Pierce v. City of New York et al

Plaintiff: Lerin Pierce
Defendant: City of New York and John Does 1-6
Case Number: 1:2016cv05703
Filed: October 12, 2016
Court: New York Eastern District Court
Office: Brooklyn Office
Presiding Judge: Brian M. Cogan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 1, 2018 151 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER, Plaintiff's motion 145 for entry of judgment under Rule 54(b) and to certify an interlocutory appeal is DENIED. So Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 2/1/2018. (Lee, Tiffeny)
December 11, 2017 144 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER that defendants' 136 motion for judgment as a matter of law is granted as toSergeant Mercado and denied as to Officer Belardo, and their and their motion for a new trial 136 is granted as to Officer Belardo. Plaintiff's 128 motion for attorneys fees is denied as moot. ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 12/11/2017 ) (Guzzi, Roseann)
June 16, 2017 125 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM regarding medical testimony. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 6/16/2017. (Shami, Amanda)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pierce v. City of New York et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of New York
Represented By: Valerie Elizabeth Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-6
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lerin Pierce
Represented By: Gregory S. Antollino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?