Farmer v. Woodside Optical Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Richard Farmer
Defendant: Echo Drugs Inc., Roman Kulberg, Inna Revutsky-Kulberg, Lev Rivkin and Woodside Optical Corp.
Case Number: 1:2016cv05178
Filed: September 16, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Office: Brooklyn Office
Presiding Judge: Carol Bagley Amon
Presiding Judge: Roanne L. Mann
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: For the foregoing reasons, Plaintiff's application for reversal of Chief Magistrate Judge Mann's decisions is DENIED as MOOT in part and DENIED in part. Ordered by Judge Carol Bagley Amon on 8/16/2017. (Fernandez, Erica)
June 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 29 Motion for Discovery. The Court grants one final extension of the fact discovery deadline, but only until June 23, 2017. The deadline for the parties to file their joint proposed summary judgment briefing schedule is extended to June 30, 2017. See attached for further discussion and deadlines. Ordered by Chief Mag. Judge Roanne L. Mann on 6/12/2017. (Proujansky, Josh)
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Minute Entry and Order for Telephone Motion Hearing held on 5/25/2017. The Court denies without prejudice plaintiff's motion to compel [DE #24], which does not specify which particular categories of documents are still in dispute, following def endants' two supplemental productions, and the legal basis for plaintiff's entitlement to such documents. Plaintiff will renew his motion by close of business tomorrow. Defendants' response is due by close of business on May 30, 2017. Fact discovery is extended to June 16, 2017. The deadline for the parties to file a joint proposed summary judgment briefing schedule is extended to June 23, 2017. (Proujansky, Josh)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Farmer v. Woodside Optical Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Echo Drugs Inc.
Represented By: David Adam Berger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roman Kulberg
Represented By: David Adam Berger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inna Revutsky-Kulberg
Represented By: David Adam Berger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lev Rivkin
Represented By: David Adam Berger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Woodside Optical Corp.
Represented By: David Adam Berger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Farmer
Represented By: Kevin K. Tung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?