Certain Underwriters at Lloyds et al v. National RailRoad Passenger Corporation et al
Plaintiff: AG De 1830 Compagnie Belge D'Assurances Generales Incendie Accidents Et Risques Divers SA, Accident & Casualty Co., Accident & Casualty Insurance Company Of Winterthur, Accident & Casualty Insurance Company of Winterthur (No. 2 A/C), Accident & Casualty Insurance Company of Winterthur (No. 3 A/C), Aegon NV, American Home Insurance Company, Amsterdan - London Verzekeering Maatschappij NV, Ancon Insurance Company (UK) Limited, Argonaut Northwest Insurance Company, Assicurazioni Generali SPA (UK Branch), Bishopsgate Insurance Company Limited, Britamco Pool, CNA Reinsurance Company, CNA Reinsurance Company Limited, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, Cornhill Insurance Company Limited, Credit De Namur, Delta-Lloyd Non-Life Insurance Company Limited and Delta-Lloyd Schadeverzekering NV
Defendant: Allianz Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, American Home Assurance Company, American Insurance Company, American Reinsurance Company, Argonaut Insurance Company, Assubel Accidents Et Dommages SA, Astra S.A.Insurance and Reinsurance Company, Atlantica Insurance Company, Banco De Seguros Del Estado, Bandeirante, Bellefonte Insurance Company (US), Bison Insurance Company Limited, Brittany Insurance Company Limited, CIGNA, California Union Insurance Company, Compagnie Belge D'Assurances Credit S.A., Companhia De Seguros Imperio, Compania De Seguros La Republica S.A., Continental Insurance Company, John Does, Eurinco Allgemeine Versicherungs Aktiengesellschaft, Evanston Insurance Company, Firemans Fund Insurance Company, First State Insurance Company, Gesb-Grupo Empresas Seguradoras, Granite State Insurance Company, Hassneh Insurance Company Of Israel Limited, Instituto Nacionali De Reaseguros, Insurance Company of North America, Insurance Company of The State of Pennsylvania, International Surplus Lines Insurance Company, Interstate Reinsurance Corporation, Korean Reinsurance Company, Landmark Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, National Mutual Insurance Company, National RailRoad Passenger Corporation, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Northbrook Insurance Company, Railroad Association Insurance Limited, Reafianzadora Y Reaseguradora De America, Roberto Fevre, Shand Morahan & Co., Stronghold Insurance Company Limited, The Dominion Insurance Company Limited, The Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company, The People's Insurance Company of China, Vera Cruz Insurance Company, Wausau International Underwriters and Yosemite Insurance Company
Counter Defendant: AG De 1830 Compagnie Belge D'Assurances Generales Incendie Accidents Et Risques Divers SA, Accident & Casualty Co., Accident & Casualty Insurance Company Of Winterthur, Accident & Casualty Insurance Company of Winterthur (No. 2 A/C), Accident & Casualty Insurance Company of Winterthur (No. 3 A/C), Aegon NV, American Home Insurance Company, Amsterdan - London Verzekeering Maatschappij NV, Ancon Insurance Company (UK) Limited, Argonaut Northwest Insurance Company, Assicurazioni Generali SPA (UK Branch), Bishopsgate Insurance Company Limited, Britamco Pool, CNA Reinsurance Company, CNA Reinsurance Company Limited, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, Cornhill Insurance Company Limited, Credit De Namur, Delta-Lloyd Non-Life Insurance Company Limited and Delta-Lloyd Schadeverzekering NV
Cross Defendant: Allianz Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, American Home Assurance Company, American Insurance Company, Argonaut Insurance Company, Continental Insurance Company, First State Insurance Company, Granite State Insurance Company, Insurance Company of The State of Pennsylvania, Landmark Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA and Yosemite Insurance Company
Counter Claimant: National RailRoad Passenger Corporation
Cross Claimant: National RailRoad Passenger Corporation
Case Number: 1:2014cv04717
Filed: August 8, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Office: Brooklyn Office
Presiding Judge: Frederic Block
Presiding Judge: Cheryl L. Pollak
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 Declaratory Judgement (Insurance)
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 853 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: The parties shall, by June 15, 2018, submit a joint letter outlining all issues--including the four mentioned in this memorandum and order--which would need to be resolved for the Court to enter a partial final judgment bringing stage one to a conclusion. The letter shall, with respect to each issue identified, set forth the parties positions as to whether there are any disputed issues of fact requiring an evidentiary hearing. Finally, the letter should propose a schedule and page limits for a single round of briefing on the issues identified. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 6/1/2018. (Innelli, Michael)
September 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 799 MEMORANDUM and ORDER: For the reasons stated in this and the prior memorandum of law, the LMIs motion 594 & 605 for summary judgment and Amtraks motion 592 for partial summary judgment are both denied. The excess insurers motion 775 for summary judgment is granted with respect to Amtraks breach of contract claims, but otherwise denied. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 9/21/2017. (Innelli, Michael) Modified on 9/21/2017 (Innelli, Michael). Modified on 9/21/2017 (Innelli, Michael).
August 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 751 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: The Court must still address the remaining issues raised in the parties motions for summary judgment, including the construction and effect of the pollution exclusion in certain policies and whether Amtrak gave timely notice of loss and complied with other procedural prerequisites to coverage. In the meantime, the Court expects that the parties will use the holdings of this memorandum and order to effectively husband their resources in anticipation of trial. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 8/17/2017. (Innelli, Michael)
April 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 612 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 606 Motion for Discovery. Amtrak must respond to Supplemental Interrogatory 1 by April 21, 2017 and, by April 28, 2017, must, at LMI's request, produce a Rule 30(b)(6) witness strictl y limited to Subject Matters 1 and 4; LMI may serve Mr. Vaillancourt's limited supplemental report by May 10, 2017. The deadline for the completion of the depositions of Messrs. Dubinsky, Simon and Vaillancourt is extended to May 19, 2017. Any objections to this Memorandum and Order must be filed with the Honorable Frederic Block by April 28, 2017, or will be deemed waived. The filing of an objection will not stay this Court's Order. Ordered by Chief Mag. Judge Roanne L. Mann on 4/14/2017. (Proujansky, Josh)
March 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 590 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 583 Motion to Strike. LMI must file a letter by April 3, 2017, describing the supplemental discovery they seek, limited to the newly disclosed costs claimed by Amtrak. Any objections to this Memorandum and Order must be filed with the Honorable Frederic Block by April 14, 2017, or will be deemed waived. See attached for further discussion. Ordered by Chief Mag. Judge Roanne L. Mann on 3/28/2017. (Proujansky, Josh)
February 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 582 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS, except to the limited extent discussed herein. The Court modifies as follows that aspect of the Report and Recommendation that would permit Amtrak to further supplement its privilege log: Ins tead, Amtrak must produce, by February 23, 2017, the 54 withheld documents listed on page 17 of the Report and Recommendation. Any objections to the Memorandum and Order must be filed with the Honorable Frederic Block by March 3, 2017, or will be deemed waived. The filing of any objection will not automatically stay this Courts order of production. Ordered by Chief Mag. Judge Roanne L. Mann on 2/17/2017. (Proujansky, Josh)
January 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 565 ORDER: The London Market Insurers premotion letter of March 29, 2016, is construed as a motion to dismiss Amtraks third-party complaint and amended third-party complaint. So construed, the motion is granted. Those two pleadings are dismissed without prejudice to Amtraks right to bring a separate action against the same third parties if circumstances warrant. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 1/26/2017. (Innelli, Michael)
January 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 558 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 555 Motion to Compel. The Court directs LMI to produce Mr. Donaldson for the completion of the deposition that was terminated prematurely due to his illness. The Court rules that Amtrak w ill be permitted to question Mr. Donaldson regarding RMI's search for responsive documents and production; the Court declines to direct the production of any additional witness. RMI is directed to file a declaration, by January 23, 2017, detail ing the circumstances under which the one-page chart Mr. Donaldson produced at his Rule 30(b)(6) deposition was created. The Court will then rule on this aspect of Amtrak's motion. Finally, RMI must identify by bates numbers, by January 23, 20 17, those documents produced that constitute third-party claims handling files. Any objections to the Memorandum and Order must be filed with the Honorable Frederic Block by January 31, 2017, or will be deemed waived. The filing of any objection will not automatically stay this Court's order of production. See attached M&O for further rulings. Ordered by Chief Mag. Judge Roanne L. Mann on 1/17/2017. (Proujansky, Josh)
November 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 521 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 469 Motion for Discovery. Amtrak must select, by December 1, 2016, ten following market syndicates and/or companies that subscribed to Amtrak Policies, and plaintiffs must produce, by December 8, 2016, n on-privileged underwriting and claims files from those syndicates or companies. Any objections to the Memorandum and Order must be filed with the Honorable Frederic Block by December 14, 2016, or will be deemed waived. The filing of any objection will not automatically stay this Court's order of production. See attached M&O. Ordered by Chief Mag. Judge Roanne L. Mann on 11/30/2016. (Proujansky, Josh)
May 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 380 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 256 Motion to Compel; granting in part and denying in part 345 Motion for Protective Order; granting in part and denying in part 346 Motion for Protective Order; denying 373 Motion to Strike. For the reasons stated in the attached opinion, the Court (1) grants in part and denies in part Amtrak's motion to compel; and (2) denies in substantial part the Insurers' motions for a protective order. In addition, the Court denies Amtrak's motion to strike the declarations submitted in support of a protective order. Ordered by Chief Mag. Judge Roanne L. Mann on 5/16/2016. (Williams, Jennifer)
March 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 198 MEMORANDUM & ORDER: The defendant's motion 174 to change venue is DENIED. Amtrak has not made a clear and convincing showing that this case should be transferred to the District of Columbia. See Accantia, 908 F. Supp. 2d at 441([A] court should not disturb a plaintiffs choice of forum unless the defendants make a clear and convincing showing that the balance of convenience factors defendants choice.). Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 3/13/2015. (Innelli, Michael)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Certain Underwriters at Lloyds et al v. National RailRoad Passenger Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: AG De 1830 Compagnie Belge D'Assurances Generales Incendie Accidents Et Risques Divers SA
Represented By: Ronald Abramson
Represented By: Martin R. Baach
Represented By: Joseph L. Ruby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Accident & Casualty Co.
Represented By: Ronald Abramson
Represented By: Martin R. Baach
Represented By: Joseph L. Ruby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Accident & Casualty Insurance Company Of Winterthur
Represented By: Ronald Abramson
Represented By: Martin R. Baach
Represented By: Joseph L. Ruby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Accident & Casualty Insurance Company of Winterthur (No. 2 A/C)
Represented By: Ronald Abramson
Represented By: Martin R. Baach
Represented By: Joseph L. Ruby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Accident & Casualty Insurance Company of Winterthur (No. 3 A/C)
Represented By: Ronald Abramson
Represented By: Martin R. Baach
Represented By: Joseph L. Ruby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Aegon NV
Represented By: Ronald Abramson
Represented By: Martin R. Baach
Represented By: Joseph L. Ruby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: American Home Insurance Company
Represented By: Ronald Abramson
Represented By: Martin R. Baach
Represented By: Joseph L. Ruby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Amsterdan - London Verzekeering Maatschappij NV
Represented By: Ronald Abramson
Represented By: Martin R. Baach
Represented By: Joseph L. Ruby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Ancon Insurance Company (UK) Limited
Represented By: Ronald Abramson
Represented By: Martin R. Baach
Represented By: Joseph L. Ruby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Argonaut Northwest Insurance Company
Represented By: Ronald Abramson
Represented By: Martin R. Baach
Represented By: Joseph L. Ruby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Assicurazioni Generali SPA (UK Branch)
Represented By: Ronald Abramson
Represented By: Martin R. Baach
Represented By: Joseph L. Ruby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Bishopsgate Insurance Company Limited
Represented By: Ronald Abramson
Represented By: Martin R. Baach
Represented By: Joseph L. Ruby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Britamco Pool
Represented By: Ronald Abramson
Represented By: Martin R. Baach
Represented By: Joseph L. Ruby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: CNA Reinsurance Company
Represented By: Ronald Abramson
Represented By: Martin R. Baach
Represented By: Joseph L. Ruby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: CNA Reinsurance Company Limited
Represented By: Ronald Abramson
Represented By: Martin R. Baach
Represented By: Joseph L. Ruby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Certain Underwriters at Lloyds
Represented By: Ronald Abramson
Represented By: Martin R. Baach
Represented By: Joseph L. Ruby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Cornhill Insurance Company Limited
Represented By: Ronald Abramson
Represented By: Martin R. Baach
Represented By: Joseph L. Ruby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Credit De Namur
Represented By: Ronald Abramson
Represented By: Martin R. Baach
Represented By: Joseph L. Ruby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Delta-Lloyd Non-Life Insurance Company Limited
Represented By: Ronald Abramson
Represented By: Martin R. Baach
Represented By: Joseph L. Ruby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Delta-Lloyd Schadeverzekering NV
Represented By: Ronald Abramson
Represented By: Martin R. Baach
Represented By: Joseph L. Ruby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AG De 1830 Compagnie Belge D'Assurances Generales Incendie Accidents Et Risques Divers SA
Represented By: Ronald Abramson
Represented By: Martin R. Baach
Represented By: Joseph L. Ruby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Accident & Casualty Co.
Represented By: Ronald Abramson
Represented By: Martin R. Baach
Represented By: Joseph L. Ruby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Accident & Casualty Insurance Company Of Winterthur
Represented By: Ronald Abramson
Represented By: Martin R. Baach
Represented By: Joseph L. Ruby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Accident & Casualty Insurance Company of Winterthur (No. 2 A/C)
Represented By: Ronald Abramson
Represented By: Martin R. Baach
Represented By: Joseph L. Ruby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Accident & Casualty Insurance Company of Winterthur (No. 3 A/C)
Represented By: Ronald Abramson
Represented By: Martin R. Baach
Represented By: Joseph L. Ruby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aegon NV
Represented By: Ronald Abramson
Represented By: Martin R. Baach
Represented By: Joseph L. Ruby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Home Insurance Company
Represented By: Ronald Abramson
Represented By: Martin R. Baach
Represented By: Joseph L. Ruby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amsterdan - London Verzekeering Maatschappij NV
Represented By: Ronald Abramson
Represented By: Martin R. Baach
Represented By: Joseph L. Ruby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ancon Insurance Company (UK) Limited
Represented By: Ronald Abramson
Represented By: Martin R. Baach
Represented By: Joseph L. Ruby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Argonaut Northwest Insurance Company
Represented By: Ronald Abramson
Represented By: Martin R. Baach
Represented By: Joseph L. Ruby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Assicurazioni Generali SPA (UK Branch)
Represented By: Ronald Abramson
Represented By: Martin R. Baach
Represented By: Joseph L. Ruby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bishopsgate Insurance Company Limited
Represented By: Ronald Abramson
Represented By: Martin R. Baach
Represented By: Joseph L. Ruby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Britamco Pool
Represented By: Ronald Abramson
Represented By: Martin R. Baach
Represented By: Joseph L. Ruby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CNA Reinsurance Company
Represented By: Ronald Abramson
Represented By: Martin R. Baach
Represented By: Joseph L. Ruby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CNA Reinsurance Company Limited
Represented By: Ronald Abramson
Represented By: Martin R. Baach
Represented By: Joseph L. Ruby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Certain Underwriters at Lloyds
Represented By: Ronald Abramson
Represented By: Martin R. Baach
Represented By: Joseph L. Ruby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cornhill Insurance Company Limited
Represented By: Ronald Abramson
Represented By: Martin R. Baach
Represented By: Joseph L. Ruby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Credit De Namur
Represented By: Ronald Abramson
Represented By: Martin R. Baach
Represented By: Joseph L. Ruby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delta-Lloyd Non-Life Insurance Company Limited
Represented By: Ronald Abramson
Represented By: Martin R. Baach
Represented By: Joseph L. Ruby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delta-Lloyd Schadeverzekering NV
Represented By: Ronald Abramson
Represented By: Martin R. Baach
Represented By: Joseph L. Ruby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Allianz Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Allstate Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: American Home Assurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: American Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Argonaut Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Continental Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: First State Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Granite State Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Insurance Company of The State of Pennsylvania
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Landmark Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Lexington Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Yosemite Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allianz Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Home Assurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Reinsurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Argonaut Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Assubel Accidents Et Dommages SA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Astra S.A.Insurance and Reinsurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlantica Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Banco De Seguros Del Estado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bandeirante
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bellefonte Insurance Company (US)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bison Insurance Company Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brittany Insurance Company Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CIGNA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Union Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Compagnie Belge D'Assurances Credit S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Companhia De Seguros Imperio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Compania De Seguros La Republica S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Continental Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eurinco Allgemeine Versicherungs Aktiengesellschaft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evanston Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Firemans Fund Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First State Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gesb-Grupo Empresas Seguradoras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Granite State Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hassneh Insurance Company Of Israel Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Instituto Nacionali De Reaseguros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insurance Company of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insurance Company of The State of Pennsylvania
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Surplus Lines Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Interstate Reinsurance Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Korean Reinsurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Landmark Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lexington Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National RailRoad Passenger Corporation
Represented By: David L. Elkind
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northbrook Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Railroad Association Insurance Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reafianzadora Y Reaseguradora De America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roberto Fevre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shand Morahan & Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stronghold Insurance Company Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Dominion Insurance Company Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The People's Insurance Company of China
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vera Cruz Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wausau International Underwriters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yosemite Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: National RailRoad Passenger Corporation
Represented By: David L. Elkind
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: National RailRoad Passenger Corporation
Represented By: David L. Elkind
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?