHN GRAY, JORGE RODRIGUEZ, HAROLD ROBERSON, TIMOTHY GREEN, Carlos Prado, Jr, MARC PIERRE, INOBERT DULCIO, ALLAN R. STERLING, RAYMOND ZIELINSKI, PHILLIP CAMPBELL, MICHAEL BLAKE, Daniel Garland, LACHHMAN SIEUNARINE, ANTHONY GORDON, LAZARO RAMOS, ROSA COLON, GARDFIELD GRAY, CARLOS FREYTES, DONORAN NELSON, BONNY NESLY, DENNIS BELLAMY, Josette Jones, MIGUEL ORDONEZ, HARRY M DAUTNUCHE, JOSE DE LA CRUZ, YDY RAMON DIAZ PAULINO, RAFAEL PEREZ, YUSI COMMINGS, GILBERTO MERCADO, JONATHAN PRICE, MANUEL MATALLANA, FERNANDO HART, JAMES HOGG, Antony C Samuel, GILBERT GORDON, EDUARDO URQUESA, Larry Marcelus, FITZROY DEWAR, Garette Rockhead, DEMETRIUS GIRLIE, JOSEPH L. DESAMOIURS, MAYRA TRUJILLO, MEKONEN WELDERMARIAM, JUAN R GUZMAN, MARK PHILLIPS, JEAN LOUIS BAEAUVILET, DEWONE L CURRIN, VILMES JUSMA, KENNETH RAMJHON, SERENA HALL, EDWARD BOOTH, ROBERT WALKER, JOSNEL JOASSAINT, DENNIS DOLTAN, Carlos W Prado, LUCY MARTINEZ, QUINTIN YEARBY, ANTONIO E RODRIGUEZ, WILNER SAINTIL, KENNETH MORRISON, JEFFREY THURSBY, BRODERICK MIDDLEBROOK, DARIO CORDERO, JOSE M URENA, FREDDIE MORRIS, Miguel A. Iniguez, MIGUEL ALARCON, Asuncion Corona, ANTHONY ELDERFIELD, RAYMOND SALAZAR, JONATHAN SILVA, GARY SWAN, EGBERT PRICE, GEORGE BREWSTER, KIM GLOVER, CARLOS GUZMAN, DUALEXTE SEWETEUS, JEAN CARENAN, KEVIN MANGAROO, MARCELINE LOUIS CHARLES, NICARDO HANSON, DUNCAN COLLIN, RONALD MCCLAIN, JOSE A GONZALEZ, WHITT LASEY, GREENDIGE ANDRE, Adolphus Jordan, Jr., RENE VERDEZA, Francisco Ortega, OMAR PHILLIPS, GEOVANNI MORALES, WILLIAM MYERS, ENCEAU FATAL, ISABEL RIVERA, VICENTE AGUILAR, KENNNETH WAYNE JORDAN, Stephanie Mendoza, JUANY JEAN LOUIS, DELVA CLODOMIR, GEORGE HARRIS, LOUIS G JEAN, CHRISTOPHER MATTISON, ERIBERTO GONZALEZ, MOHAMED ADERDOUR, Tammy Canty, JOHN HOBBS, RUDOLPH BAILEY, ROBERTO PARRA, PHILIPPE DAVIDSON, BLOOBENS EDON, CARLOS NEIRA, ANDRE DWAYNE DALEY, WILMA ROMAN, MARK DAVIDSON, Jose Oakley, JAMES DUNCAN, WALLACE LUKE, ANGEL VAZQUEZ, FRANKLIN GONZALEZ, CLIVE OUTAR, TOMAS HERNANDEZ, GREGORY RAMSEY, RAFAEL CUAN, ROBERTO A TOBAR, Vincent Williams, WILSON LORA GRULLON, MOHAMED AZELMAD, CARLOS PEREZ, LUIS SERRANO, RODOLFO LOPEZ, JANETTE COLTER, MARCKENSON STVIL, RICHEMANE ACADO, KENNY DAWSON, Fred Joseph, CHARLES DULCIO, Douglas Levy, JAMEL R WESTON, FILIBERT DESROSIN, PATRICK BECKFORD, SYLVESTRE RODRIGUEZ, LARRY JACKSON, ANDRE GRIERSON, DESDMONA MOSS, CESAR PEREZ. (Jaffe, Jodi)
February 5, 2015 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #207 unopposed motion for leave to file a fourth amended complaint. The motion is granted, and plaintiff is directed to file and serve its amended complaint on or before February 13, 2015. Ordered by Judge Eric N. Vitaliano on 2/5/2015. (Connor, Nicholas)
February 4, 2015 Filing 207 Letter UNOPPOSED LEAVE TO FILE 4TH AMENDED COMPLAINT by RICHEMANE ACADO, MOHAMED ADERDOUR, VICENTE AGUILAR, MIGUEL ALARCON, GREENDIGE ANDRE, MOHAMED AZELMAD, JEAN LOUIS BAEAUVILET, RUDOLPH BAILEY, PATRICK BECKFORD, DENNIS BELLAMY, SANDLY BIEN-AINE, MICHAEL BLAKE, EDWARD BOOTH, GEORGE BREWSTER, PHILLIP CAMPBELL, JEAN CARENAN, MARCELINE LOUIS CHARLES, DELVA CLODOMIR, DUNCAN COLLIN, ROSA COLON, JANETTE COLTER, YUSI COMMINGS, DARIO CORDERO, RAFAEL CUAN, DEWONE L CURRIN, Tammy Canty, Asuncion Corona, ANDRE DWAYNE DALEY, HARRY M DAUTNUCHE, MARK DAVIDSON, PHILIPPE DAVIDSON, KENNY DAWSON, JOSE DE LA CRUZ, JEAN MOISES DELY, JOSEPH L. DESAMOIURS, FILIBERT DESROSIN, FITZROY DEWAR, YDY RAMON DIAZ PAULINO, DENNIS DOLTAN, CHARLES DULCIO, INOBERT DULCIO, JAMES DUNCAN, BLOOBENS EDON, ANTHONY ELDERFIELD, ENCEAU FATAL, CARLOS FREYTES, DEMETRIUS GIRLIE, KIM GLOVER, JOSE A GONZALEZ, ERIBERTO GONZALEZ, FRANKLIN GONZALEZ, ANTHONY GORDON, GILBERT GORDON, GARDFIELD GRAY, JOHN GRAY, TIMOTHY GREEN, ANDRE GRIERSON, WILSON LORA GRULLON, CARLOS GUZMAN, JUAN R GUZMAN, Daniel Garland, SERENA HALL, NICARDO HANSON, GEORGE HARRIS, FERNANDO HART, TOMAS HERNANDEZ, JOHN HOBBS, JAMES HOGG, Miguel A. Iniguez, LARRY JACKSON, LOUIS G JEAN, JOSNEL JOASSAINT, KENNNETH WAYNE JORDAN, VILMES JUSMA, Josette Jones, Adolphus Jordan, Jr., Fred Joseph, WHITT LASEY, EMMANUEL LAURENT, RODOLFO LOPEZ, JUANY JEAN LOUIS, WALLACE LUKE, Douglas Levy, KEVIN MANGAROO, LUCY MARTINEZ, MANUEL MATALLANA, CHRISTOPHER MATTISON, RONALD MCCLAIN, GILBERTO MERCADO, BRODERICK MIDDLEBROOK, GEOVANNI MORALES, FREDDIE MORRIS, KENNETH MORRISON, DESDMONA MOSS, WILLIAM MYERS, Larry Marcelus, Stephanie Mendoza, CARLOS NEIRA, DONORAN NELSON, BONNY NESLY, MIGUEL ORDONEZ, CLIVE OUTAR, Jose Oakley, Francisco Ortega, ROBERTO PARRA, CARLOS PEREZ, CESAR PEREZ, RAFAEL PEREZ, MARK PHILLIPS, OMAR PHILLIPS, MARC PIERRE, EGBERT PRICE, JONATHAN PRICE, Carlos Prado, Jr, Carlos W Prado, KENNETH RAMJHON, LAZARO RAMOS, GREGORY RAMSEY, JEAN RICHARD, ISABEL RIVERA, HAROLD ROBERSON, JORGE RODRIGUEZ, SYLVESTRE RODRIGUEZ, ANTONIO E RODRIGUEZ, WILMA ROMAN, Garette Rockhead, WILNER SAINTIL, RAYMOND SALAZAR, JOSE SANCHEZ MOYA, LUIS SERRANO, DUALEXTE SEWETEUS, LACHHMAN SIEUNARINE, JONATHAN SILVA, ALLAN R. STERLING, MARCKENSON STVIL, GARY SWAN, Antony C Samuel, JEFFREY THURSBY, ROBERTO A TOBAR, MAYRA TRUJILLO, JOSE M URENA, EDUARDO URQUESA, ANGEL VAZQUEZ, JOSEPH VENUS, RENE VERDEZA, ROBERT WALKER, MEKONEN WELDERMARIAM, JAMEL R WESTON, Vincent Williams, QUINTIN YEARBY, RAYMOND ZIELINSKI (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A", #2 Exhibit "B") (Jaffe, Jodi)
November 7, 2014 Filing 206 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Douglas Levy, Jose Oakley without prejudice of Swissport International, Ltd. (Stern, Keith)
October 24, 2014 Filing 205 Letter for Enlargement of Time by RICHEMANE ACADO, MOHAMED ADERDOUR, VICENTE AGUILAR, MIGUEL ALARCON, GREENDIGE ANDRE, MOHAMED AZELMAD, JEAN LOUIS BAEAUVILET, RUDOLPH BAILEY, PATRICK BECKFORD, DENNIS BELLAMY, SANDLY BIEN-AINE, MICHAEL BLAKE, EDWARD BOOTH, GEORGE BREWSTER, PHILLIP CAMPBELL, JEAN CARENAN, MARCELINE LOUIS CHARLES, DELVA CLODOMIR, DUNCAN COLLIN, ROSA COLON, JANETTE COLTER, YUSI COMMINGS, DARIO CORDERO, RAFAEL CUAN, DEWONE L CURRIN, Tammy Canty, Asuncion Corona, ANDRE DWAYNE DALEY, HARRY M DAUTNUCHE, MARK DAVIDSON, PHILIPPE DAVIDSON, KENNY DAWSON, JOSE DE LA CRUZ, JEAN MOISES DELY, JOSEPH L. DESAMOIURS, FILIBERT DESROSIN, FITZROY DEWAR, YDY RAMON DIAZ PAULINO, DENNIS DOLTAN, CHARLES DULCIO, INOBERT DULCIO, JAMES DUNCAN, BLOOBENS EDON, ANTHONY ELDERFIELD, ENCEAU FATAL, CARLOS FREYTES, DEMETRIUS GIRLIE, KIM GLOVER, JOSE A GONZALEZ, ERIBERTO GONZALEZ, FRANKLIN GONZALEZ, ANTHONY GORDON, GILBERT GORDON, GARDFIELD GRAY, JOHN GRAY, TIMOTHY GREEN, ANDRE GRIERSON, WILSON LORA GRULLON, CARLOS GUZMAN, JUAN R GUZMAN, Daniel Garland, SERENA HALL, NICARDO HANSON, GEORGE HARRIS, FERNANDO HART, TOMAS HERNANDEZ, JOHN HOBBS, JAMES HOGG, Miguel A. Iniguez, LARRY JACKSON, LOUIS G JEAN, JOSNEL JOASSAINT, KENNNETH WAYNE JORDAN, VILMES JUSMA, Josette Jones, Adolphus Jordan, Jr., Fred Joseph, WHITT LASEY, EMMANUEL LAURENT, RODOLFO LOPEZ, JUANY JEAN LOUIS, WALLACE LUKE, Douglas Levy, KEVIN MANGAROO, LUCY MARTINEZ, MANUEL MATALLANA, CHRISTOPHER MATTISON, RONALD MCCLAIN, GILBERTO MERCADO, BRODERICK MIDDLEBROOK, GEOVANNI MORALES, FREDDIE MORRIS, KENNETH MORRISON, DESDMONA MOSS, WILLIAM MYERS, Larry Marcelus, Stephanie Mendoza, CARLOS NEIRA, DONORAN NELSON, BONNY NESLY, MIGUEL ORDONEZ, CLIVE OUTAR, Jose Oakley, Francisco Ortega, ROBERTO PARRA, CARLOS PEREZ, CESAR PEREZ, RAFAEL PEREZ, MARK PHILLIPS, OMAR PHILLIPS, MARC PIERRE, EGBERT PRICE, JONATHAN PRICE, Carlos Prado, Jr, Carlos W Prado, KENNETH RAMJHON, LAZARO RAMOS, GREGORY RAMSEY, JEAN RICHARD, ISABEL RIVERA, HAROLD ROBERSON, JORGE RODRIGUEZ, SYLVESTRE RODRIGUEZ, ANTONIO E RODRIGUEZ, WILMA ROMAN, Garette Rockhead, WILNER SAINTIL, RAYMOND SALAZAR, JOSE SANCHEZ MOYA, LUIS SERRANO, DUALEXTE SEWETEUS, LACHHMAN SIEUNARINE, JONATHAN SILVA, ALLAN R. STERLING, MARCKENSON STVIL, GARY SWAN, Antony C Samuel, JEFFREY THURSBY, ROBERTO A TOBAR, MAYRA TRUJILLO, JOSE M URENA, EDUARDO URQUESA, ANGEL VAZQUEZ, JOSEPH VENUS, RENE VERDEZA, ROBERT WALKER, MEKONEN WELDERMARIAM, JAMEL R WESTON, Vincent Williams, QUINTIN YEARBY, RAYMOND ZIELINSKI (Jaffe, Jodi)
October 2, 2014 Opinion or Order ORDER granting permission to defendant Suissport International, LLC ("SPI") to make a motion to dismiss, and granting the parties proposed briefing schedule. Defendant SPI is to serve its motion on or before October 3, 2014. Plaintiffs are to serve their response on or before October 24, 2014. SPI is directed to serve its reply, if any, by November 7, 2014, and to upload a fully-briefed motion to ECF by that date as well. Ordered by Judge Eric N. Vitaliano on 10/2/2014. (Connor, Nicholas)
September 24, 2014 Filing 204 Letter MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and to Approve Briefing Schedule by SWISSPORT INTERNATIONAL, LTD.. (Muldowney, Patrick)
September 12, 2014 Filing 203 ANSWER to #189 Amended Complaint, (Third) by SWISSPORT CARGO SERVICES, INC., SWISSPORT CARGO SERVICES, L.P., SWISSPORT FUELING, INC., SWISSPORT LOUNGE, LLC,, SWISSPORT, U.S.A., INC. (Muldowney, Patrick)
September 4, 2014 Opinion or Order ORDER re #201 Stipulation. Collectively, the "American Swissport Defendants" answers due 9/12/2014. The Stipulation is SO ORDERED. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Viktor V. Pohorelsky on 9/4/2014. (Newton, Joan)
August 29, 2014 Filing 202 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy Joy Traub on behalf of SWISSPORT CARGO SERVICES, INC., SWISSPORT CARGO SERVICES, L.P., SWISSPORT FUELING, INC., SWISSPORT INTERNATIONAL, LTD., SWISSPORT LOUNGE, LLC,, SWISSPORT, U.S.A., INC (aty to be noticed) (Traub, Amy)
August 29, 2014 Filing 201 STIPULATION re #189 Amended Complaint, as to Acceptance of Service of Process and Response to Answer by SWISSPORT CARGO SERVICES, INC., SWISSPORT CARGO SERVICES, L.P., SWISSPORT FUELING, INC., SWISSPORT LOUNGE, LLC,, SWISSPORT, U.S.A., INC (Muldowney, Patrick)
August 29, 2014 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #200 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer SWISSPORT CARGO SERVICES, INC. et al. answer due 9/24/2014.Ordered by Judge Eric N. Vitaliano on 8/29/2014. (Connor, Nicholas)
August 28, 2014 Filing 200 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #189 Amended Complaint, by SWISSPORT CARGO SERVICES, INC., SWISSPORT CARGO SERVICES, L.P., SWISSPORT FUELING, INC., SWISSPORT INTERNATIONAL, LTD., SWISSPORT LOUNGE, LLC,, SWISSPORT, U.S.A., INC. (Muldowney, Patrick)
August 28, 2014 Filing 199 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SWISSPORT CARGO SERVICES, INC., SWISSPORT CARGO SERVICES, L.P., SWISSPORT FUELING, INC., SWISSPORT INTERNATIONAL, LTD., SWISSPORT LOUNGE, LLC,, SWISSPORT, U.S.A., INC identifying Corporate Parent Aguila PAI S.a.r.1., Corporate Parent Aguila 1 S.a.r.1., Corporate Parent Aguila 2 SA, Corporate Parent Aguila 3 SA, Corporate Parent Aguila Bid AG for SWISSPORT CARGO SERVICES, INC., SWISSPORT CARGO SERVICES, L.P., SWISSPORT FUELING, INC., SWISSPORT INTERNATIONAL, LTD., SWISSPORT LOUNGE, LLC,, SWISSPORT, U.S.A., INC. (Muldowney, Patrick)
August 28, 2014 Filing 198 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick M. Muldowney on behalf of SWISSPORT CARGO SERVICES, INC., SWISSPORT CARGO SERVICES, L.P., SWISSPORT FUELING, INC., SWISSPORT INTERNATIONAL, LTD., SWISSPORT LOUNGE, LLC,, SWISSPORT, U.S.A., INC (aty to be noticed) (Muldowney, Patrick)
August 22, 2014 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #197 motion for Tiffany L. Cummins to appear Pro Hac Vice. Counsel shall file a notice of appearance. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Viktor V. Pohorelsky on 8/22/2014. (Toritto, Jim)
August 19, 2014 Filing 197 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 25, receipt number 0207-7146297. by SWISSPORT CARGO SERVICES, INC., SWISSPORT CARGO SERVICES, L.P., SWISSPORT FUELING, INC., SWISSPORT LOUNGE, LLC,, SWISSPORT, U.S.A., INC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order) (Cummins, Tiffany)
August 13, 2014 Filing 196 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SWISSPORT CARGO SERVICES, INC., SWISSPORT CARGO SERVICES, L.P., SWISSPORT FUELING, INC., SWISSPORT LOUNGE, LLC,, SWISSPORT, U.S.A., INC identifying Corporate Parent Swissport North America, Inc., Corporate Parent Swissport Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Swissport Cargo Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Swissport North America Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent SWISSPORT INTERNATIONAL, LTD., Corporate Parent Aguila PAI S.a.r.1., Corporate Parent Aguila 1 S.a.r.1., Corporate Parent Aguila 2 SA, Corporate Parent Aguila 3 SA, Corporate Parent Aguila Bid AG for SWISSPORT CARGO SERVICES, INC., SWISSPORT CARGO SERVICES, L.P., SWISSPORT FUELING, INC., SWISSPORT LOUNGE, LLC,, SWISSPORT, U.S.A., INC. (Muldowney, Patrick)
August 12, 2014 Filing 195 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick M. Muldowney on behalf of SWISSPORT CARGO SERVICES, INC., SWISSPORT CARGO SERVICES, L.P., SWISSPORT FUELING, INC., SWISSPORT LOUNGE, LLC,, SWISSPORT, U.S.A., INC (aty to be noticed) (Muldowney, Patrick)
July 24, 2014 Filing 194 ANSWER to #189 Amended Complaint, THIRD by Servisair, LLC. (Briton, Roger)
July 23, 2014 Filing 193 NOTICE by Douglas Levy, Jose Oakley OF UNAVAILABILITY August 13, 2014 through and including August 26, 2014 (Jaffe, Jodi)
July 22, 2014 Filing 192 NOTICE of Change of Address by Roger H. Briton (Briton, Roger)
July 11, 2014 Filing 191 Summons Issued as to SWISSPORT CARGO SERVICES, INC., SWISSPORT CARGO SERVICES, L.P., SWISSPORT FUELING, INC., SWISSPORT INTERNATIONAL, LTD., SWISSPORT LOUNGE, LLC,, SWISSPORT, U.S.A., INC. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons) (Fernandez, Erica)
July 10, 2014 Filing 189 AMENDED COMPLAINT third against Derichbourg Multiservices, Servisair, LLC, SWISSPORT INTERNATIONAL, LTD., SWISSPORT CARGO SERVICES, INC., SWISSPORT CARGO SERVICES, L.P., SWISSPORT FUELING, INC., SWISSPORT LOUNGE, LLC,, SWISSPORT, U.S.A., INC, filed by Jose Oakley, Douglas Levy. (Jaffe, Jodi)
July 8, 2014 NOTICE re #188 Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. Summons issued only as to listed parties Servisair, LLC and DERICHEBOURG MULTISERVICES. Summons will be issued for the other defendants upon filing of the Third Amended Complaint. (Fernandez, Erica)
July 8, 2014 Filing 190 Summons Issued as to listed parties Derichbourg Multiservices, Servisair, LLC only. (Fernandez, Erica) (Fernandez, Erica). (Main Document 190 replaced on 7/10/2014) (Fernandez, Erica). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/10/2014: #1 Summons, #3 Summons) (Fernandez, Erica).
July 2, 2014 Filing 188 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint by Douglas Levy, Jose Oakley (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons, #6 Proposed Summons, #7 Proposed Summons, #8 Proposed Summons, #9 Proposed Summons) (Jaffe, Jodi)
June 16, 2014 Opinion or Order ORDER: Plaintiffs are granted permission to serve their proposed third amended complaint. No further amendments will be allowed without a showing of substantial good cause. Unless otherwise extended upon application, defendants shall respond to the complaint within 20 days of service. Ordered by Judge Eric N. Vitaliano on 6/16/2014. (Weiner Chernoff, Stephanie)
June 13, 2014 Filing 187 STIPULATION re Order on Motion for Pre Motion Conference, To Permit Filing of Third Amended Complaint by Douglas Levy, Jose Oakley (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
June 12, 2014 Filing 186 CONSENT to become party in a collective action. by LOUIS G JEAN (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
June 12, 2014 Filing 185 CONSENT to become party in a collective action. by GREGORY RAMSEY (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
June 5, 2014 Filing 184 Letter Pursuant to the Court's June 3, 2014 Order by Servisair, LLC (Anthony, William)
June 3, 2014 Opinion or Order ORDER denying #183 Motion for Pre Motion Conference. Defendants have not responded to plaintiffs' letter request for a pre-motion conference. Defendants are directed to respond by the close of business on June 6, 2014. If defendants have no objection to plaintiffs' proposed amended complaint, a stipulation should be submitted by plaintiffs for ordering by the Court. Ordered by Judge Eric N. Vitaliano on 6/3/2014. (Weiner Chernoff, Stephanie)
May 16, 2014 Filing 183 MOTION for pre motion conference by Douglas Levy, Jose Oakley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Glenn, Andrew)
March 17, 2014 Filing 182 NOTICE by RAYMOND ZIELINSKI of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
March 5, 2014 Filing 181 NOTICE by ALLAN R. STERLING of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
March 4, 2014 Filing 180 NOTICE by FRED JOSEPH of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
February 28, 2014 Filing 179 NOTICE by Douglas Levy, Jose Oakley The undersigned counsel will be unavailable on the following dates: March 12, 2014 through and including March 21, 2014. (Jaffe, Jodi)
February 26, 2014 Filing 178 NOTICE by Josette Jones of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
February 18, 2014 Filing 177 NOTICE by Miguel A. Iniguez of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
February 17, 2014 Filing 176 NOTICE by STEPHANIE MENDOZA of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
February 11, 2014 Filing 175 NOTICE by Asuncion Corona of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
February 11, 2014 Filing 174 NOTICE by Antony C Samuel of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
February 6, 2014 Filing 173 NOTICE by Larry Marcelus of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
February 6, 2014 Filing 172 NOTICE by Adolphus Jordan, Jr. of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
January 28, 2014 Filing 171 NOTICE by TAMMY CANTY of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
January 24, 2014 Filing 170 NOTICE by Daniel Garland of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
December 16, 2013 Filing 169 NOTICE by GARETTE ROCKHEAD of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
December 16, 2013 Filing 168 NOTICE by PHILIPPE DAVIDSON, WILMA ROMAN of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
December 16, 2013 Filing 167 NOTICE by Douglas Levy, William Myers, Jose Oakley of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
December 11, 2013 Filing 166 ANSWER to #163 Amended Complaint Second by Servisair, LLC. (Briton, Roger)
December 11, 2013 Filing 165 NOTICE of Change of Firm Name by Roger H. Briton (Briton, Roger)
December 5, 2013 Filing 164 NOTICE of Change of Address by Jodi Jill Jaffe (Jaffe, Jodi)
November 25, 2013 Filing 163 AMENDED COMPLAINT *** Second against All Defendants, filed by EDWARD BOOTH, WILLIAM MYERS, Jose Oakley, Douglas Levy. (Jaffe, Jodi)
November 15, 2013 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #162 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. Plaintiffs' motion to file a second amended complaint is granted. Ordered by Judge Eric N. Vitaliano on 11/15/2013. (Weiner Chernoff, Stephanie)
November 14, 2013 Filing 162 Consent MOTION for Leave to File TO FILE PLAINTIFFS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by EDWARD BOOTH, Douglas Levy, William Myers, Jose Oakley. (Attachments: #1 Appendix) (Jaffe, Jodi)
November 14, 2013 Filing 161 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Matt Ellingson WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF MATT ELLINGSON (Jaffe, Jodi)
November 7, 2013 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #156 request for amended briefing schedule. The parties' joint request is granted as follows: plaintiffs to file a second amended complaint on or before November 14, 2013; defendants to file an answer or serve a motin to dismiss on or about December 13, 2013; plaintiffs to serve an opposition, if any, to defendants' motion on or before December 17, 2013; defendants to serve a reply, if any, on or before December 31, 2013, and to file all motion papers on ECF. Ordered by Judge Eric N. Vitaliano on 11/7/2013. (Weiner Chernoff, Stephanie)
November 6, 2013 Filing 160 NOTICE by GARY SWAN of filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
November 6, 2013 Filing 159 NOTICE by INOBERT DULCIO of filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
November 6, 2013 Filing 158 NOTICE by CHRISTOPHER MATTISON of filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
November 6, 2013 Filing 157 NOTICE by MARCKENSON STVIL of filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
November 4, 2013 Filing 156 Letter MOTION to Dismiss and Approve Briefing Schedule by Matt Ellingson, Servisair, LLC. (Briton, Roger)
October 18, 2013 Filing 155 NOTICE of Appearance by Keith Michael Stern on behalf of EDWARD BOOTH, Douglas Levy, William Myers, Jose Oakley (notification declined or already on case) (Stern, Keith)
October 18, 2013 Filing 154 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregg I. Shavitz on behalf of EDWARD BOOTH, Douglas Levy, William Myers, Jose Oakley (notification declined or already on case) (Shavitz, Gregg)
October 17, 2013 Opinion or Order ORDER granting motions #150 & #151 for Keith M. Stern and Gregg I. Shavitz to appear Pro Hac Vice. Counsel shall each register with ECF and file a notice of appearance. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Viktor V. Pohorelsky on 10/17/2013. (Toritto, Jim)
October 16, 2013 Filing 153 NOTICE by Francisco Ortega of filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
October 16, 2013 Filing 152 NOTICE by JOSE SANCHEZ MOYA of filing Consentto Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
October 8, 2013 Filing 151 Notice of MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Gregg I. Shavitz, Esq. Filing fee $ 25, receipt number 0207-6481754. by EDWARD BOOTH, Douglas Levy, William Myers, Jose Oakley. (Shavitz, Gregg)
October 8, 2013 Filing 150 Notice of MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Keith M. Stern, Esq. Filing fee $ 25, receipt number 0207-6481705. by EDWARD BOOTH, Douglas Levy, William Myers, Jose Oakley. (Stern, Keith)
October 3, 2013 Opinion or Order ORDER re: #149 Motion to Dismiss briefing. The parties' proposed briefing shedule for defendants' motion to dismiss the amended complaint is granted. Defendants' motion to be served on or before 10/14/13; plaintiffs' opposition to be served on or before 11/4/13; defendants' reply to be served on or before 11/18/13. Ordered by Judge Eric N. Vitaliano on 10/3/2013. (Weiner Chernoff, Stephanie)
October 2, 2013 Filing 149 Letter MOTION to Dismiss and Approve Briefing Schedule by Matt Ellingson, Servisair, LLC. (Briton, Roger)
September 30, 2013 Filing 148 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by EMMANUEL LAURENT, JOSEPH VENUS, JEAN MOISES DELY, JEAN RICHARD, SANDLY BIEN-AINE, JOHN GRAY, JORGE RODRIGUEZ, HAROLD ROBERSON, TIMOTHY GREEN, CARLOS JR PRADO, MARC PIERRE, PHILLIP CAMPBELL, MICHAEL BLAKE, LACHHMAN SIEUNARINE, ANTHONY GORDON, LAZARO RAMOS, ROSA COLON, GARDFIELD GRAY, CARLOS FREYTES, DONORAN NELSON, BONNY NESLY, DENNIS BELLAMY, MIGUEL ORDONEZ, HARRY M DAUTNUCHE, JOSE DE LA CRUZ, YDY RAMON DIAZ PAULINO, RAFAEL PEREZ, YUSI COMMINGS, GILBERTO MERCADO, JONATHAN PRICE, MANUEL MATALLANA, FERNANDO HART, JAMES HOGG, GILBERT GORDON, EDUARDO URQUESA, FITZROY DEWAR, DEMETRIUS GIRLIE, JOSEPH L. DESAMOIURS, MAYRA TRUJILLO, MEKONEN WELDERMARIAM, JUAN R GUZMAN, MARK PHILLIPS, JEAN LOUIS BAEAUVILET, DEWONE L CURRIN, VILMES JUSMA, KENNETH RAMJHON, SERENA HALL, EDWARD BOOTH, ROBERT WALKER, JOSNEL JOASSAINT, DENNIS DOLTAN, CARLOS W PRADO, LUCY MARTINEZ, QUINTIN YEARBY, ANTONIO E RODRIGUEZ, WILNER SAINTIL, KENNETH MORRISON, JEFFREY THURSBY, BRODERICK MIDDLEBROOK, DARIO CORDERO, JOSE M URENA, FREDDIE MORRIS, MIGUEL ALARCON, ANTHONY ELDERFIELD, RAYMOND SALAZAR, JONATHAN SILVA, EGBERT PRICE, GEORGE BREWSTER, KIM GLOVER, CARLOS GUZMAN, JEAN CARENAN, DUALEXTE SEWETEUS, KEVIN MANGAROO, MARCELINE LOUIS CHARLES, NICARDO HANSON, DUNCAN COLLIN, RONALD MCCLAIN, JOSE A GONZALEZ, WHITT LASEY, GREENDIGE ANDRE, RENE VERDEZA, OMAR PHILLIPS, GEOVANNI MORALES, WILLIAM MYERS, ENCEAU FATAL, ISABEL RIVERA, VICENTE AGUILAR, KENNNETH WAYNE JORDAN, JUANY JEAN LOUIS, DELVA CLODOMIR, GEORGE HARRIS, ERIBERTO GONZALEZ, MOHAMED ADERDOUR, JOHN HOBBS, RUDOLPH BAILEY, ROBERTO PARRA, BLOOBENS EDON, CARLOS NEIRA, ANDRE DWAYNE DALEY, MARK DAVIDSON, Jose Oakley, JAMES DUNCAN, WALLACE LUKE, ANGEL VAZQUEZ, FRANKLIN GONZALEZ, CLIVE OUTAR, TOMAS HERNANDEZ, RAFAEL CUAN, ROBERTO A TOBAR, VINCENT WILLIAMS, WILSON LORA GRULLON, MOHAMED AZELMAD, CARLOS PEREZ, LUIS SERRANO, RODOLFO LOPEZ, JANETTE COLTER, RICHEMANE ACADO, KENNY DAWSON, CHARLES DULCIO, Douglas Levy, FILIBERT DESROSIN, PATRICK BECKFORD, SYLVESTRE RODRIGUEZ, JAMEL R WESTON, LARRY JACKSON, ANDRE GRIERSON, DESDMONA MOSS, CESAR PEREZ. (Jaffe, Jodi)
September 25, 2013 Filing 147 NOTICE by RAYMOND SALAZAR of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
September 25, 2013 Filing 146 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by VINCENT WILLIAMS WITHOUT PREJUDICE (Jaffe, Jodi)
September 23, 2013 Filing 145 NOTICE by DENNIS BELLAMY of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
September 23, 2013 Filing 144 NOTICE by RICHEMANE ACADO, MOHAMED ADERDOUR, VICENTE AGUILAR, MIGUEL ALARCON, GREENDIGE ANDRE, MOHAMED AZELMAD, JEAN LOUIS BAEAUVILET, RUDOLPH BAILEY, PATRICK BECKFORD, DENNIS BELLAMY, SANDLY BIEN-AINE, MICHAEL BLAKE, EDWARD BOOTH, GEORGE BREWSTER, PHILLIP CAMPBELL, JEAN CARENAN, MARCELINE LOUIS CHARLES, DELVA CLODOMIR, DUNCAN COLLIN, ROSA COLON, JANETTE COLTER, YUSI COMMINGS, DARIO CORDERO, RAFAEL CUAN, DEWONE L CURRIN, ANDRE DWAYNE DALEY, HARRY M DAUTNUCHE, MARK DAVIDSON, KENNY DAWSON, JOSE DE LA CRUZ, JEAN MOISES DELY, JOSEPH L. DESAMOIURS, FILIBERT DESROSIN, FITZROY DEWAR, YDY RAMON DIAZ PAULINO, DENNIS DOLTAN, CHARLES DULCIO, JAMES DUNCAN, BLOOBENS EDON, ANTHONY ELDERFIELD, ENCEAU FATAL, CARLOS FREYTES, DEMETRIUS GIRLIE, KIM GLOVER, JOSE A GONZALEZ, ERIBERTO GONZALEZ, FRANKLIN GONZALEZ, ANTHONY GORDON, GILBERT GORDON, GARDFIELD GRAY, JOHN GRAY, TIMOTHY GREEN, ANDRE GRIERSON, WILSON LORA GRULLON, CARLOS GUZMAN, JUAN R GUZMAN, SERENA HALL, NICARDO HANSON, GEORGE HARRIS, FERNANDO HART, TOMAS HERNANDEZ, JOHN HOBBS, JAMES HOGG, LARRY JACKSON, JOSNEL JOASSAINT, KENNNETH WAYNE JORDAN, VILMES JUSMA, WHITT LASEY, EMMANUEL LAURENT, RODOLFO LOPEZ, JUANY JEAN LOUIS, WALLACE LUKE, Douglas Levy, KEVIN MANGAROO, LUCY MARTINEZ, MANUEL MATALLANA, RONALD MCCLAIN, GILBERTO MERCADO, BRODERICK MIDDLEBROOK, GEOVANNI MORALES, FREDDIE MORRIS, KENNETH MORRISON, DESDMONA MOSS, WILLIAM MYERS, CARLOS NEIRA, DONORAN NELSON, BONNY NESLY, MIGUEL ORDONEZ, CLIVE OUTAR, Jose Oakley, ROBERTO PARRA, CARLOS PEREZ, CESAR PEREZ, RAFAEL PEREZ, MARK PHILLIPS, OMAR PHILLIPS, MARC PIERRE, CARLOS W PRADO, CARLOS JR PRADO, EGBERT PRICE, JONATHAN PRICE, KENNETH RAMJHON, LAZARO RAMOS, JEAN RICHARD, ISABEL RIVERA, HAROLD ROBERSON, JORGE RODRIGUEZ, SYLVESTRE RODRIGUEZ, ANTONIO E RODRIGUEZ, WILNER SAINTIL, LUIS SERRANO, DUALEXTE SEWETEUS, LACHHMAN SIEUNARINE, JONATHAN SILVA, JEFFREY THURSBY, ROBERTO A TOBAR, MAYRA TRUJILLO, JOSE M URENA, EDUARDO URQUESA, ANGEL VAZQUEZ, JOSEPH VENUS, RENE VERDEZA, ROBERT WALKER, MEKONEN WELDERMARIAM, JAMEL R WESTON, VINCENT WILLIAMS, QUINTIN YEARBY re #136 Notice(Other) of Striking DE 136 (Jaffe, Jodi)
September 23, 2013 Filing 143 NOTICE by CARLOS PEREZ of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
September 23, 2013 Filing 142 NOTICE by RONALD MCCLAIN of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
September 23, 2013 Filing 141 NOTICE by KENNNETH WAYNE JORDAN of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
September 23, 2013 Filing 140 NOTICE by MICHAEL BLAKE of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
September 23, 2013 Filing 139 NOTICE by VICENTE AGUILAR of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
September 23, 2013 Filing 138 NOTICE by JAMES HOGG of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
September 23, 2013 Filing 137 NOTICE by MIGUEL ORDONEZ of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
September 23, 2013 Filing 136 NOTICE by DENNIS BELLAMY of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
September 23, 2013 Filing 135 NOTICE by QUINTIN YEARBY of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
September 23, 2013 Filing 134 NOTICE by GREENDIGE ANDRE of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
September 23, 2013 Filing 133 NOTICE by ROBERT WALKER of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
September 23, 2013 Filing 132 NOTICE by MOHAMED ADERDOUR of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
September 13, 2013 Filing 131 NOTICE of Appearance by William J. Anthony on behalf of Servisair, LLC (aty to be noticed) (Anthony, William)
September 13, 2013 Filing 130 NOTICE of Appearance by William J. Anthony on behalf of Matt Ellingson (aty to be noticed) (Anthony, William)
September 10, 2013 Opinion or Order ORDER terminating #128 Motion to Dismiss. Per Judge Vitaliano's Individual Rules, the moving party is to electronically file all motion papers, including the opening brief, opposition, and reply, on the motion's return date. Ordered by Judge Eric N. Vitaliano on 9/10/13. (Weiner Chernoff, Stephanie)
September 10, 2013 Opinion or Order ORDER terminating #129 Motion to Dismiss. Per Judge Vitaliano's Individual Rules, the moving party is to electronically file all motion papers, including the opening brief, opposition, and reply, on the motion's return date. Ordered by Judge Eric N. Vitaliano on 9/10/13. (Weiner Chernoff, Stephanie)
September 9, 2013 Filing 129 Notice of MOTION to Dismiss by Matt Ellingson, Servisair, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Appendix, #3 Appendix, #4 Appendix) (Briton, Roger)
September 9, 2013 Filing 128 Notice of MOTION to Dismiss by Matt Ellingson, Servisair, LLC. (Briton, Roger)
September 3, 2013 Opinion or Order ORDER re: #127 Motion for Pre Motion Conference. No pre-motion conference is necessary. The parties' proposed briefing schedule for defendant's motion to dismiss is accepted. Opening briefs to be served on or before 9/9/13; plaintiffs' opposition, if any, to be served on or before 9/30/13; defendant's reply, if any, to be served on or before October 14, 2013. Ordered by Judge Eric N. Vitaliano on 9/3/2013. (Weiner Chernoff, Stephanie)
September 3, 2013 Filing 127 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference to Judge Vitaliano by Matt Ellingson, Servisair, LLC. (Briton, Roger)
August 30, 2013 Filing 126 NOTICE by RICHEMANE ACADO, MIGUEL ALARCON, MOHAMED AZELMAD, JEAN LOUIS BAEAUVILET, RUDOLPH BAILEY, PATRICK BECKFORD, SANDLY BIEN-AINE, EDWARD BOOTH, GEORGE BREWSTER, PHILLIP CAMPBELL, JEAN CARENAN, MARCELINE LOUIS CHARLES, DELVA CLODOMIR, DUNCAN COLLIN, ROSA COLON, JANETTE COLTER, YUSI COMMINGS, DARIO CORDERO, RAFAEL CUAN, DEWONE L CURRIN, ANDRE DWAYNE DALEY, HARRY M DAUTNUCHE, MARK DAVIDSON, KENNY DAWSON, JOSE DE LA CRUZ, JEAN MOISES DELY, JOSEPH L. DESAMOIURS, FILIBERT DESROSIN, FITZROY DEWAR, YDY RAMON DIAZ PAULINO, DENNIS DOLTAN, CHARLES DULCIO, JAMES DUNCAN, BLOOBENS EDON, ANTHONY ELDERFIELD, ENCEAU FATAL, CARLOS FREYTES, DEMETRIUS GIRLIE, KIM GLOVER, JOSE A GONZALEZ, ERIBERTO GONZALEZ, FRANKLIN GONZALEZ, ANTHONY GORDON, GILBERT GORDON, GARDFIELD GRAY, JOHN GRAY, TIMOTHY GREEN, ANDRE GRIERSON, WILSON LORA GRULLON, CARLOS GUZMAN, JUAN R GUZMAN, SERENA HALL, NICARDO HANSON, GEORGE HARRIS, FERNANDO HART, TOMAS HERNANDEZ, JOHN HOBBS, LARRY JACKSON, JOSNEL JOASSAINT, VILMES JUSMA, WHITT LASEY, EMMANUEL LAURENT, RODOLFO LOPEZ, JUANY JEAN LOUIS, WALLACE LUKE, Douglas Levy, KEVIN MANGAROO, LUCY MARTINEZ, MANUEL MATALLANA, GILBERTO MERCADO, BRODERICK MIDDLEBROOK, GEOVANNI MORALES, FREDDIE MORRIS, KENNETH MORRISON, DESDMONA MOSS, WILLIAM MYERS, CARLOS NEIRA, DONORAN NELSON, BONNY NESLY, CLIVE OUTAR, Jose Oakley, ROBERTO PARRA, CESAR PEREZ, RAFAEL PEREZ, MARK PHILLIPS, OMAR PHILLIPS, MARC PIERRE, CARLOS W PRADO, CARLOS JR PRADO, EGBERT PRICE, JONATHAN PRICE, KENNETH RAMJHON, LAZARO RAMOS, JEAN RICHARD, ISABEL RIVERA, HAROLD ROBERSON, JORGE RODRIGUEZ, SYLVESTRE RODRIGUEZ, ANTONIO E RODRIGUEZ, WILNER SAINTIL, LUIS SERRANO, DUALEXTE SEWETEUS, LACHHMAN SIEUNARINE, JONATHAN SILVA, JEFFREY THURSBY, ROBERTO A TOBAR, MAYRA TRUJILLO, JOSE M URENA, EDUARDO URQUESA, ANGEL VAZQUEZ, JOSEPH VENUS, RENE VERDEZA, MEKONEN WELDERMARIAM, JAMEL R WESTON, VINCENT WILLIAMS re #121 Notice(Other) of striking (Jaffe, Jodi)
August 30, 2013 Filing 125 NOTICE by CLIVE OUTAR of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
August 29, 2013 Filing 124 NOTICE by FERNANDO HART of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
August 29, 2013 Filing 123 NOTICE by JEAN MOISES DELY of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
August 29, 2013 Filing 122 NOTICE by EGBERT PRICE of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
August 29, 2013 Filing 121 NOTICE by CLIVE OUTAR of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
August 29, 2013 Filing 120 NOTICE by DUNCAN COLLIN of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
August 29, 2013 Filing 119 NOTICE by DONORAN NELSON of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
August 29, 2013 Filing 118 NOTICE by RAFAEL PEREZ of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
August 29, 2013 Filing 117 NOTICE by JOHN GRAY of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
August 29, 2013 Filing 116 NOTICE by BLOOBENS EDON of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
August 29, 2013 Filing 115 NOTICE by ANDRE GRIERSON of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
August 29, 2013 Filing 114 NOTICE by KEVIN MANGAROO of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
August 29, 2013 Filing 113 NOTICE by LARRY JACKSON of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
August 29, 2013 Filing 112 NOTICE by MARK DAVIDSON of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
August 29, 2013 Filing 111 NOTICE by ROSA COLON of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
August 29, 2013 Filing 110 NOTICE by PHILLIP CAMPBELL of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
August 29, 2013 Filing 109 NOTICE by LUCY MARTINEZ of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
August 29, 2013 Filing 108 NOTICE by ISABEL RIVERA of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
August 29, 2013 Filing 107 NOTICE by ANGEL VAZQUEZ of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
August 29, 2013 Filing 106 NOTICE by BRODERICK MIDDLEBROOK of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
August 29, 2013 Filing 105 NOTICE by PATRICK BECKFORD of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
August 29, 2013 Filing 104 NOTICE by JEAN RICHARD of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
August 29, 2013 Filing 103 NOTICE by ANTONIO E RODRIGUEZ of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
August 29, 2013 Filing 102 NOTICE by MAYRA TRUJILLO of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
August 29, 2013 Filing 101 NOTICE by GILBERT GORDON of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
August 29, 2013 Filing 100 NOTICE by CESAR PEREZ of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
August 29, 2013 Filing 99 NOTICE by EDWARD BOOTH of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
August 29, 2013 Filing 98 NOTICE by YDY RAMON DIAZ PAULINO of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
August 29, 2013 Filing 97 NOTICE by MOHAMED AZELMAD of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
August 29, 2013 Filing 96 NOTICE by WILSON LORA GRULLON of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
August 29, 2013 Filing 95 NOTICE by ROBERTO PARRA of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
August 27, 2013 Filing 94 SUMMONS Returned Executed by EMMANUEL LAURENT, JOSEPH VENUS, ANTHONY ELDERFIELD, JONATHAN SILVA, KIM GLOVER, GEORGE BREWSTER, CARLOS GUZMAN, SANDLY BIEN-AINE, DUALEXTE SEWETEUS, JEAN CARENAN, MARCELINE LOUIS CHARLES, NICARDO HANSON, JORGE RODRIGUEZ, HAROLD ROBERSON, TIMOTHY GREEN, JOSE A GONZALEZ, WHITT LASEY, CARLOS JR PRADO, MARC PIERRE, RENE VERDEZA, OMAR PHILLIPS, WILLIAM MYERS, GEOVANNI MORALES, ENCEAU FATAL, LACHHMAN SIEUNARINE, ANTHONY GORDON, LAZARO RAMOS, JUANY JEAN LOUIS, GARDFIELD GRAY, GEORGE HARRIS, DELVA CLODOMIR, CARLOS FREYTES, ERIBERTO GONZALEZ, BONNY NESLY, JOHN HOBBS, RUDOLPH BAILEY, HARRY M DAUTNUCHE, JOSE DE LA CRUZ, CARLOS NEIRA, YUSI COMMINGS, GILBERTO MERCADO, ANDRE DWAYNE DALEY, MANUEL MATALLANA, JONATHAN PRICE, Jose Oakley, JAMES DUNCAN, WALLACE LUKE, EDUARDO URQUESA, FRANKLIN GONZALEZ, FITZROY DEWAR, TOMAS HERNANDEZ, RAFAEL CUAN, ROBERTO A TOBAR, DEMETRIUS GIRLIE, VINCENT WILLIAMS, JOSEPH L. DESAMOIURS, MEKONEN WELDERMARIAM, JUAN R GUZMAN, MARK PHILLIPS, JEAN LOUIS BAEAUVILET, LUIS SERRANO, DEWONE L CURRIN, VILMES JUSMA, RODOLFO LOPEZ, KENNETH RAMJHON, SERENA HALL, JANETTE COLTER, DENNIS DOLTAN, JOSNEL JOASSAINT, CARLOS W PRADO, KENNY DAWSON, RICHEMANE ACADO, CHARLES DULCIO, Douglas Levy, JAMEL R WESTON, SYLVESTRE RODRIGUEZ, FILIBERT DESROSIN, WILNER SAINTIL, KENNETH MORRISON, DESDMONA MOSS, JEFFREY THURSBY, DARIO CORDERO, JOSE M URENA, FREDDIE MORRIS, MIGUEL ALARCON. Matt Ellingson served on 7/30/2013, answer due 8/20/2013; Servisair, LLC served on 7/30/2013, answer due 8/20/2013. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
August 23, 2013 Filing 93 NOTICE by CARLOS GUZMAN of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
August 23, 2013 Filing 92 NOTICE by LACHHMAN SIEUNARINE of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
August 23, 2013 Filing 91 NOTICE by CARLOS FREYTES of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
August 23, 2013 Filing 90 NOTICE by ANTHONY ELDERFIELD of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
August 23, 2013 Filing 89 NOTICE by DEWONE L CURRIN of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
August 23, 2013 Filing 88 NOTICE by SERENA HALL of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
August 23, 2013 Filing 87 NOTICE by KENNETH MORRISON of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
August 19, 2013 Filing 86 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference by Matt Ellingson, Servisair, LLC. (Briton, Roger)
August 14, 2013 Filing 85 NOTICE by JOSEPH L. DESAMOIURS of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
August 14, 2013 Filing 84 NOTICE by FREDDIE MORRIS of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
August 14, 2013 Filing 83 NOTICE by JANETTE COLTER of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
August 14, 2013 Filing 82 NOTICE by GEORGE BREWSTER of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
August 14, 2013 Filing 81 NOTICE by GARDFIELD GRAY of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
August 14, 2013 Filing 80 NOTICE by JOHN HOBBS of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
August 14, 2013 Filing 79 NOTICE by KIM GLOVER of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
August 13, 2013 Filing 78 NOTICE by RAFAEL CUAN of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
August 13, 2013 Filing 77 NOTICE by MEKONEN WELDERMARIAM of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
August 13, 2013 Filing 76 NOTICE by DUALEXTE SEWETEUS of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
August 13, 2013 Filing 75 NOTICE by JORGE RODRIGUEZ of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
August 13, 2013 Filing 74 NOTICE by JEAN CARENAN of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
August 13, 2013 Filing 73 NOTICE by CARLOS NEIRA of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
August 13, 2013 Filing 72 NOTICE by KENNETH RAMJHON of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
August 13, 2013 Filing 71 NOTICE by HAROLD ROBERSON of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
August 13, 2013 Filing 70 NOTICE by DEMETRIUS GIRLIE of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
August 13, 2013 Filing 69 NOTICE by OMAR PHILLIPS of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
August 13, 2013 Filing 68 NOTICE by TOMAS HERNANDEZ of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
August 13, 2013 Filing 67 NOTICE by KENNY DAWSON of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
August 13, 2013 Filing 66 NOTICE by JEFFREY THURSBY of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
August 13, 2013 Filing 65 NOTICE by JAMEL R WESTON of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Glenn, Andrew)
August 13, 2013 Filing 64 NOTICE by GEORGE HARRIS of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Glenn, Andrew)
August 12, 2013 Filing 63 NOTICE by WILLIAM MYERS of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Glenn, Andrew)
August 12, 2013 Filing 62 NOTICE by GILBERTO MERCADO of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Glenn, Andrew)
August 12, 2013 Filing 61 NOTICE by WHITT LASEY of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Glenn, Andrew)
August 12, 2013 Filing 60 NOTICE by JONATHAN PRICE of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Glenn, Andrew)
August 12, 2013 Filing 59 NOTICE by MIGUEL ALARCON of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Glenn, Andrew)
August 12, 2013 Filing 58 NOTICE by VINCENT WILLIAMS of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Glenn, Andrew)
August 12, 2013 Filing 57 NOTICE by RENE VERDEZA of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Glenn, Andrew)
August 12, 2013 Filing 56 NOTICE by EDUARDO URQUESA of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Glenn, Andrew)
August 12, 2013 Filing 55 NOTICE by SYLVESTRE RODRIGUEZ of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Glenn, Andrew)
August 12, 2013 Filing 54 NOTICE by JONATHAN SILVA of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Glenn, Andrew)
August 12, 2013 Filing 53 NOTICE by LUIS SERRANO of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
August 6, 2013 Opinion or Order ORDER finding as moot #52 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Viktor V. Pohorelsky on 8/6/2013. (Toritto, Jim)
August 6, 2013 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #4 motion for Andrew I. Glenn to appear Pro Hac Vice. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Viktor V. Pohorelsky on 8/6/2013. (Toritto, Jim)
August 5, 2013 Filing 52 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Servisair, LLC. (Briton, Roger)
August 2, 2013 Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Granek Guttell on behalf of Servisair, LLC (aty to be noticed) (Guttell, Adam)
August 2, 2013 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by Roger H. Briton on behalf of Servisair, LLC (aty to be noticed) (Briton, Roger)
July 25, 2013 Filing 49 NOTICE by WILNER SAINTIL of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
July 25, 2013 Filing 48 NOTICE by LAZARO RAMOS of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
July 25, 2013 Filing 47 NOTICE by CARLOS W PRADO of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
July 25, 2013 Filing 46 NOTICE by CARLOS JR PRADO of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
July 25, 2013 Filing 45 NOTICE by MARC PIERRE of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
July 25, 2013 Filing 44 NOTICE by MARK PHILLIPS of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
July 25, 2013 Filing 43 NOTICE by GEOVANNI MORALES of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
July 25, 2013 Filing 42 NOTICE by MANUEL MATALLANA of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
July 25, 2013 Filing 41 NOTICE by WALLACE LUKE of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
July 25, 2013 Filing 40 NOTICE by JUANY JEAN LOUIS of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
July 25, 2013 Filing 39 NOTICE by RODOLFO LOPEZ of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
July 25, 2013 Filing 38 NOTICE by EMMANUEL LAURENT of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
July 25, 2013 Filing 37 NOTICE by VILMES JUSMA of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
July 25, 2013 Filing 36 NOTICE by JOSNEL JOASSAINT of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
July 25, 2013 Filing 35 NOTICE by JOSEPH VENUS of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
July 25, 2013 Filing 34 NOTICE by NICARDO HANSON of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
July 25, 2013 Filing 33 NOTICE by JUAN R GUZMAN of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
July 25, 2013 Filing 32 NOTICE by TIMOTHY GREEN of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
July 25, 2013 Filing 31 NOTICE by ANTHONY GORDON of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
July 25, 2013 Filing 30 NOTICE by JOSE A GONZALEZ of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
July 25, 2013 Filing 29 NOTICE by FRANKLIN GONZALEZ of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
July 25, 2013 Filing 28 NOTICE by ERIBERTO GONZALEZ of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
July 25, 2013 Filing 27 NOTICE by FILIBERT DESROSIN of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
July 25, 2013 Filing 26 NOTICE by ENCEAU FATAL of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
July 25, 2013 Filing 25 NOTICE by JAMES DUNCAN of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
July 25, 2013 Filing 24 NOTICE by CHARLES DULCIO of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
July 25, 2013 Filing 23 NOTICE by FITZROY DEWAR of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
July 25, 2013 Filing 22 NOTICE by DENNIS DOLTAN of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
July 25, 2013 Filing 21 NOTICE by JOSE DE LA CRUZ of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
July 25, 2013 Filing 20 NOTICE by HARRY M DAUTNUCHE of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
July 25, 2013 Filing 19 NOTICE by ANDRE DWAYNE DALEY of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
July 25, 2013 Filing 18 NOTICE by YUSI COMMINGS of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
July 25, 2013 Filing 17 NOTICE by DELVA CLODOMIR of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
July 25, 2013 Filing 16 NOTICE by MARCELINE LOUIS CHARLES of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
July 25, 2013 Filing 15 NOTICE by BONNY NESLY of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
July 25, 2013 Filing 14 NOTICE by SANDLY BIEN-AINE of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
July 25, 2013 Filing 13 NOTICE by RUDOLPH BAILEY of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
July 25, 2013 Filing 12 NOTICE by JEAN LOUIS BAEAUVILET of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
July 25, 2013 Filing 11 NOTICE by RICHEMANE ACADO of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
July 25, 2013 Filing 10 NOTICE by JOSE M URENA of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
July 25, 2013 Filing 9 NOTICE by ROBERTO A TOBAR of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
July 25, 2013 Filing 8 NOTICE by DARIO CORDERO of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
July 25, 2013 Filing 7 NOTICE by DESDMONA MOSS of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
July 25, 2013 Filing 6 NOTICE by Douglas Levy of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
July 25, 2013 Filing 5 NOTICE by Jose Oakley of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Jodi)
July 25, 2013 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 25, receipt number 0207-6335960. by Douglas Levy, William Myers, Jose Oakley. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Proposed Order) (Glenn, Andrew)
July 24, 2013 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 24, 2013 CIVIL CASE FILING FEE: $ 400, receipt number 0207-6334439 (Jaffe, Jodi)
July 24, 2013 The case of Oakley et al v. Servisair, LLC et al, has been opened in the Eastern District of New York. The case number is 13cv4191. PLEASE NOTE: You must pay the case filing fee within seven (7) days. Select the event (Civil Case Filing Fee) and pay online. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 23, 2013 Filing 2 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 23, 2013 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -no,, filed by Jose Oakley, William Myers, Douglas Levy. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bowens, Priscilla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oakley et al v. Servisair, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANDRE GRIERSON
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Levy
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Michael John Palitz
Represented By: Andrew Glenn
Represented By: Gregg I. Shavitz
Represented By: Keith Michael Stern
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Camar R. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER MATTISON
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES DUNCAN
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GREENDIGE ANDRE
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MAYRA TRUJILLO
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GARY SWAN
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSE SANCHEZ MOYA
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANDRE DWAYNE DALEY
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INOBERT DULCIO
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WALLACE LUKE
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GILBERTO MERCADO
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEFFREY THURSBY
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GREGORY RAMSEY
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DESDMONA MOSS
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSNEL JOASSAINT
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSE DE LA CRUZ
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARCELINE LOUIS CHARLES
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HAROLD ROBERSON
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEAN CARENAN
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jorge Rodriguez
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Myers
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Andrew Glenn
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Gregg I. Shavitz
Represented By: Keith Michael Stern
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JANETTE COLTER
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Asuncion Corona
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Mendoza
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILMA ROMAN
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RAFAEL CUAN
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ENCEAU FATAL
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARC PIERRE
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARLOS FREYTES
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HARRY M DAUTNUCHE
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RAPHAEL MCLEOD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PATRICK BECKFORD
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMMANUEL LAURENT
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARCKENSON STVIL
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARLOS NEIRA
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEAN MOISES DELY
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUAN R GUZMAN
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Garette Rockhead
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BONNY NESLY
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PHILLIP CAMPBELL
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DARIO CORDERO
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NICARDO HANSON
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fred Joseph
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SERENA HALL
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CLIVE OUTAR
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUANY JEAN LOUIS
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEORGE HARRIS
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent Williams
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OMAR PHILLIPS
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DENNIS DOLTAN
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josette Jones
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MIGUEL ORDONEZ
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARK DAVIDSON
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DUALEXTE SEWETEUS
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RAFAEL PEREZ
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francisco Ortega
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ISABEL RIVERA
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEAN LOUIS BAEAUVILET
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos W Prado
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RUDOLPH BAILEY
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTONIO E RODRIGUEZ
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN GRAY
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FERNANDO HART
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHEMANE ACADO
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LACHHMAN SIEUNARINE
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEMETRIUS GIRLIE
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KENNETH RAMJHON
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Prado, Jr
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANGEL VAZQUEZ
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EGBERT PRICE
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WHITT LASEY
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RODOLFO LOPEZ
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RENE VERDEZA
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERTO PARRA
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MANUEL MATALLANA
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MEKONEN WELDERMARIAM
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH L. DESAMOIURS
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEORGE BREWSTER
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARLES DULCIO
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRODERICK MIDDLEBROOK
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chaiyaporn Chalumporn
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Marcelus
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTHONY ELDERFIELD
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILFREDO LOPEZ
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MIGUEL ALARCON
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DONORAN NELSON
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BLOOBENS EDON
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEWONE L CURRIN
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KENNY DAWSON
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDUARDO URQUESA
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KENNNETH WAYNE JORDAN
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose M Urena
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILSON LORA GRULLON
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miguel A. Iniguez
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GARDFIELD GRAY
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERTO A TOBAR
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRANKLIN GONZALEZ
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEAN RICHARD
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SYLVESTRE RODRIGUEZ
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: QUINTIN YEARBY
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TIMOTHY GREEN
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JONATHAN SILVA
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Garland
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VILMES JUSMA
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RONALD MCCLAIN
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDWARD BOOTH
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Gregg I. Shavitz
Represented By: Keith Michael Stern
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEOVANNI MORALES
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JONATHAN PRICE
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEVIN MANGAROO
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN HOBBS
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARLOS PEREZ
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GILBERT GORDON
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELIECER COMPANIONI
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PHILIPPE DAVIDSON
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL BLAKE
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LOUIS G JEAN
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy Canty
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH VENUS
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FREDDIE MORRIS
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FITZROY DEWAR
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTHONY GORDON
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT WALKER
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KIM GLOVER
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LUIS SERRANO
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LARRY JACKSON
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARLOS GUZMAN
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MOHAMED AZELMAD
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DUNCAN COLLIN
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adolphus Jordan, Jr.
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAZARO RAMOS
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Oakley
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Michael John Palitz
Represented By: Andrew Glenn
Represented By: Gregg I. Shavitz
Represented By: Keith Michael Stern
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Camar R. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LUCY MARTINEZ
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MOHAMED ADERDOUR
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cesar Perez
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DENNIS BELLAMY
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KENNETH MORRISON
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TOMAS HERNANDEZ
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARK PHILLIPS
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SANDLY BIEN-AINE
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RAYMOND ZIELINSKI
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DELVA CLODOMIR
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: YUSI COMMINGS
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALLAN R. STERLING
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROSA COLON
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERIBERTO GONZALEZ
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSE A GONZALEZ
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VICENTE AGUILAR
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMEL R WESTON
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RAYMOND SALAZAR
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CRESANTO BECK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILNER SAINTIL
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES HOGG
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FILIBERT DESROSIN
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: YDY RAMON DIAZ PAULINO
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antony C Samuel
Represented By: Marijana F Matura
Represented By: Troy L. Kessler
Represented By: Jodi Jill Jaffe
Represented By: Garrett D. Kaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derichbourg Multiservices
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SWISSPORT CARGO SERVICES, L.P.
Represented By: Meagan L. Martin
Represented By: Amy Joy Traub
Represented By: Patrick M. Muldowney
Represented By: Tiffany L. Cummins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SWISSPORT LOUNGE, LLC,
Represented By: Meagan L. Martin
Represented By: Amy Joy Traub
Represented By: Patrick M. Muldowney
Represented By: Tiffany L. Cummins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matt Ellingson
Represented By: Roger H. Briton
Represented By: William J. Anthony
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SWISSPORT CARGO SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: Meagan L. Martin
Represented By: Amy Joy Traub
Represented By: Patrick M. Muldowney
Represented By: Tiffany L. Cummins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derichebourg SA
Represented By: Jeffrey T. Golenbock
Represented By: Shawn P. Ricardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SWISSPORT INTERNATIONAL, LTD.
Represented By: Amy Joy Traub
Represented By: Patrick M. Muldowney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SWISSPORT, U.S.A., INC
Represented By: Meagan L. Martin
Represented By: Amy Joy Traub
Represented By: Patrick M. Muldowney
Represented By: Tiffany L. Cummins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Servisair, LLC
Represented By: William J. Anthony
Represented By: Adam Granek Guttell
Represented By: Tasos Paindiris
Represented By: Roger H. Briton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google |