U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee for the Registered Holders of WaMu Commercial Mortgage Securities Trust 2007-SL3, Commercial Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2007-SL3 v. Yhun et al
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee for the Registered Holders of WaMu Commercial Mortgage Securities Trust 2007-SL3, Commercial Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2007-SL3
Defendant: The City of New York Parking Violations Bureau and Diane Yhun
Case Number: 1:2014cv07376
Filed: December 18, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Office: Brooklyn Office
Presiding Judge: Frederic Block
Presiding Judge: Ramon E. Reyes
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Default
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 76 MEMORANDUM and ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: No error, plain or otherwise, appears on the face of the Report and Recommendation. Accordingly, the Court adopts the Report and Recommendation, with the modification that per diem interest shall accrue from November 1, 2017. The Clerk shall enter judgment accordingly, in the form proposed by 5316 Church. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 11/28/2018. (Innelli, Michael)
September 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 66 MEMORANDUM and ORDER: Churchs motion 62 for summary judgment is denied. The Court further orders that the Clerk of Kings County in the State of New York vacate the notice of pendency filed on February 27, 2015. Church shall serve a copy of this Mem orandum and Order on the Clerk of Kings County in the State of New York by Certified Mail and file proof of service on the docket. Church is permitted to resubmit this motion for summary judgment once it can demonstrate that it has filed a proper notice of pendency. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 9/22/2017. (Innelli, Michael)
March 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 15 Motion to Vacate. "[D]efendants cross motion is granted in part and denied in part. The Clerk of the Court is directed to vacate entry of default. The late-filed answer is allowed and the motion to dismiss is denied." The parties are directed to complete discovery under the following schedule: (1) fact discovery, including deposition, by June 3, 2016; (2) expert disclosures by July 1, 2016; (3) rebuttal expert disclosures by July 29, 2016; (4) expert depositions by August 26, 2016; (5) premotion letters are due on September 2, 2016, response are due on September 9, 2016. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 3/14/2016. (Reyes, Ramon)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee for the Registered Holders of WaMu Commercial Mortgage Securities Trust 2007-SL3, Commercial Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2007-SL3 v. Yhun et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of New York Parking Violations Bureau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diane Yhun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee for the Registered Holders of WaMu Commercial Mortgage Securities Trust 2007-SL3, Commercial Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2007-SL3
Represented By: Jason A Nagi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?