Cooper v. City of New York et al
Plaintiff: Steven Cooper
Defendant: City of New York, Police Lieutenant Thomas Jacobs, NY Police Officers John Does 1-10, Daniel O'Connor, CA, Police Sergeant Brendan Ryan and Police Officer Jessica Schrell
Case Number: 1:2017cv01517
Filed: March 17, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Office: Brooklyn Office
Presiding Judge: Nicholas G. Garaufis
Presiding Judge: Roanne L. Mann
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1981 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 120 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re 118 Letter filed by Steven Cooper. The request of the movant, the firm of Sonin & Genis, is denied without prejudice. Plaintiff's belated change of counsel does not restart the clock, nor does it entitle plaintiff t o a do-over on discovery and/or his already amended pleadings. As incoming counsel was previously warned, this Court will not allow the substitution to delay the progress of this long-pending case. See attached. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 5/21/2020. (Proujansky, Josh)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 84 MEMORANDUM & ORDER, Plaintiff's motion to amend (Dkt. 69) is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Plaintiff may amend to state the following claims: 1) 42 U.S.C. § 1983 False Arrest/False Imprisonment against Schrell, Horun, Katrincic, Moral es, Barnhart, and John Doe Police Officers; 2) Conspiracy to Deprive Plaintiff of his Constitutional Rights under 42 U.S.C. § 1983 against Schrell, Jacobs, Horun, Katrincic, Morales, Barnhart, and the John Doe Police Officers; 3) Assault and B attery under state law against O'Connor and Jacobs; 4) Libel and Slander (Defamation) under state law against Ryan; 5) False Arrest under state law against Schrell, the John Doe Police Officers, and the City. Plaintiff is DIRECTED to serve and file a second amended complaint, consistent with this decision, on the docket of this case within 14 days of the date of this decision. The Clerk of Court is respectfully DIRECTED to re-open the case. So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 8/5/2019. (Lee, Tiffeny)
August 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 41 Motion for Disclosure; granting in part and denying in part 42 Motion to Adjourn Conference. For the reasons stated in the attached M&O, the Court grants plaintiff's July 18th motion, and directs the City to provide the requested information by August 13, 2017; and grants in part only defendants' motion to stay discovery, with the stay limited to deposition discovery. The Court adjourns the August 4th initial conference sine die, and will schedule a court proceeding once the motion to dismiss has been resolved. The parties are directed to serve their initial disclosures by August 11, 2017. Ordered by Chief Mag. Judge Roanne L. Mann on 8/1/2017. (Pauley, Anders)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cooper v. City of New York et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of New York
Represented By: Jenny Weng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police Lieutenant Thomas Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NY Police Officers John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel O'Connor, CA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police Sergeant Brendan Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police Officer Jessica Schrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Cooper
Represented By: Yitzchok Kotkes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?