Bonn-Wittingham et al v. Project O.H.R. (Office for Homecare Referral), Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Marie Afreh, Bettyanne Alexander, Carmel Anderson, Irma Anderson, Gerda Antoine, Alma Ariza, Ludmilla Armonavica, Angela Armstrong, Immacula Auguste, Mignan Barry, Miroslawa Bartold, Lena Barton, Yveline M Beauchamp, Maisie Beckford, Gloria Bent, Lidiya Berdnkova, Marina Bessarabova, Cecilia Best, Faril Best, Judy Bonn-Wittingham, Gillian Bowen, Jeanette Brice, Debbie Ann Brown, Krystyna Bunkowska, Olga Cadet, Beverly Caldwell, Roxanne Cambridge, Evelyn Cima, Elaine Clarke, Pauline Clarke, Elsie Collins, Linette Cornwall, Patricia Cosmas, Margaret Cotterell, Roseanne Crandon, Octavia Crick, Audrey Crosdale, Florence Cuvilly, Annette Davis, Yppolia Decopain, Unicey Deshields, Pearline Donaldson-Reid, Suzy Dorce, Immacula Dorismond, Marie Dorsainville, Vesta Douglas, Olive Dutchin, Crystal Edwards, Shirley Edwards, Jeanine Elie, Jacqueline Ellis, Gladys Enriquez, Marie Paula Eugene, Mary P Eugene, Albertha Fenelon, Marie Fleurimont, Germita Fremont, Digna Garcia, Mercedes Garcia, Paula Garcia, Yolanda Gayle, Unica George, Marie-L Gilles, Ana M Gomez, Tanisha Gooden, Marie Grand-Pierre, Beverlene Grant, Pauline Grant, Vanetta Grant, Cornelious Green, Claudette Grimes, Martha Groves, Eliza Hamilton, Juilette Hamilton, Hoda Hassane, Donna Headley, Linda Henderson, Alvira Henry, Adalsie Houston, Merle Hoyte, Sylvia Hoyte, Leonie Hussett, Lucy Ineus, Sheran James, Thema James, Ramona Javier, Anatalie Jean, Yolande Jean-Bart, Adeline Jermain, Catherine Jessamy, Gislaine Jocelyn, Marjorie Johnson, Omodele Johnson, Dulcie Jones, Launa Jones, Melva Jones, Marie Yanick Joseph, Greta Keiser, Marina Kisina, Marie Laguerre, Marthe Latour, Joan Leacock, Walterine Levius, Enid Lewis, Yvonne Lewis, Consesora Liriano, Caroline Long, Marie Longuefosse, Esther Lopez, Merle Lopez, Anita Lubin, Yvonne Mack, Joan Maragh, Velda Mayers, Sandra McIntosh, Fay McKenzie, Beverly Royal McPherson, Julieth Melbourne, Marie Milord, Marie Monpremier, Anne Marie Morgan, Kathlene Morgan, Huguette Nelson, Isolyn Palmer, Candida Paredes, Carmen Pelzer, Seorajni Persaud, Sylvia Peters, Marie D Pierre, Ella Pompey, Carmen Pownall, Sawarie Ramlochan, Verna Ricketts, Walentina Ruszczyk, Ann Sabal, Una Seale, Ionie Senior, Lorente Simeon, Parbati Singh, Marianela Soriano, Eunice Stafford, Vitold Stankevich, Zoia Stankevich, Mariya Sudnishnikova, Elaine Taylor, Judy Taylor, Albertina Thomas, Doretta Thomas, Myrna Thomas, Eileen Tucker, Lynette Vyent, Neela Warden, Janina Werynska, Linnett Williams, Lynette A Williams, Morine Wright, Grace Yarde and Margaret Younge
Defendant: D'Vorah Kohn, Metropolitan New York Coordinating Council on Jewish Poverty and Project O.H.R. (Office for Homecare Referral), Inc.
Case Number: 1:2016cv00541
Filed: February 2, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Office: Brooklyn Office
Presiding Judge: James Orenstein
Presiding Judge: Allyne R. Ross
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:206 Collect Unpaid Wages
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER denying 70 Motion for Reconsideration because this motion is not timely and plaintiffs' identify no change in controlling law. Ordered by Judge Allyne R. Ross on 5/17/2017. (Matsumura, Rebecca)
February 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 66 OPINION AND ORDER dated 2/13/17 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Magistrate Judge Orenstein. The Claims of the following plaintiffs are dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. Paula Garcia, Walterine Levius, Yvonne Mack, Isolyn Palmer, Carmen Toribio, Pearline Donaldson-Reid and Digna Garcia terminated.( Ordered by Judge Allyne R. Ross on 2/13/2017 ) (Guzzi, Roseann)
December 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 48 OPINION AND ORDER re 37 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. The motion to strike class allegations is denied. The motion to dismiss is granted in part and denied in part. The motion to dismiss is granted with respect to defendant Met Council. SO Ordered by Judge Allyne R. Ross on 12/12/2016. (Ramesar, Thameera)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bonn-Wittingham et al v. Project O.H.R. (Office for Homecare Referral), Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marie Afreh
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bettyanne Alexander
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmel Anderson
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irma Anderson
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerda Antoine
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alma Ariza
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ludmilla Armonavica
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Armstrong
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Immacula Auguste
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mignan Barry
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miroslawa Bartold
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lena Barton
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yveline M Beauchamp
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maisie Beckford
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria Bent
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lidiya Berdnkova
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marina Bessarabova
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cecilia Best
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Faril Best
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy Bonn-Wittingham
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gillian Bowen
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeanette Brice
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debbie Ann Brown
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Krystyna Bunkowska
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Olga Cadet
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beverly Caldwell
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roxanne Cambridge
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evelyn Cima
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elaine Clarke
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pauline Clarke
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elsie Collins
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linette Cornwall
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Cosmas
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret Cotterell
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roseanne Crandon
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Octavia Crick
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Audrey Crosdale
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Florence Cuvilly
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annette Davis
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yppolia Decopain
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Unicey Deshields
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pearline Donaldson-Reid
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suzy Dorce
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Immacula Dorismond
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marie Dorsainville
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vesta Douglas
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Olive Dutchin
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal Edwards
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley Edwards
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeanine Elie
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Ellis
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gladys Enriquez
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marie Paula Eugene
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary P Eugene
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albertha Fenelon
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marie Fleurimont
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Germita Fremont
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Digna Garcia
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mercedes Garcia
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paula Garcia
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yolanda Gayle
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Unica George
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marie-L Gilles
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ana M Gomez
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tanisha Gooden
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marie Grand-Pierre
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beverlene Grant
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pauline Grant
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vanetta Grant
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cornelious Green
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claudette Grimes
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha Groves
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eliza Hamilton
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juilette Hamilton
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hoda Hassane
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Headley
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Henderson
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alvira Henry
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adalsie Houston
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Merle Hoyte
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sylvia Hoyte
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonie Hussett
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucy Ineus
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheran James
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thema James
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramona Javier
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anatalie Jean
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yolande Jean-Bart
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adeline Jermain
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine Jessamy
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gislaine Jocelyn
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marjorie Johnson
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Omodele Johnson
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dulcie Jones
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Launa Jones
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melva Jones
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marie Yanick Joseph
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greta Keiser
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marina Kisina
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marie Laguerre
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marthe Latour
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joan Leacock
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walterine Levius
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Enid Lewis
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yvonne Lewis
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Consesora Liriano
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caroline Long
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marie Longuefosse
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Esther Lopez
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Merle Lopez
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anita Lubin
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yvonne Mack
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joan Maragh
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Velda Mayers
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra McIntosh
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fay McKenzie
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beverly Royal McPherson
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julieth Melbourne
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marie Milord
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marie Monpremier
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anne Marie Morgan
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathlene Morgan
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Huguette Nelson
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isolyn Palmer
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Candida Paredes
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmen Pelzer
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Seorajni Persaud
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sylvia Peters
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marie D Pierre
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ella Pompey
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmen Pownall
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sawarie Ramlochan
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Verna Ricketts
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walentina Ruszczyk
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ann Sabal
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Una Seale
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ionie Senior
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorente Simeon
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Parbati Singh
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marianela Soriano
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eunice Stafford
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vitold Stankevich
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zoia Stankevich
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mariya Sudnishnikova
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elaine Taylor
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy Taylor
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albertina Thomas
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doretta Thomas
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Myrna Thomas
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eileen Tucker
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynette Vyent
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neela Warden
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janina Werynska
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linnett Williams
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynette A Williams
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Morine Wright
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grace Yarde
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret Younge
Represented By: Donald Gary Glassman
Represented By: Roland G Ottley
Represented By: David C. Wims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D'Vorah Kohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan New York Coordinating Council on Jewish Poverty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Project O.H.R. (Office for Homecare Referral), Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?