United States of America v. Calaman et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Donald Calaman, Ruth Calaman, Toby Calaman, Capital One Bank, NA, Captial One, Citibank, NA and NY Department of Taxation and Finance
Case Number: 1:2015cv00180
Filed: January 13, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Office: Brooklyn Office
Presiding Judge: Nicholas G. Garaufis
Presiding Judge: Viktor V. Pohorelsky
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7403 Suit to Enforce Federal Tax Lien
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MEMORANDUM & ORDER granting 59 Motion for Disbursement of Funds. The proceeds from the sale of the Marlborough Property shall be distributed in accordance with this Order. So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 3/2/2017. (Lee, Tiffeny)
February 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER re 55 Motion to Correct. The court GRANTS the Government's Motion to Correct the Case Caption (Dkt. 55 ). The Clerk of Court is respectfully DIRECTED to (1) amend the caption to list "New York State Department of Taxatio n and Finance" instead of "NY Department of Taxation and Finance"; and (2) enter default judgment against New York State Department of Taxation and Finance, in accordance with this Order as well as the court's prior Memorandum & Order, dated February 2, 2017 (Dkt. 53 ). So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 2/6/2017. (docket updated; fwd'd for Entry of Default) (Lee, Tiffeny)
February 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER re 44 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: In light of the fact that the Government has cured the service issues identified in the R&R, the R&R is ADOPTED in part and the Government's Motion for Default Judgment against Capital One ( Dkt. 35) is GRANTED. Capital One is hereby adjudged to have no right, title, claim, or lien interest in the Marlborough Road Property. The Clerk of Court is respectfully DIRECTED to enter judgment against Capital One in accordance with this Order. So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 2/2/2017. (fwd'd for jgm) (Lee, Tiffeny)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Calaman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Calaman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruth Calaman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toby Calaman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Bank, NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captial One
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citibank, NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NY Department of Taxation and Finance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Herbert West Linder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?