Afzal v. Flushing Hospital, New York
Plaintiff: Fiaz Afzal, MD
Defendant: Flushing Hospital, New York
Case Number: 1:2016cv01287
Filed: March 11, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Office: Brooklyn Office
Presiding Judge: Brian M. Cogan
Presiding Judge: Robert M. Levy
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting defendant's 29 34 Motion to Dismiss; and plaintiffs second amended complaint is dismissed pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 1/27/2017 ) *forwarded for jgm. (Guzzi, Roseann)
April 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: Plaintiff's request to proceed in forma pauperis was granted by Order dated 3/22/2016. The United States Marshals Service is directed to serve the summons and amended complaint upon the defendant without prepayment of fees. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy, on 4/11/2016. C/mailed. (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)
March 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER dated 3/22/16 granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff is given twenty days leave to amend complaint. No summons shall issue at this time and all further proceedings shall be stayed 30 days until further order of the Court. ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 3/22/2016 ) c/m (Guzzi, Roseann)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Afzal v. Flushing Hospital, New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fiaz Afzal, MD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flushing Hospital, New York
Represented By: Adam Granek Guttell
Represented By: Gregory Bertram Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?