Tech Data Corporation et al v. Hitachi, Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: Edward Breivik, Jimmy Jahar Thule, Ramzi Yusef, Richard Reid, Christopher Wirth, Tech Data Product Management, Inc., Christopher Donnelly and Tech Data Corporation
Defendant: Irico Group Corporation, Samsung SDI Co., LTD., Shenzhen Seg Hitachi Color Display Devices, LTD., Samsung Electronics America Inc., Toshiba America Inc., Thomson Consumer Electronics, Inc., Panasonic Corporation of North America, Mitsubishi Digital Electronics America, Inc., Shenzhen Samsung SDI Co. LTD., Mitsubishi Electric & Electronics USA, Inc., Koninklijke Pilips Electronics N.V., Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Tianjin Samsung SDI Co., LTD., Thai Crt Co., Ltd., Chunghwa Picture Tubes (Malaysia), LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., Panasonic Corporation, Philips Da Amazonia Industria Electronica LTDA., LG Electronics Inc., Hitachi Electronic Devices (USA) Inc., Irico Display Devices Co., LTD., Chunghwa Picture Tubes, LTD, Technicolor SA, Thomson SA, Hitachi America, Ltd., Hitachi Ltd., Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Toshiba America Consumer Products, L.L.C., Samtel Color, LTD., Irico Group Electronics Co., LTD., Philips Electronics Industries (Taiwan), LTD., LG ElectronicsTaiwan Taipei Co., Ltd., Samsung SDI (Malaysia) SDN BHD, Samsung SDI America, Inc., Tatung Company of America, Inc., Beijing Matsushita Color CRT Co Ltd, Hitachi Displays, LTD, Samsung SDI Mexico S.A. DE C.V., LP Displays International, LTD., Technicolor USA, Inc., Toshiba America Information Systems Inc., MT Picture Display Co Ltd, Samsung SDI Brasil LTDA, Hitachi Asia, LTD., Mitsubishi Electric Corporation and Philips Electronics North America Corporation
Special Master: Honorable Charles A. Legge
Case Number: 1:2017cv06901
Filed: November 21, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Office: Brooklyn Office
Presiding Judge: Brian M Cogan
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2019 Civil Case Terminated. (Marziliano, August)
February 20, 2019 Filing 203 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by ABC Appliance, Inc., CompuCom Systems Inc, Electrograph Technologies Corp., Interbond Corporation of America, Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., Office Depot, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation, Schultze Agency Services, LLC, Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-04504-BMC et al. (Isaacson, William)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. In light of MARTA and the Samsung defendants' Letter of Settlement #121 in 18-cv-4879 and the subsequent Order of Dismissal #125 in 17-cv-4504, plaintiffs are ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE by 2/27/2019 why this matter, all its member cases, and every party listed on the docket cannot be terminated. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 2/20/2019. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-04504-BMC et al. (Weisberg, Peggy)
December 17, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #82 Motion for New Trial in case 1:17-cv-04504-BMC; #201 Motion for New Trial in case 1:17-cv-06901-BMC. The parties should expect a June trial date. Because of the Court's calendar, any adjournment is extremely unlikely. The parties are to file a proposed amended pre-trial schedule by 12/22/2017. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 12/17/2017. (Weisberg, Peggy)
December 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER granting #81 Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 1:17-cv-04504-BMC; #200 Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 1:17-cv-06901-BMC. The Court, having considered the stipulation of Plaintiffs and Defendants in these actions, and good cause appearing, orders as follows: (1) The above-captioned actions are hereby consolidated for the purposes of any remaining pretrial and trial proceedings pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 42(a) and Local Rule 50.3.1; (2) The Clerk of the Court shall consolidate the Tech Data Corp. v. Hitachi, Ltd., No. 17-cv-06901-BMC with the above-captioned master docket, In re EDNY Cathode Ray Tube Antitrust Cases No. 17-cv-04504-BMC; (3) All future filings in Tech Data Corp. v. Hitachi, Ltd. shall be made on the In re EDNY Cathode Ray Tube Antitrust Cases master docket; (4) The parties will submit an amended proposed pre-trial schedule following the Court's consideration of the parties' request to set a new trial date. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 12/15/2017. (Weisberg, Peggy)
December 15, 2017 Filing 201 Letter MOTION for New Trial Date in Connection with the Joint Motion to Consolidate by Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc.. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-04504-BMC, 1:17-cv-06901-BMC (Wagner, Scott)
December 15, 2017 Filing 200 Joint MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc.. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-04504-BMC, 1:17-cv-06901-BMC (Wagner, Scott)
December 8, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #193 Lucius B. Lau's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as counsel for defendants Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba America Inc., Toshiba America Consumer Products, L.L.C., Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc., Toshiba America Information Systems Inc. The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at the NYEDs homepage. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure that the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee . Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 12/8/2017. (Weisberg, Peggy)
December 7, 2017 Filing 199 NOTICE of Appearance by Sofia Roa Arguello on behalf of MT Picture Display Co Ltd, Panasonic Corporation (aty to be noticed) (Arguello, Sofia)
December 7, 2017 Filing 198 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Benjamin Goldstein on behalf of MT Picture Display Co Ltd, Panasonic Corporation (aty to be noticed) (Goldstein, Kevin)
December 7, 2017 Filing 197 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Maryon Stewart on behalf of MT Picture Display Co Ltd, Panasonic Corporation (aty to be noticed) (Stewart, Jennifer)
December 7, 2017 Filing 196 NOTICE of Appearance by Molly M. Donovan on behalf of MT Picture Display Co Ltd, Panasonic Corporation (aty to be noticed) (Donovan, Molly)
December 7, 2017 Filing 195 NOTICE of Appearance by Eva W. Cole on behalf of MT Picture Display Co Ltd, Panasonic Corporation (aty to be noticed) (Cole, Eva)
December 7, 2017 Filing 194 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey L. Kessler on behalf of MT Picture Display Co Ltd, Panasonic Corporation (notification declined or already on case) (Kessler, Jeffrey)
December 7, 2017 Filing 193 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0207-10033392. by Toshiba America Consumer Products, L.L.C., Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc., Toshiba America Inc., Toshiba America Information Systems Inc., Toshiba Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Lucius B. Lau in Support of Toshiba Defendants' Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice, #2 District of Columbia Certificate of Good Standing, #3 State of Virginia Certificate of Good Standing) (Lau, Lucius)
December 7, 2017 Filing 192 NOTICE of Appearance by Dana E. Foster on behalf of Toshiba America Consumer Products, L.L.C., Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc., Toshiba America Inc., Toshiba America Information Systems Inc., Toshiba Corporation (notification declined or already on case) (Foster, Dana)
December 7, 2017 Filing 191 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Mark Curran on behalf of Toshiba America Consumer Products, L.L.C., Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc., Toshiba America Inc., Toshiba America Information Systems Inc., Toshiba Corporation (aty to be noticed) (Curran, Christopher)
December 1, 2017 Filing 190 Letter re Plaintiffs' Response to Dec. 1, 2017 Order to Show Cause by Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc. (Wagner, Scott)
December 1, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER. Based on the Letter received from Munger Tolles dated 11/21/17, the parties and their attorneys are ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE by 12/1/17 why the Clerk of Court should not be directed to terminate (1) all defendants whose corporate name begins with "LG", regardless of what follows LG; and (2) all counsel for such LG defendants, unless those counsel also have appeared for other, non-LG defendants, in which case they should be terminated as counsel for just the LG defendants and not for any others who remain in these cases. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 12/1/2017. (Weisberg, Peggy)
November 29, 2017 Email Notification Test - DO NOT REPLY. (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)
November 27, 2017 Filing 189 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
November 27, 2017 The case of Tech Data Corporation et al v. Hitachi, Ltd. et al, has been transferred from Middle District of Florida to the Eastern District of New York. The new case number is 17-cv-6901. PLEASE NOTE: if you plan to continue representing your client(s), you must be admitted to practice before this court. You must do so by applying for Pro Hac Vice or permanent admission. To apply for Pro Hac Vice admission, you must first register for an ECF login and password. Please visit the Court's website at www.nyed.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions for guidance. Once registered, you must electronically file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You must pay the required pro hac vice fee online. (Davis, Kimberly)
November 27, 2017 Filing 188 Notice of Related Case (Davis, Kimberly)
November 27, 2017 Filing 187 Case transferred in from District of Florida Middle; Case Number 8:17-cv-00944. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER granting #151 Motion to transfer case. The case is transferred to the Eastern District of New York, United States District Judge Cogan, presiding. Signed by Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich on 11/21/2017. (IJD) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ENDORSED ORDER. Pursuant to the Notice, the Court dismisses with prejudice the case against Samsung SDI Co., Ltd.; Samsung SDI America, Inc.; Samsung SDI Mexico S.A. De C.V.; Samsung SDI Brasil Ltda.; Shenzhen Samsung SDI Co., Ltd.; Tianjin Samsung SDI Co., Ltd.; and Samsung SDI (Malaysia) Sdn. Bhd. Signed by Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich on 11/21/2017. (IJD) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
November 16, 2017 Filing 184 NOTICE by MT Picture Display Co., Ltd, Panasonic Corporation of Related Trial Scheduling Orders Regarding Joint Motion to Transfer (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 10/18/17 Order, #2 Exhibit B - 11/8/17 Order)(Soto, Edward) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
October 3, 2017 Filing 183 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc.. (Wagner, Scott) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
September 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ENDORSED ORDER approving the stipulation of dismissal. Pursuant to the stipulation of dismissal (DKT. 181), the Court dismisses, with prejudice, the actions against the following defendants only: Koninklijke Philips N.V., Philips Electronics North America Corporation, Philips Taiwan Limited and Philips do Brasil Ltda. Signed by Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich on 9/27/2017. (IJD) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
September 26, 2017 Filing 181 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc.. (Wagner, Scott) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
August 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ENDORSED ORDER holding deadlines in abeyance as to the Samsung SDI Defendants. All case schedules and deadlines established by the Court in this case are held in abeyance as to the Samsung SDI Defendants only, and shall be set by separate order of the Court in the event that the counts are not dismissed as to the Samsung SDI Defendants. The stipulation(dkt. 179), is, therefore, approved. Signed by Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich on 8/9/2017. (IJD) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
August 4, 2017 Filing 179 STIPULATION Holding Deadlines in Abeyance as to the Samsung SDI Defendants by Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc.. (Wagner, Scott) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
June 22, 2017 Mail returned as Undeliverable re: 178 Order no pdf. Mail sent to Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP One Montgomery St., Suite 3100 San Francisco, CA 94104-4505. Return to sender; attempted not known; unable to forward to Joel S. Sanders. (LMD) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
June 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ENDORSED ORDER vacating Docket 176. The Court's Order of 6/12/2017 (Dkt. 176) is vacated. The Court now orders that pursuant to the Unopposed Motions for Dismissal(Dkts. 163, 169), the Court dismisses without prejudice the Plaintiffs' actions against Thomson SA, and Thomson Consumer Electronics, Inc.. The Court dismisses with prejudice the case against LG Electronics, Inc. Signed by Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich on 6/12/2017. (IJD) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
June 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ENDORSED ORDER denying as moot #169 Motion. Signed by Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich on 6/12/2017. (IJD) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
June 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 176 VACATED PURSUANT TO DKT. 178 ORDER. ENDORSED ORDER. Pursuant to the Unopposed Motions for Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice (Dkts. 163, 169), the Court dismisses with prejudice the Plaintiffs' actions against Thomson SA, Thomson Consumer Electronics, Inc., and LG Electronics, Inc. The Court anticipates ruling on the Motion to Transfer (Dkt. 151) shortly. Signed by Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich on 6/12/2017. (IJD) Modified on 6/13/2017 (LD). [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
June 9, 2017 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney Bradley S. Pensyl, appearing on behalf of Samsung SDI (Malaysia) SDN BHD, Samsung SDI America, Inc., Samsung SDI Brasil Ltda, Samsung SDI Co., Ltd, Samsung SDI Mexico S.A. DE C.V., Shenzhen Samsung SDI Co., Ltd, Tianjin Samsung SDI Co., Ltd (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA044047.). (LMD) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
June 9, 2017 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney John Roberti, appearing on behalf of Samsung SDI (Malaysia) SDN BHD, Samsung SDI America, Inc., Samsung SDI Brasil Ltda, Samsung SDI Co., Ltd, Samsung SDI Mexico S.A. DE C.V., Shenzhen Samsung SDI Co., Ltd, Tianjin Samsung SDI Co., Ltd (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA044047.). (LMD) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
June 9, 2017 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney Jacob S. Pultman, appearing on behalf of Samsung SDI (Malaysia) SDN BHD, Samsung SDI America, Inc., Samsung SDI Brasil Ltda, Samsung SDI Co., Ltd, Samsung SDI Mexico S.A. DE C.V., Shenzhen Samsung SDI Co., Ltd, Tianjin Samsung SDI Co., Ltd (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA044047.). (LMD) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
June 9, 2017 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney Michael S. Feldberg, appearing on behalf of Samsung SDI (Malaysia) SDN BHD, Samsung SDI America, Inc., Samsung SDI Brasil Ltda, Samsung SDI Co., Ltd, Samsung SDI Mexico S.A. DE C.V., Shenzhen Samsung SDI Co., Ltd, Tianjin Samsung SDI Co., Ltd (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA044047.). (LMD) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
June 9, 2017 Mail returned as Undeliverable re: 153 Order no pdf. Mail sent to Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP One Montgomery St., Suite 3100 San Francisco, CA 94104-4505. Return to sender; not deliverable as addressed; unable to forward to Joel S, Sanders. (LMD)[Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
June 9, 2017 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney Kathy L. Osborn, appearing on behalf of Technicolor SA, Technicolor USA, Inc., Thomson Consumer Electronics, Inc., Thomson SA (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA044002) Related document: #160 MOTION for Kathy L. Osborn to appear pro hac vice. (AG) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
June 9, 2017 Filing 175 NOTICE of compliance re 161 Order on motion to appear pro hac vice by Technicolor SA, Technicolor USA, Inc. (Osborn, Kathy) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
June 8, 2017 Filing 174 NOTICE of compliance re 152 Order on motion to appear pro hac vice by Samsung SDI (Malaysia) SDN BHD, Samsung SDI America, Inc., Samsung SDI Brasil Ltda, Samsung SDI Co., Ltd, Samsung SDI Mexico S.A. DE C.V., Shenzhen Samsung SDI Co., Ltd, Tianjin Samsung SDI Co., Ltd (Feldberg, Michael) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
June 8, 2017 Filing 173 NOTICE of compliance re 152 Order on motion to appear pro hac vice by Samsung SDI (Malaysia) SDN BHD, Samsung SDI America, Inc., Samsung SDI Brasil Ltda, Samsung SDI Co., Ltd, Samsung SDI Mexico S.A. DE C.V., Shenzhen Samsung SDI Co., Ltd, Tianjin Samsung SDI Co., Ltd (Pultman, Jacob) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
June 8, 2017 Filing 172 NOTICE of compliance re 152 Order on motion to appear pro hac vice by Samsung SDI (Malaysia) SDN BHD, Samsung SDI America, Inc., Samsung SDI Brasil Ltda, Samsung SDI Co., Ltd, Samsung SDI Mexico S.A. DE C.V., Shenzhen Samsung SDI Co., Ltd, Tianjin Samsung SDI Co., Ltd (Pensyl, Bradley) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
June 8, 2017 Filing 171 NOTICE of compliance re 152 Order on motion to appear pro hac vice by Samsung SDI (Malaysia) SDN BHD, Samsung SDI America, Inc., Samsung SDI Brasil Ltda, Samsung SDI Co., Ltd, Samsung SDI Mexico S.A. DE C.V., Shenzhen Samsung SDI Co., Ltd, Tianjin Samsung SDI Co., Ltd (Roberti, John) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
June 8, 2017 Filing 170 NOTICE by MT Picture Display Co., Ltd, Panasonic Corporation re #151 Joint MOTION to transfer case (Joint Motion of Defendants to Transfer Under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a)) [Defendants' Joint Notice of Related Transfers Regarding Joint Motion to Transfer Under 28 U.S.C. 1404(A)] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Stipulation and Order of Transfer Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(A))(Soto, Edward) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
June 8, 2017 Filing 169 Unopposed MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically TO APPROVE VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF DEFENDANT LG ELECTRONICS, INC. by Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wagner, Scott) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
June 5, 2017 Filing 168 NOTICE of compliance re 143 Order on motion to appear pro hac vice by MT Picture Display Co., Ltd, Panasonic Corporation (Rozga, Kajetan) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
June 5, 2017 Filing 167 NOTICE of compliance re 143 Order on motion to appear pro hac vice by MT Picture Display Co., Ltd, Panasonic Corporation (Hemlock, Adam) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
June 5, 2017 Filing 166 NOTICE of compliance re 143 Order on motion to appear pro hac vice by MT Picture Display Co., Ltd, Panasonic Corporation (Yolkut, David) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
June 5, 2017 Filing 165 NOTICE of compliance re 143 Order on motion to appear pro hac vice by MT Picture Display Co., Ltd, Panasonic Corporation (Yohai, David) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
June 5, 2017 Filing 164 NOTICE of compliance re 152 Order on motion to appear pro hac vice by MT Picture Display Co., Ltd, Panasonic Corporation (Kessler, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
June 2, 2017 Mail returned as Undeliverable re: #145 Notice to counsel of Local Rule. Mail sent to Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP One Montgomery St., Suite 3100 San Francisco, CA 94104-4505. Return to sender; attempted not known; unable to forward to Joel S. Sanders. (LMD) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
June 2, 2017 Filing 163 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wagner, Scott) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
June 2, 2017 Filing 162 RESPONSE in Opposition re #151 Joint MOTION to transfer case (Joint Motion of Defendants to Transfer Under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a)) filed by Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Turken, Robert) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
June 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ENDORSED ORDER granting #160 motion to appear pro hac vice. Attorney Kathy L. Osborn may appear pro hac vice on behalf of Defendants Thomson Consumer Electronics, Inc. and Thomson SA, with Attorney Scott Konopka designated as local counsel pursuant to Local Rule 2.02(a). Within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order, counsel shall comply with the form, fee, and electronic filing requirements and file a notice of compliance with said requirements. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli on 6/2/2017. (JLN) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
June 1, 2017 Mail returned as Undeliverable re: 130 Order no pdf. Mail sent to Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP One Montgomery St., Suite 3100 San Francisco, CA 94104-4505. Return to sender; not known here; not deliverable as addressed; unable to forward to Joel S. Sanders. (LMD) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
June 1, 2017 Filing 160 MOTION for Kathy L. Osborn to appear pro hac vice by Technicolor SA, Technicolor USA, Inc., Thomson Consumer Electronics, Inc., Thomson SA. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Konopka, Scott) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
June 1, 2017 Filing 159 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Konopka on behalf of Technicolor SA, Technicolor USA, Inc., Thomson Consumer Electronics, Inc., Thomson SA (Konopka, Scott) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
May 26, 2017 Filing 158 NOTICE of compliance re 144 Order on motion to appear pro hac vice by Lucius B. Lau by Toshiba America Consumer Products, LLC, Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc., Toshiba America Inc., Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation (Lau, Lucius) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
May 26, 2017 Filing 157 NOTICE of compliance re 144 Order on motion to appear pro hac vice by Dana E. Foster by Toshiba America Consumer Products, LLC, Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc., Toshiba America Inc., Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation (Foster, Dana) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
May 26, 2017 Filing 156 NOTICE of compliance re 144 Order on motion to appear pro hac vice by Christopher M. Curran by Toshiba America Consumer Products, LLC, Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc., Toshiba America Inc., Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation (Curran, Christopher) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
May 26, 2017 Filing 155 Written designation and consent to act by Christopher M. Curran on behalf of Toshiba America Consumer Products, LLC, Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc., Toshiba America Inc., Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation. Local Counsel: James R. Robinson. Non-Resident Counsel: Christopher M. Curran, Dana E. Foster, and Lucius B. Lau. (Curran, Christopher) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
May 25, 2017 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney David L Yohai, appearing on behalf of MT Picture Display Co., Ltd, Panasonic Corporation (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA043772). (LMD) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
May 25, 2017 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney Adam C. Hemlock, appearing on behalf of MT Picture Display Co., Ltd, Panasonic Corporation (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA043773). (LMD) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
May 25, 2017 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney David Yolkut, appearing on behalf of MT Picture Display Co., Ltd, Panasonic Corporation (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA043774). (LMD) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
May 25, 2017 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney Kajetan Rozga, appearing on behalf of MT Picture Display Co., Ltd, Panasonic Corporation (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA043775). (LMD) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
May 23, 2017 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney Jeffrey L. Kessler, appearing on behalf of MT Picture Display Co., Ltd, Panasonic Corporation (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA043722). (LMD) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
May 22, 2017 Filing 154 STATUS report re Endorsed Order (Dkt 130): Joint Status Report by Toshiba America Consumer Products, LLC, Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc., Toshiba America Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Curran, Christopher) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
May 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ENDORSED ORDER directing all Plaintiffs and any Defendants not a party to the Motion to transfer (DKT 151) to respond to the Motion to transfer (DKT 151) on or before June 2, 2017. Signed by Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich on 5/22/2017. (IJD) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
May 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ENDORSED ORDER granting #146 motion to appear pro hac vice; granting #147 motion to appear pro hac vice; granting #148 motion to appear pro hac vice; granting #149 motion to appear pro hac vice; granting #150 motion to appear pro hac vice. Attorneys Jacob Pultman, Bradley S. Pensyl, John Roberti, and Michael Feldberg may appear on behalf of Defendants Samsung SDI (Malaysia) SDN. BHD, Samsung SDI America Inc., Samsung SDI Brasil LTDA, Samsung SDI Co., Ltd., Samsung SDI Mexico S.A. DE C.V., Shenzhen Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. and Tianjin Samsung SDI Co., Ltd., with Attorney Daniel L. Rashbaum designated as local counsel pursuant to Local Rule 2.02(a); Attorney Jeffrey L. Kessler may appear on behalf of Defendants Panasonic Corporation and MT Picture Display Co., Ltd., with Attorney Edward Soto designated as local counsel pursuant to Local Rule 2.02(a). Within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order, counsel shall comply with the form, fee, and electronic filing requirements and file a notice of compliance with said requirements. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli on 5/18/2017. (JLN) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
May 17, 2017 Filing 151 Joint MOTION to transfer case (Joint Motion of Defendants to Transfer Under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a)) by MT Picture Display Co., Ltd, Panasonic Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Edward Soto, #2 Exhibit A - Compl., Electrograph Systems, Inc. v. Hitachi, Ltd., No. 2:17-cv-02365-BMC (E.D.N.Y. Feb. 18, 2011), ECF No. 1, #3 Exhibit B - Notice of Tag-Along Action, In re CRT, No. 1917 (J.P.M.L. Dec. 21, 2012), ECF No. 77, #4 Exhibit C - Certain DAPs' Motion Suggesting Remand, In re CRT, No. 3:07-cv-05944-JST (N.D. Cal. October 26, 2016), ECF No. 4985, #5 Exhibit D - Second Am. Compl., Electrograph Systems, Inc. v. Hitachi, Ltd., No. 3:11-cv-01656-JST (N.D. Cal. Oct. 3, 2013), ECF No. 61, #6 Exhibit E - First Am. Compl., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corp. v. Hitachi, Ltd., No. 3:12-cv-02648 (N.D. Cal. Oct. 3, 2013), ECF No. 34, #7 Exhibit F - First Am. Compl., Schultze Agency Services, LLC v. Hitachi, Ltd., No. 3:12-cv-02649 (N.D. Cal. Oct. 3, 2013), ECF No. 34, #8 Exhibit G - Stip. & Order of Dismissal, In re CRT, No. 3:07-cv-05944-JST (N.D. Cal. Dec. 19, 2014), ECF No. 3226, #9 Exhibit H. Notice of Related Case, Electrograph Systems, Inc. v. Hitachi, Ltd., No. 2:17-cv-02365-BMC (E.D.N.Y. April 21 2017), ECF No. 133)(Soto, Edward) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
May 17, 2017 Filing 150 MOTION for Michael Feldberg to appear pro hac vice by Samsung SDI (Malaysia) SDN BHD, Samsung SDI America, Inc., Samsung SDI Brasil Ltda, Samsung SDI Co., Ltd, Samsung SDI Mexico S.A. DE C.V., Shenzhen Samsung SDI Co., Ltd, Tianjin Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rashbaum, Daniel) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
May 17, 2017 Filing 149 MOTION for John Roberti to appear pro hac vice by Samsung SDI (Malaysia) SDN BHD, Samsung SDI America, Inc., Samsung SDI Brasil Ltda, Samsung SDI Co., Ltd, Samsung SDI Mexico S.A. DE C.V., Shenzhen Samsung SDI Co., Ltd, Tianjin Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rashbaum, Daniel) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
May 17, 2017 Filing 148 MOTION for Jacob Pultman to appear pro hac vice by Samsung SDI (Malaysia) SDN BHD, Samsung SDI America, Inc., Samsung SDI Brasil Ltda, Samsung SDI Co., Ltd, Samsung SDI Mexico S.A. DE C.V., Shenzhen Samsung SDI Co., Ltd, Tianjin Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rashbaum, Daniel) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
May 17, 2017 Filing 147 MOTION for Brad S. Pensyl to appear pro hac vice by Samsung SDI (Malaysia) SDN BHD, Samsung SDI America, Inc., Samsung SDI Brasil Ltda, Samsung SDI Co., Ltd, Samsung SDI Mexico S.A. DE C.V., Shenzhen Samsung SDI Co., Ltd, Tianjin Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rashbaum, Daniel) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
May 17, 2017 Filing 146 MOTION for Jeffrey L. Kessler to appear pro hac vice by MT Picture Display Co., Ltd, Panasonic Corporation. (Soto, Edward) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
May 17, 2017 Filing 145 NOTICE to counsel of Local Rule 2.02 (signed by deputy clerk). (LD) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
May 16, 2017 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney Erik T. Koons, appearing on behalf of Koninklijke Pilips Electronics N.V., Philips Electronics North America Corporation (Filing fee $150 receipt number ORL063489). (LMD) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
May 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ENDORSED ORDER granting #136 motion to appear pro hac vice. Attorneys Christopher M. Curran, Dana E. Foster, and Lucius B. Lau may appear on behalf of Defendants Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba America, Inc., Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba America Consumer Products, LLC, and Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc. Within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order, counsel shall file a written designation of local counsel, pursuant to Local Rule 2.02(a). Within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order, counsel shall comply with the form, fee, and electronic filing requirements and file a notice of compliance with said requirements. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli on 5/15/2017. (JLN) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
May 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ENDORSED ORDER granting #134 motion to appear pro hac vice; granting #137 motion to appear pro hac vice; granting #138 motion to appear pro hac vice; granting #139 motion to appear pro hac vice; granting #140 motion to appear pro hac vice. Attorney Erik T. Koons may appear on behalf of Defendants Koninklijke Philips N.V. and Philips Electronics North America Corporation, with Attorney Darryl M. Bloodworth designated as local counsel pursuant to Local Rule 2.02(a); Attorneys Adam C. Hemlock, David L. Yohai, David Yolkut, and Kajetan Rozga may appear on behalf of Defendants Panasonic Corporation and MT Picture Display Co., Ltd., with Attorney Edward Soto designated as local counsel pursuant to Local Rule 2.02(a). Within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order, counsel shall comply with the form, fee, and electronic filing requirements and file a notice of compliance with said requirements. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli on 5/15/2017. (JLN) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
May 15, 2017 Filing 142 CORRECTED NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Rashbaum on behalf of Samsung SDI (Malaysia) SDN BHD, Samsung SDI America, Inc., Samsung SDI Brasil Ltda, Samsung SDI Co., Ltd, Samsung SDI Mexico S.A. DE C.V., Shenzhen Samsung SDI Co., Ltd, Tianjin Samsung SDI Co., Ltd (Rashbaum, Daniel) Modified on 5/15/2017 (LD). [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
May 12, 2017 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney Christopher M. Curran, appearing on behalf of Toshiba America Consumer Products, LLC, Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc., Toshiba America Inc., Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA043489). (LMD) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
May 12, 2017 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney Dana E. Foster, appearing on behalf of Toshiba America Consumer Products, LLC, Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc., Toshiba America Inc., Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA043489). (LMD) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
May 12, 2017 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney Lucius B. Lau, appearing on behalf of Toshiba America Consumer Products, LLC, Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc., Toshiba America Inc., Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA043489). (LMD) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
May 12, 2017 Filing 141 TERMINATED. NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Rashbaum on behalf of Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD., Samsung SDI (Malaysia) SDN BHD, Samsung SDI America, Inc., Samsung SDI Brasil Ltda, Samsung SDI Co., Ltd, Samsung SDI Mexico S.A. DE C.V., Shenzhen Samsung SDI Co., Ltd, Tianjin Samsung SDI Co., Ltd (Rashbaum, Daniel) NOTE: Counsel notified Clerk's Office of error in document, listing incorrect parties; corrected document filed at doc. 142 CORRECTED NOTICE. Modified on 5/15/2017 (LD). Modified on 5/15/2017 (LD). [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
May 12, 2017 Filing 140 MOTION for Kajetan Rozga to appear pro hac vice by MT Picture Display Co., Ltd, Panasonic Corporation. (Soto, Edward) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
May 12, 2017 Filing 139 MOTION for David Yolkut to appear pro hac vice by MT Picture Display Co., Ltd, Panasonic Corporation. (Soto, Edward) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
May 12, 2017 Filing 138 MOTION for David L. Yohai to appear pro hac vice by MT Picture Display Co., Ltd, Panasonic Corporation. (Soto, Edward) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
May 12, 2017 Filing 137 MOTION for Adam C. Hemlock to appear pro hac vice by MT Picture Display Co., Ltd, Panasonic Corporation. (Soto, Edward) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
May 11, 2017 Filing 136 Unopposed MOTION for Christopher M. Curran, Dana E. Foster, and Lucius B. Lau to appear pro hac vice by Toshiba America Consumer Products, LLC, Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc., Toshiba America Inc., Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation. (Attachments: ***TERMINATED*** # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Robinson, James) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. EXHIBITS - terminated, image removed, counsel notified to file originals with the Clerk of Court. Modified on 5/12/2017 (LD). [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
May 11, 2017 Filing 135 NOTICE of Appearance by James Nial Robinson, II on behalf of Toshiba America Consumer Products, LLC, Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc., Toshiba America Inc., Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation (Robinson, James) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
May 11, 2017 Filing 134 MOTION for Erik T. Koons to appear pro hac vice by Koninklijke Pilips Electronics N.V., Philips Electronics North America Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Bloodworth, Darryl) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
May 11, 2017 Filing 133 NOTICE of Appearance by Pravin Rajesh Patel on behalf of MT Picture Display Co., Ltd, Panasonic Corporation (Patel, Pravin) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
May 11, 2017 Filing 132 NOTICE of Appearance by Darryl M. Bloodworth on behalf of Koninklijke Pilips Electronics N.V., Philips Electronics North America Corporation (Bloodworth, Darryl) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
May 10, 2017 Filing 131 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward Soto on behalf of MT Picture Display Co., Ltd, Panasonic Corporation (Soto, Edward) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
May 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ENDORSED ORDER directing parties to file status report identifying proposed trial, pretrial, and mediation dates, as well as any other matters requiring the Court's attention, on or before May 22, 2017. The parties will inform the Court of the anticipated length of trial. Signed by Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich on 5/8/2017. (IJD) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
April 20, 2017 Filing 129 NOTICE to counsel of Local Rule 2.02 (signed by deputy clerk). (JNB) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
April 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 128 STANDING ORDER: Filing of documents that exceed twenty-five pages. Signed by Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich on 4/20/2017. (JNB) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
April 20, 2017 Filing 127 NOTICE to counsel of new case number and judge assignment 8:17-cv-944-T-17AEP(signed by deputy clerk). (JNB) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
April 20, 2017 Filing 126 Case transferred in from District of California Northern; Case Number 3:13-cv-00157. File received electronically [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
April 18, 2017 case electronically transmitted to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Florida. (tnS) (Filed on 4/18/2017) [Transferred from cand on 4/20/2017.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
April 18, 2017 Filing 125 CONDITIONAL REMAND ORDER by the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL No. 1917. (tnS) (Filed on 4/18/2017) [Transferred from cand on 4/20/2017.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
April 18, 2017 Filing 124 NOTICE filed by Samsung SDI (Malaysia) SDN BHD, Samsung SDI America Inc, Samsung SDI Brasil LTDA, Samsung SDI Co Ltd, Samsung SDI Mexico S.A. de C.V., Shenzhen Samsung SDI Co Ltd, Tianjin Samsung SDI Co Ltd. of Withdrawal of Counsel (Scarborough, Michael) (Filed on 4/18/2017) [Transferred from cand on 4/20/2017.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER GRANTING MOTION SUGGESTING REMAND by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting (4985) Motion to Remand in case 3:07-cv-05944-JST. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2017) [Transferred from cand on 4/20/2017.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER DENYING SDI DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO EXCLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY OF DR. STEPHAN HAGGARD by Judge Jon S. Tigar denying (3172) Motion in Limine in case 3:07-cv-05944-JST. Pursuant to ECF No. 4477 par. 5, if no party files a motion to keep all or part of the underlying order under seal within 10 days of the filing date, the Court will unseal the order. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2017) [Transferred from cand on 4/20/2017.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
February 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART HITACHI PARTIES' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting in part and denying in part (2976) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 3:07-cv-05944-JST. Pursuant to ECF No. 4477 par. 5, if no party files a motion to keep all or part of the underlying order under seal within 10 days of the filing date, the Court will unseal the order. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2017) Modified on 2/7/2017 (wsn, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from cand on 4/20/2017.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
June 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 120 STIPULATION AND ORDER re (4680 in 3:07-cv-05944-JST) STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER of Dismissal Against Mitsubishi Electric Defendants filed by Electrograph Systems, Inc, Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation, Interbond Corporation of America, Electrograph Technologies Corp., Tech Data Corporation, Office Depot, Inc., Tech Data Product Management, Inc., ABC Appliance, Inc., Schultze Agency Services, LLC. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 23, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2016) [Transferred from cand on 4/20/2017.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
June 23, 2016 Filing 119 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER of Dismissal filed by Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc.. (Wagner, Scott) (Filed on 6/23/2016) [Transferred from cand on 4/20/2017.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
May 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A MOTION SUGGESTING REMAND by Judge Jon S. Tigar; granting (4555) Administrative Motion for Leave to File a Motion Suggesting Remand in case 3:07-cv-05944-JST. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2016) [Transferred from cand on 4/20/2017.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
April 29, 2016 Filing 117 Transcript of Proceedings held on 04/19/2016, before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Court Reporter Rhonda Aquilina, rhondaaquilina@aol.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (4573 in 3:07-cv-05944-JST) Transcript Order, ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/28/2016. (Aquilina, Rhonda) (Filed on 4/29/2016) [Transferred from cand on 4/20/2017.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
March 4, 2016 Filing 116 Transcript of Proceedings held on 02/23/2016, before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Court Reporter Rhonda Aquilina, rhondaaquilina@aol.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (4429 in 3:07-cv-05944-JST) Transcript Order, (4422 in 3:07-cv-05944-JST) Transcript Order, (4432 in 3:07-cv-05944-JST) Transcript Order, (4433 in 3:07-cv-05944-JST) Transcript Order, (4421 in 3:07-cv-05944-JST) Transcript Order, (4426 in 3:07-cv-05944-JST) Transcript Order, (4423 in 3:07-cv-05944-JST) Transcript Order, (4434 in 3:07-cv-05944-JST) Transcript Order, (4424 in 3:07-cv-05944-JST) Transcript Order, (4420 in 3:07-cv-05944-JST) Transcript Order, (4425 in 3:07-cv-05944-JST) Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/2/2016. (Aquilina, Rhonda) (Filed on 3/4/2016) [Transferred from cand on 4/20/2017.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
November 2, 2015 Case reassigned to Hon. Judge Jon S. Tigar. Hon. Judge Samuel Conti no longer assigned to the case. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2015) [Transferred from cand on 4/20/2017.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
November 2, 2015 Filing 115 MDL PANEL ORDER REASSIGNING LITIGATION. (rcsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2015) [Transferred from cand on 4/20/2017.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
October 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 114 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 10/29/2015. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2015) [Transferred from cand on 4/20/2017.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
October 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti granting and adopting the following Reports and Recommendations: 3365 , 3960 , 4066 , 4095 , and 4117 in case 3:07-cv-05944-SC; and granting the same Reports and Recommendations as filed under different docket numbers in related cases, including: (134) in case 3:11-cv-05514-SC; (111) in case 3:13-cv-00157-SC; (200) in case 3:13-cv-01173-SC; (46) in case 3:13-cv-05261-SC; (43) in case 3:13-cv-05262-SC; (55) in case 3:13-cv-05264-SC; (45) in case 3:13-cv-05668-SC; (44) in case 3:13-cv-05686-SC; (50) in case 3:13-cv-05727-SC; (55) in case 3:13-cv-05726-SC; (51) in case 3:13-cv-05725-SC; (54) in case 3:13-cv-05724-SC; (36) in case 3:13-cv-05723-SC; and (111) and (112) in case 3:14-cv-02510-SC. (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2015) [Transferred from cand on 4/20/2017.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
October 27, 2015 Filing 112 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc.. (Wagner, Scott) (Filed on 10/27/2015) [Transferred from cand on 4/20/2017.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
October 5, 2015 Filing 111 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master Objections due by 10/19/2015. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 10/5/2015. (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2015) [Transferred from cand on 4/20/2017.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
August 6, 2015 Filing 110 NOTICE by Mitsubishi Digital Electronics America, Inc., Mitsubishi Electric & Electronics, USA, Inc., Mitsubishi Electric Corporation / Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel (Brody, Michael) (Filed on 8/6/2015) [Transferred from cand on 4/20/2017.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
June 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 109 STIPULATION AND ORDER of Dismissal. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 06/18/2015. (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2015) [Transferred from cand on 4/20/2017.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
June 16, 2015 Filing 108 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER of Dismissal filed by Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc.. (Wagner, Scott) (Filed on 6/16/2015) [Transferred from cand on 4/20/2017.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
April 17, 2015 Filing 107 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master regarding the status of settlement and the scheduling of approval for class action settlements. Objections due by 5/1/2015. (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2015) [Transferred from cand on 4/20/2017.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
April 3, 2015 Filing 106 NOTICE by Hitachi America Ltd, Hitachi Asia Ltd, Hitachi Displays, Ltd., Hitachi Electronic Devices (USA), Inc., Hitachi, Ltd. Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney James Maxwell Cooper (Adelson, Eliot) (Filed on 4/3/2015) [Transferred from cand on 4/20/2017.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
February 17, 2015 Filing 105 CLERK'S NOTICE Vacating Motion Hearings. The Motion Hearings, which have been noticed for Friday, 02/20/2015 and 02/27/2015, will be decided on papers submitted without oral argument unless the Court notices a hearing date in the future. This is a text only docket entry. There is no document associated with this notice. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2015) [Transferred from cand on 4/20/2017.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
February 2, 2015 Filing 104 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d filed byToshiba America Consumer Products LLC, Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc., Toshiba America Inc, Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation. (Lau, Lucius) (Filed on 2/2/2015) [Transferred from cand on 4/20/2017.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
January 23, 2015 Filing 103 Joinder re #96 Reply to Opposition/Response, Defendants Chunghwa Picture Tubes, Ltd. and Chunghwa Picture Tubes (Malaysia) Sdn. Bhd.'s Joinder to Defendants' Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' Indirect Purchaser Claims Based on Foreign Sales (MDL No. 3463) by Chunghwa Picture Tubes (Malaysia), Chunghwa Picture Tubes, LTD.. (Brass, Rachel) (Filed on 1/23/2015) [Transferred from cand on 4/20/2017.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
January 23, 2015 Filing 102 OBJECTIONS to re #90 Notice (Other), Hitachi Parties Objections to Evidence in Support of Plaintiffs Opposition to the Hitachi Parties Motion for Summary Judgment Based Upon Lack of Evidence of Participation in the Alleged Conspiracy (MDL 3451) by Hitachi America Ltd, Hitachi Displays, Ltd., Hitachi Electronic Devices (USA), Inc.. (Adelson, Eliot) (Filed on 1/23/2015) [Transferred from cand on 4/20/2017.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
January 23, 2015 Filing 101 OBJECTIONS to re #87 Notice (Other), Hitachi Defendants Objections to Proposed Evidence Submitted in Plaintiffs Opposition to the Hitachi Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment Based Upon Withdrawal and Statutes of Limitations (MDL 3449) by Hitachi America Ltd, Hitachi Asia Ltd, Hitachi Displays, Ltd., Hitachi Electronic Devices (USA), Inc., Hitachi, Ltd.. (Adelson, Eliot) (Filed on 1/23/2015) [Transferred from cand on 4/20/2017.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
January 23, 2015 Filing 100 REPLY (re #67 MOTION for Summary Judgment [Redacted] Hitachi Parties Notice Of Motion And Motion For Summary Judgment Based Upon The Lack Of Evidence Of Participation In The Alleged Conspiracy And Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Thereof (MDL 297 ) filed byHitachi America Ltd, Hitachi Displays, Ltd., Hitachi Electronic Devices (USA), Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Adelson Reply Declaration, #2 Exhibit 27-33 Redacted)(Adelson, Eliot) (Filed on 1/23/2015) [Transferred from cand on 4/20/2017.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
January 23, 2015 Filing 99 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 79-59(d) And 7-11 re Hitachi Parties Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment Based Upon the Lack of Evidence of Participation in the Alleged Conspiracy [MDL 3439] filed by Hitachi America Ltd, Hitachi Displays, Ltd., Hitachi Electronic Devices (USA), Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Adelson Sealing Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit 27-33 Redacted, #4 Exhibit 27-33 Unredacted, #5 Redacted Reply, #6 Unredacted Reply, #7 Redacted Adelson Reply Declaration, #8 Unredacted Adelson Reply Declaration)(Adelson, Eliot) (Filed on 1/23/2015) [Transferred from cand on 4/20/2017.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
January 23, 2015 Filing 98 REPLY (re #66 MOTION for Summary Judgment [Redacted] Hitachi Defendants Notice Of Motion And Motion For Summary Judgment Based Upon Withdrawal And The Statutes Of Limitations And Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Thereof (MDL 2972) ) filed byHitachi America Ltd, Hitachi Asia Ltd, Hitachi Displays, Ltd., Hitachi Electronic Devices (USA), Inc., Hitachi, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Redacred Adelson Reply Declaration, #2 Exhibit 25 Redacted)(Adelson, Eliot) (Filed on 1/23/2015) [Transferred from cand on 4/20/2017.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
January 23, 2015 Filing 97 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 79-59(d) and 7-11 re Hitachi Defendants Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment Based Upon Withdrawal and the Statutes of Limitations [MDL 3433] filed by Hitachi America Ltd, Hitachi Asia Ltd, Hitachi Displays, Ltd., Hitachi Electronic Devices (USA), Inc., Hitachi, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Adelson Sealing Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit 25 Redacted, #4 Exhibit 25 Unredacted, #5 Redacted Reply, #6 Unredacted Reply, #7 Redacted Adelson Reply Declaration, #8 Unredacted Adelson Reply Declaration)(Adelson, Eliot) (Filed on 1/23/2015) [Transferred from cand on 4/20/2017.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
January 23, 2015 Filing 96 REPLY (re #69 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Redacted) Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' Indirect Purchaser Claims Based on Foreign Sales and Exhibits ) filed byToshiba America Consumer Products LLC, Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc., Toshiba America Inc, Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation. (Lau, Lucius) (Filed on 1/23/2015) [Transferred from cand on 4/20/2017.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
January 23, 2015 Filing 95 REPLY (re #62 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Redacted) The Toshiba Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment Concerning Withdrawal ) The Toshiba Defendants' Reply Memorandum In Support Of Their Motion for Summary Judgment Concerning Withdrawal filed byToshiba America Consumer Products LLC, Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc., Toshiba America Inc, Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Declaration of Lucius B. Lau In Support of the Toshiba Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment Concerning Withdrawal, #2 Sealed Exhibits to Supplemental Declaration of Lucius B. Lau In Support of the Toshiba Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment Concerning Withdrawal)(Lau, Lucius) (Filed on 1/23/2015) [Transferred from cand on 4/20/2017.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
January 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 94 Order by Hon. Samuel Conti granting (3260) Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice in case 3:07-cv-05944-SC.Associated Cases: 3:07-cv-05944-SC, 3:13-cv-00157-SC(tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2015) [Transferred from cand on 4/20/2017.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
January 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 93 Order by Hon. Samuel Conti granting (3212) STIPULATION REGARDING SCHEDULING OF RULE 30(b)(6) DEPOSITION OF THOMSON SA AND THOMSON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS, INC. in case 3:07-cv-05944-SC.Associated Cases: 3:07-cv-05944-SC, 3:13-cv-00157-SC, 3:13-cv-01173-SC, 3:13-cv-05261-SC, 3:13-cv-05262-SC, 3:13-cv-05264-SC, 3:13-cv-05668-SC, 3:13-cv-05686-SC, 3:13-cv-05723-SC, 3:13-cv-05724-SC, 3:13-cv-05725-SC, 3:13-cv-05726-SC, 3:13-cv-05727-SC, 3:14-cv-02058-SC, 3:14-cv-02510-SC(tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2015) [Transferred from cand on 4/20/2017.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
December 24, 2014 Filing 92 NOTICE by Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc. of Plaintiffs Opposition to the Toshiba Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment Concerning Withdrawal (Filed as MDL Dkt. No. 3280) (Wagner, Scott) (Filed on 12/24/2014) [Transferred from cand on 4/20/2017.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
December 24, 2014 Filing 91 NOTICE by Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc. of Plaintiffs Joint Opposition to LGE Defendants Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Standing Grounds (Filed as MDL Dkt. No. 3279) (Wagner, Scott) (Filed on 12/24/2014) [Transferred from cand on 4/20/2017.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
December 24, 2014 Filing 90 NOTICE by Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc. of Plaintiffs Joint Opposition to Hitachi Parties Motion for Summary Judgment Based Upon the Lack of Evidence of Participation in the Alleged Conspiracy (Filed as MDL Dkt. No. 3274) (Wagner, Scott) (Filed on 12/24/2014) [Transferred from cand on 4/20/2017.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
December 24, 2014 Filing 89 NOTICE by Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc. of Direct Action Plaintiffs and Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs Opposition to Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment Based Upon Plaintiffs Purported Failure to Distinguish Between Actionable and Non-Actionable Damages Under The FTAIA; And Direct Action Plaintiffs Opposition to the LGE Defendants Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on FTAIA Grounds (Filed as MDL Dkt. No. 3272) (Wagner, Scott) (Filed on 12/24/2014) [Transferred from cand on 4/20/2017.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
December 24, 2014 Filing 88 NOTICE by Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc. of Direct Action Plaintiffs Opposition to Defendant Mitsubishi Electric Corporations Motion for Summary Judgment Based Upon Absence of Evidence of Liability (Filed as MDL Dkt. No. 3271) (Wagner, Scott) (Filed on 12/24/2014) [Transferred from cand on 4/20/2017.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
December 24, 2014 Filing 87 NOTICE by Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc. of Plaintiffs Opposition to Hitachi Defendants Motion For Summary Judgment Based Upon Withdrawal and The Statutes of Limitations (Filed as MDL Dkt. No. 3268) (Wagner, Scott) (Filed on 12/24/2014) [Transferred from cand on 4/20/2017.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
December 24, 2014 Filing 86 NOTICE by Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc. of Opposition to Defendant LG Electronics, Inc.'s Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Withdrawal Grounds (Filed as MDL Dkt. No. 3262) (Wagner, Scott) (Filed on 12/24/2014) [Transferred from cand on 4/20/2017.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
December 24, 2014 Filing 85 NOTICE by Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc. of DAPs' Opposition to Mitsubishi Electric Subsidiaries' Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment (Filed as MDL Dkt. No. 3257) (Wagner, Scott) (Filed on 12/24/2014) [Transferred from cand on 4/20/2017.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
December 24, 2014 Filing 84 NOTICE by Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc. of Plaintiffs Opposition to Mitsubishis Motion for Partial Summary Judgment as to Direct Action Purchasers Sherman Act Damages Claims Based on CRT Product Purchases from NEC Corporation And NEC-Mitsubishi Electric Visual Systems Corporation (Filed as MDL Dkt. No. 3251) (Wagner, Scott) (Filed on 12/24/2014) [Transferred from cand on 4/20/2017.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
December 24, 2014 Filing 83 NOTICE by Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc. of Plaintiffs Opposition to Defendants Panasonic Corporation of North America and Panasonic Corporations (F/K/A Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd.) Motion for Summary Judgment (Filed as MDL Dkt. No. 3248) (Wagner, Scott) (Filed on 12/24/2014) [Transferred from cand on 4/20/2017.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
December 24, 2014 Filing 82 NOTICE by Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc. of Indirect Purchaser and Certain Direct Action Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Joint Motion for Partial Summary Judgment for Lack of Antitrust Injury and Antitrust Standing Under Federal and Certain State Laws (Filed as MDL Dkt. No. 3245) (Wagner, Scott) (Filed on 12/24/2014) [Transferred from cand on 4/20/2017.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
December 24, 2014 Filing 81 NOTICE by Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc. of Direct Action Plaintiffs Response in Opposition to SDI Defendants Motion for Partial Summary Judgment for Lack Of Standing as to their Sherman Act Damage Claims Based on CRT Product Purchases from Samsung Electronics (Filed as MDL Dkt. No. 3244) (Wagner, Scott) (Filed on 12/24/2014) [Transferred from cand on 4/20/2017.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
December 24, 2014 Filing 80 NOTICE by Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc. of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Philips Electronics North America Corporation's, Philips Taiwan Limited's and Philips Do Brasil Ltda.'s Motion for Summary Judgment (Filed as MDL Docket No. 3241) (Wagner, Scott) (Filed on 12/24/2014) [Transferred from cand on 4/20/2017.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
December 24, 2014 Filing 79 NOTICE by Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc. of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Koninklijke Philips N.V.'s Motion for Summary Judgment (Filed as MDL Dkt. No. 3040) (Wagner, Scott) (Filed on 12/24/2014) [Transferred from cand on 4/20/2017.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
December 24, 2014 Filing 78 NOTICE by Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc. of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant Thomson Consumer's Motion for Summary Judgment and Partial Summary Judgment (Filed as MDL Dkt. No. 3236) (Wagner, Scott) (Filed on 12/24/2014) [Transferred from cand on 4/20/2017.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
December 23, 2014 Filing 77 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice filed by Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wagner, Scott) (Filed on 12/23/2014) [Transferred from cand on 4/20/2017.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
December 22, 2014 Filing 76 ANSWER to #15 Amended Complaint of Tech Data Corporation and Tech Data Product Management byChunghwa Picture Tubes (Malaysia), Chunghwa Picture Tubes, LTD.. (Sanders, Joel) (Filed on 12/22/2014) Modified on 12/23/2014 (aaaS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from cand on 4/20/2017.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
December 9, 2014 Filing 75 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Chunghwa Picture Tubes (Malaysia), Chunghwa Picture Tubes, LTD. Defendants Chunghwa Picture Tubes, Ltd. and Chunghwa Picture Tubes (Malaysia) Sdn. Bhd.'s Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Dismiss Tech Data Corporation's Claims for Failure to Prosecute, MDL No. 3188 (Brass, Rachel) (Filed on 12/9/2014) [Transferred from cand on 4/20/2017.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
December 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 74 Order by Hon. Samuel Conti granting (3163) Stipulation re 2963 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution Regarding Tech Data Corporation.Associated Cases: 3:07-cv-05944-SC, 3:13-cv-00157-SC(tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2014) [Transferred from cand on 4/20/2017.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
December 5, 2014 Filing 73 MOTION in Limine Defendants' Joint Notice of Motion and Motion to Exclude Certain Expert Testimony of Professor Kenneth Elzinga filed by Toshiba America Consumer Products LLC, Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc., Toshiba America Inc, Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 2/20/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Samuel Conti. Responses due by 1/16/2015. Replies due by 2/9/2015. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Redacted Version of Declaration of Lucius B. Lau in Support of Defendants' Joint Notice of Motion and Motion to Exclude Certain Expert Testimony of Professor Kenneth Elzinga, #2 Proposed Order)(Lau, Lucius) (Filed on 12/5/2014) [Transferred from cand on 4/20/2017.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
December 3, 2014 Filing 72 NOTICE by Toshiba America Consumer Products LLC, Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc., Toshiba America Inc, Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation Defendants' Notice of Supplemental Authority in Support of Certain Motions for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Lau, Lucius) (Filed on 12/3/2014) [Transferred from cand on 4/20/2017.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
December 2, 2014 Filing 71 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Chunghwa Picture Tubes (Malaysia), Chunghwa Picture Tubes, LTD. Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding Defendants Chunghwa Picture Tubes, Ltd. and Chunghwa Picture Tubes (Malaysia) SDN. BHD.'s Motion to Dismiss for Failure to Prosecute, MDL No. 3163 (Brass, Rachel) (Filed on 12/2/2014) [Transferred from cand on 4/20/2017.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
November 20, 2014 Filing 70 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case by Tech Data Corporation re #61 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case,, Tech Data Corporation Opposition to Defendants Chunghwa Picture Tubes, LTD. and Chunghwa Picture Tubes (Malaysia) SDN. BHD.'s Motion to Dismiss Tech Data Corporation's Claims for Failure to Prosecute (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Scott N. Wagner, #2 Exhibit 1-12)(Wagner, Scott) (Filed on 11/20/2014) [Transferred from cand on 4/20/2017.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
November 7, 2014 Filing 69 MOTION & [PROPOSED] ORDER for Summary Judgment (Redacted) Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' Indirect Purchaser Claims Based on Foreign Sales and Exhibits filed by Toshiba America Consumer Products LLC, Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc., Toshiba America Inc, Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 2/6/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Samuel Conti. Responses due by 12/23/2014. Replies due by 1/23/2015. (Lau, Lucius) (Filed on 11/7/2014) Modified on 11/10/2014 (aaaS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from cand on 4/20/2017.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
November 7, 2014 Filing 68 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment SDI DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT FOR LACK OF STANDING AS TO DIRECT ACTION PLAINTIFFS SHERMAN ACT DAMAGE CLAIMS BASED ON CRT PRODUCT PURCHASES FROM SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS filed by Samsung SDI (Malaysia) SDN BHD, Samsung SDI America Inc, Samsung SDI Brasil LTDA, Samsung SDI Co Ltd, Samsung SDI Mexico S.A. de C.V., Shenzhen Samsung SDI Co Ltd, Tianjin Samsung SDI Co Ltd. Motion Hearing set for 2/6/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Samuel Conti. Responses due by 12/23/2014. Replies due by 1/23/2015. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James L. McGinnis In Support Of SDI Defendants' Motion For Partial Summary Judgment and Exhibits 1-22, #2 Proposed Order)(McGinnis, James) (Filed on 11/7/2014) [Transferred from cand on 4/20/2017.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
November 7, 2014 Filing 67 MOTION for Summary Judgment [Redacted] Hitachi Parties Notice Of Motion And Motion For Summary Judgment Based Upon The Lack Of Evidence Of Participation In The Alleged Conspiracy And Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Thereof (MDL 2976) filed by Hitachi America Ltd, Hitachi Displays, Ltd., Hitachi Electronic Devices (USA), Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 2/6/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Samuel Conti. Responses due by 12/23/2014. Replies due by 1/23/2015. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Adelson Declaration and Exhibits 1-26, #2 Proposed Order)(Adelson, Eliot) (Filed on 11/7/2014) [Transferred from cand on 4/20/2017.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
November 7, 2014 Filing 66 MOTION for Summary Judgment [Redacted] Hitachi Defendants Notice Of Motion And Motion For Summary Judgment Based Upon Withdrawal And The Statutes Of Limitations And Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Thereof (MDL 2972) filed by Hitachi America Ltd, Hitachi Asia Ltd, Hitachi Displays, Ltd., Hitachi Electronic Devices (USA), Inc., Hitachi, Ltd.. Motion Hearing set for 2/6/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Samuel Conti. Responses due by 12/23/2014. Replies due by 1/23/2015. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Adelson Declaration and Exhibits 1-24, #2 Proposed Order)(Adelson, Eliot) (Filed on 11/7/2014) [Transferred from cand on 4/20/2017.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
November 7, 2014 Filing 65 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Regarding SDI Defendants' Motion For Partial Summary Judgment For Lack of Standing As To Direct Action Plaintiffs' Sherman Act Damage Claims Based On CRT Product Purchases From Samsung Electronics filed by Samsung SDI (Malaysia) SDN BHD, Samsung SDI America Inc, Samsung SDI Brasil LTDA, Samsung SDI Co Ltd, Samsung SDI Mexico S.A. de C.V., Shenzhen Samsung SDI Co Ltd, Tianjin Samsung SDI Co Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Helen C. Eckert In Support Of SDI Defendants' Administrative Motion To Seal, #2 Proposed Order, #3 SDI Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #4 Redacted Version of Declaration of James L. McGinnis In Support of SDI Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Exhibits 1-22, #5 Part 1 of Unredacted Version of Declaration of James L. McGinnis In Support of SDI Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Exhibits 1-22, #6 Part 2 of Unredacted Version of Declaration of James L. McGinnis In Support of SDI Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Exhibits 1-22, #7 Part 3 of Unredacted Version of Declaration of James L. McGinnis In Support of SDI Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Exhibits 1-22, #8 Part 4 of Unredacted Version of Declaration of James L. McGinnis In Support of SDI Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Exhibits 1-22, #9 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Eckert, Helen) (Filed on 11/7/2014) [Transferred from cand on 4/20/2017.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
November 7, 2014 Filing 64 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Pursuant To Civil Local Rules 79-59(D) And 7-11 Re Hitachi Parties Notice Of Motion And Motion For Summary Judgment Based Upon The Lack Of Evidence Of Participation In The Alleged Conspiracy And Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Thereof (MDL No. 2974) filed by Hitachi America Ltd, Hitachi Displays, Ltd., Hitachi Electronic Devices (USA), Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2-6 Redacted, #5 Exhibit 2 Unredacted, #6 Exhibit 3 Unredacted, #7 Exhibit 4 Unredacted, #8 Exhibit 5 Unredacted, #9 Exhibit 6 Unredacted, #10 Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit 8, #12 Exhibit 9-26 Redacted, #13 Exhibit 9 Unredacted, #14 Exhibit 10 Unredacted, #15 Exhibit 11 Unredacted, #16 Exhibit 12 Unredacted, #17 Exhibit 13 Unredacted, #18 Exhibit 14 Unredacted, #19 Exhibit 15 Unredacted, #20 Exhibit 16 Unredacted, #21 Exhibit 17 Unredacted, #22 Exhibit 18 Unredacted, #23 Exhibit 19 Unredacted, #24 Exhibit 20 Unredacted, #25 Exhibit 21 Unredacted, #26 Exhibit 22 Unredacted, #27 Exhibit 23 Unredacted, #28 Exhibit 24 Unredacted, #29 Exhibit 25 Unredacted, #30 Exhibit 26 Unredacted, #31 Motion Redacted, #32 Motion Unredacted, #33 Declaration Adelson Redacted, #34 Declaration Adelson Unredacted, #35 Proposed Order)(Adelson, Eliot) (Filed on 11/7/2014) [Transferred from cand on 4/20/2017.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
November 7, 2014 Filing 63 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Pursuant To Civil Local Rules 79-59(D) And 7-11 Re Hitachi Defendants Notice Of Motion And Motion For Summary Judgment Based Upon Withdrawal And The Statutes Of Limitations (MDL No. 2971) filed by Hitachi America Ltd, Hitachi Asia Ltd, Hitachi Displays, Ltd., Hitachi Electronic Devices (USA), Inc., Hitachi, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Adelson, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3-7 Redacted, #6 Exhibit 3 Unredacted, #7 Exhibit 4 Unredacted, #8 Exhibit 5 Unredacted, #9 Exhibit 6 Unredacted, #10 Exhibit 7 Unredacted, #11 Exhibit 8, #12 Exhibit 9 Redacted, #13 Exhibit 9 Unredacted, #14 Exhibit 10, #15 Exhibit 11, #16 Exhibit 12-17 Redacted, #17 Exhibit 12 Unredacted, #18 Exhibit 13 Unredacted, #19 Exhibit 14 Unredacted, #20 Exhibit 15 Unredacted, #21 Exhibit 16 Unredacted, #22 Exhibit 17 Unredacted, #23 Exhibit 18, #24 Exhibit 19, #25 Exhibit 20 Redacted, #26 Exhibit 20 Unredacted, #27 Exhibit 21, #28 Exhibit 22, #29 Exhibit 23 Redacted, #30 Exhibit 23 Unredacted, #31 Exhibit 24, #32 Motion Redacted, #33 Motion Unredacted, #34 Declaration Adelson Redacted, #35 Declaration Adelson Unredacted, #36 Proposed Order)(Adelson, Eliot) (Filed on 11/7/2014) [Transferred from cand on 4/20/2017.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
November 7, 2014 Filing 62 MOTION & [PROPOSED] ORDER for Summary Judgment (Redacted) The Toshiba Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment Concerning Withdrawal filed by Toshiba America Consumer Products LLC, Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc., Toshiba America Inc, Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 2/6/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Samuel Conti. Responses due by 12/23/2014. Replies due by 1/23/2015. (Lau, Lucius) (Filed on 11/7/2014) Modified on 11/10/2014 (aaaS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from cand on 4/20/2017.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
November 6, 2014 Filing 61 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Chunghwa Picture Tubes (Malaysia), Chunghwa Picture Tubes, LTD. Defendants Chunghwa Picture Tubes, Ltd. and Chunghwa Picture Tubes (Malaysia) SDN. BHD.'s Motion to Dismiss Tech Data Corporation's Claims for Failure to Prosecute, MDL No. 2963 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Rachel S. Brass In Suppport Of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, #2 Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Motion to Dismiss)(Brass, Rachel) (Filed on 11/6/2014) [Transferred from cand on 4/20/2017.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
October 10, 2014 Filing 60 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending the Deadline to File Motion to Compel Toshiba to Respond to Direct Action Plaintiffs and Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for Admission filed by Toshiba America Consumer Products LLC, Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc., Toshiba America Inc, Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation. (Lau, Lucius) (Filed on 10/10/2014) [Transferred from cand on 4/20/2017.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
October 7, 2014 Filing 59 Brief Direct Action Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of #55 Renewed Motion to Compel Defendants to Produce the European Commision Decision filed byTech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc.. (Wagner, Scott) (Filed on 10/7/2014) Modified on 10/8/2014 (aaaS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from cand on 4/20/2017.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
October 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti granting (2844) Stipulation in case 3:07-cv-05944-SC extending the deadline to file motion to compel Direct Action Plaintiffs to respond to certain of the Thomson Defendants' discovery requests. (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2014) [Transferred from cand on 4/20/2017.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
October 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti granting (2842) Stipulation in case 3:07-cv-05944-SC; granting (54) Stipulation in case 3:13-cv-00157-SC regarding written discovery (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2014) [Transferred from cand on 4/20/2017.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
September 15, 2014 Filing 56 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Scheduling [Master Docket No. 2835] filed by Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc.. (Wagner, Scott) (Filed on 9/15/2014) [Transferred from cand on 4/20/2017.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
September 12, 2014 Filing 55 MOTION to Compel Direct Action Plaintiffs' Renewed Motion to Compel Defendants to Produce the European Commission Decision filed by Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 10/24/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Samuel Conti. Responses due by 9/26/2014. Replies due by 10/3/2014. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Philip J. Iovieno, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20)(Wagner, Scott) (Filed on 9/12/2014) [Transferred from cand on 4/20/2017.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
September 12, 2014 Filing 54 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING WRITTEN DISCOVERY filed by Samsung SDI (Malaysia) SDN BHD, Samsung SDI America Inc, Samsung SDI Brasil LTDA, Samsung SDI Co Ltd, Samsung SDI Mexico S.A. de C.V., Shenzhen Samsung SDI Co Ltd, Tianjin Samsung SDI Co Ltd. (Caseria, Leo) (Filed on 9/12/2014) [Transferred from cand on 4/20/2017.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
September 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 53 Order by Hon. Samuel Conti granting (2792) STIPULATION REGARDING DISCOVERY TO OCCUR AFTER SEPTEMBER 5, 2014 in case 3:07-cv-05944-SC.Associated Cases: 3:07-cv-05944-SC, 3:13-cv-00157-SC(tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2014) [Transferred from cand on 4/20/2017.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
September 5, 2014 Filing 52 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY TO OCCUR AFTER SEPTEMBER 5, 2014 filed by Samsung SDI (Malaysia) SDN BHD, Samsung SDI America Inc, Samsung SDI Brasil LTDA, Samsung SDI Co Ltd, Samsung SDI Mexico S.A. de C.V., Shenzhen Samsung SDI Co Ltd, Tianjin Samsung SDI Co Ltd. (Caseria, Leo) (Filed on 9/5/2014) [Transferred from cand on 4/20/2017.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
August 25, 2014 Filing 51 Transcript of Proceedings held on 8-22-14, before Judge Samuel Conti. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Sullivan, Telephone number 415-794-6659/Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (2758 in 3:07-cv-05944-SC) Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/24/2014. (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 8/25/2014) [Transferred from cand on 4/20/2017.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
July 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti denying (2603) Motion to Intervene in case 3:07-cv-05944-SC (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2014) [Transferred from cand on 4/20/2017.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
May 27, 2014 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by Shaun M. Van Horn for Defendants Mitsubishi Electric Corporation, Mitsubishi Electric US, Inc. and Mitsubishi Electric Visual Solutions America, Inc. (Van Horn, Shaun) (Filed on 5/27/2014) [Transferred from cand on 4/20/2017.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
May 27, 2014 Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael T. Brody for Defendants Mitsubishi Electric Corporation, Mitsubishi Electric US, Inc. and Mitsubishi Electric Visual Solutions America, Inc. (Brody, Michael) (Filed on 5/27/2014) [Transferred from cand on 4/20/2017.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
May 27, 2014 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by Gabriel A. Fuentes for Defendants Mitsubishi Electric Corporation, Mitsubishi Electric US, Inc. and Mitsubishi Electric Visual Solutions America, Inc. (Fuentes, Gabriel) (Filed on 5/27/2014) [Transferred from cand on 4/20/2017.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
May 27, 2014 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by Terrence Joseph Truax for Defendants Mitsubishi Electric Corporation, Mitsubishi Electric US, Inc. and Mitsubishi Electric Visual Solutions America, Inc. (Truax, Terrence) (Filed on 5/27/2014) [Transferred from cand on 4/20/2017.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
May 27, 2014 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by Molly McGrail Powers for Defendants Mitsubishi Electric Corporation, Mitsubishi Electric US, Inc. and Mitsubishi Electric Visual Solutions America, Inc. (Powers, Molly) (Filed on 5/27/2014) [Transferred from cand on 4/20/2017.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
May 6, 2014 Filing 44 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING PRESERVATION OF APPELLATE RIGHTS AND INITIAL DISCLOSURES, MAIN DOCKET NO. 2564 filed by Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc.. (Wagner, Scott) (Filed on 5/6/2014) [Transferred from cand on 4/20/2017.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
April 25, 2014 Filing 43 ANSWER to #15 Amended Complaint byMitsubishi Digital Electronics America, Inc., Mitsubishi Electric & Electronics, USA, Inc., Mitsubishi Electric Corporation. (Truax, Terrence) (Filed on 4/25/2014) Modified on 4/28/2014 (aaaS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from cand on 4/20/2017.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
April 25, 2014 Filing 42 ANSWER to #15 Amended Complaint byMitsubishi Digital Electronics America, Inc., Mitsubishi Electric & Electronics, USA, Inc., Mitsubishi Electric Corporation. (Truax, Terrence) (Filed on 4/25/2014) Modified on 4/28/2014 (aaaS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from cand on 4/20/2017.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
April 25, 2014 Filing 41 ANSWER to #15 Amended Complaint byMitsubishi Digital Electronics America, Inc., Mitsubishi Electric & Electronics, USA, Inc., Mitsubishi Electric Corporation. (Truax, Terrence) (Filed on 4/25/2014) Modified on 4/28/2014 (aaaS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from cand on 4/20/2017.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
April 25, 2014 Filing 40 THOMSON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS, INC. ANSWER TO TECH DATAS FIRST #15 AMENDED COMPLAINT byTechnicolor SA. (Litsey, Calvin) (Filed on 4/25/2014) Modified on 4/28/2014 (aaaS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from cand on 4/20/2017.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
April 25, 2014 Filing 39 THOMSON SA ANSWER TO TECH DATAS #15 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT byTechnicolor SA. (Litsey, Calvin) (Filed on 4/25/2014) Modified on 4/28/2014 (aaaS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from cand on 4/20/2017.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
March 27, 2014 Filing 38 ANSWER to #15 Amended Complaint to Tech Data Corporation and Tech Data Product Management, Inc.'s First Amended Complaint bySamsung SDI (Malaysia) SDN BHD, Samsung SDI America Inc, Samsung SDI Brasil LTDA, Samsung SDI Co Ltd, Samsung SDI Mexico S.A. de C.V., Shenzhen Samsung SDI Co Ltd, Tianjin Samsung SDI Co Ltd. (Scarborough, Michael) (Filed on 3/27/2014) Modified on 3/28/2014 (aaaS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from cand on 4/20/2017.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
March 27, 2014 Filing 37 Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc. ANSWER to Amended Complaint re #15 of Tech Data Corporation and Tech Data Product Management, Inc. byToshiba America Information Systems, Inc.. (Lau, Lucius) (Filed on 3/27/2014) [Transferred from cand on 4/20/2017.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
March 27, 2014 Filing 36 Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc. ANSWER to Amended Complaint re #15 of Tech Data Corporation and Tech Data Product Management, Inc. byToshiba America Electronic Components, Inc.. (Lau, Lucius) (Filed on 3/27/2014) [Transferred from cand on 4/20/2017.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
March 27, 2014 Filing 35 Toshiba America Consumer Products, LLC ANSWER to Amended Complaint re #15 of Tech Data Corporation and Tech Data Product Management, Inc. byToshiba America Consumer Products LLC. (Lau, Lucius) (Filed on 3/27/2014) [Transferred from cand on 4/20/2017.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
March 27, 2014 Filing 34 Toshiba America, Inc. ANSWER to Amended Complaint re #15 of Tech Data Corporation and Tech Data Product Management, Inc. byToshiba America Inc. (Lau, Lucius) (Filed on 3/27/2014) [Transferred from cand on 4/20/2017.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
March 27, 2014 Filing 33 Toshiba Corporation ANSWER to Amended Complaint re #15 of Tech Data Corporation and Tech Data Product Management, Inc. byToshiba Corporation. (Lau, Lucius) (Filed on 3/27/2014) [Transferred from cand on 4/20/2017.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
March 27, 2014 Filing 32 Answer to Amended Complaint #15 Amended Complaint,,,,,, TO TECH DATA CORPORATION AND TECH DATA PRODUCT MANAGEMENT, INC.S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT byHitachi America Ltd, Hitachi Asia Ltd, Hitachi Displays, Ltd., Hitachi Electronic Devices (USA), Inc., Hitachi, Ltd.. (Adelson, Eliot) (Filed on 3/27/2014) [Transferred from cand on 4/20/2017.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
March 19, 2014 Filing 31 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc. STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Scheduling [Master Docket No. 2457] (Wagner, Scott) (Filed on 3/19/2014) [Transferred from cand on 4/20/2017.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
March 6, 2014 Filing 30 Declaration of Dana E. Foster in Support of #28 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Tech Data's Opposition to Thomson's Motion to Strike [Master Docket 2409] filed byToshiba America Consumer Products LLC, Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc., Toshiba America Inc, Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation. (Related document(s) #28 ) (Foster, Dana) (Filed on 3/6/2014) [Transferred from cand on 4/20/2017.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
February 28, 2014 Filing 29 ERRATA to the Declaration of Scott N. Wagner of Tech Data's Opposition to Thomson Defendants' Motion to Strike Tech Data's First Amended Complaint re [ #28 Part 5] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Tech Data's Opposition to Thomson's Motion to Strike [Master Docket 2409] Case 07-5944 SC by Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc. (Wagner, Scott) (Filed on 2/28/2014) Modified on 3/4/2014 (aaaS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from cand on 4/20/2017.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
February 28, 2014 Filing 28 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Tech Data's Opposition to Thomson's Motion to Strike [Master Docket 2409] filed by Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Tech Data's Opposition Redacted, #4 Tech Data's Opposition Unredacted, #5 Declaration, #6 Exhibit A, #7 Exhibit B, #8 Exhibit C, #9 Exhibit D-F, #10 Exhibit G Sealed, #11 Exhibit G Unredacted, #12 Exhibit H-I, #13 Exhibit J-Q Sealed, #14 Exhibit J-Q Unredacted, #15 Exhibit R, #16 Exhibit S-X Sealed, #17 Exhibit S-X Unredacted)(Wagner, Scott) (Filed on 2/28/2014) [Transferred from cand on 4/20/2017.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
February 13, 2014 Filing 27 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Amended Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding Briefing Schedule for Thompson Defendants' Motions to Strike with Prejudice Tech Data's First Amended Complaint (ECF 2387 In Lead Case No. 07-cv-5944 SC) filed by Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc.. (Wagner, Scott) (Filed on 2/13/2014) [Transferred from cand on 4/20/2017.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
February 11, 2014 Filing 26 Request for Judicial Notice PLAINTIFFS BEST BUY, TARGET, AND TECH DATA'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT BEIJING MATSUSHITA COLOR CRT CO., LTD.'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE (ECF 2376 In Lead Case No. 07-cv-5944 SC) filed byTech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc.. (Wagner, Scott) (Filed on 2/11/2014) [Transferred from cand on 4/20/2017.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
January 28, 2014 Filing 25 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Briefing Schedule for Thompson Consumer's Motion to Strike with Prejudice Tech Data's First Amended Complaint filed by Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc.. (Wagner, Scott) (Filed on 1/28/2014) [Transferred from cand on 4/20/2017.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
January 21, 2014 Filing 24 Declaration of Scott N. Wagner in Support of #23 Brief, filed byTech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Related document(s) #23 ) (Wagner, Scott) (Filed on 1/21/2014) [Transferred from cand on 4/20/2017.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
January 21, 2014 Filing 23 Brief re #18 Brief, Supplemental Brief in Further Opposition to Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss Certain Direct Action Plaintiffs' Claims (ECF 2348 In Lead Case No. 07-cv-5944 SC) filed byTech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc.. (Related document(s) #18 ) (Wagner, Scott) (Filed on 1/21/2014) [Transferred from cand on 4/20/2017.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
January 21, 2014 Filing 22 RESPONSE to Beijing Matsushita Color CRT Co., LTD.'s Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Certain Direct Action Purchaser Complaints [Master Docket 2118] by Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Vincent S. Loh, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit S, #21 Exhibit T, #22 Exhibit U, #23 Exhibit V, #24 Exhibit W, #25 Exhibit X, #26 Exhibit Y, #27 Exhibit Z, #28 Exhibit AA, #29 Exhibit BB, #30 Exhibit CC, #31 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Wagner, Scott) (Filed on 1/21/2014) [Transferred from cand on 4/20/2017.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
January 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER requesting Supplemental Briefing re: Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss Certain DAP Claims. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on January 8, 2014. (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2014) [Transferred from cand on 4/20/2017.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
November 6, 2013 Filing 20 Request for Judicial Notice re #18 Brief, Opposition to Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss Certain Direct Action Plaintiffs' Claims (ECF 2197 In Lead Case No. 07-cv-5944 SC filed byTech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc.. (Related document(s) #18 ) (Wagner, Scott) (Filed on 11/6/2013) [Transferred from cand on 4/20/2017.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
November 6, 2013 Filing 19 Declaration of Scott N. Wagner in Support of #18 Brief, filed byTech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10)(Related document(s) #18 ) (Wagner, Scott) (Filed on 11/6/2013) [Transferred from cand on 4/20/2017.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
November 6, 2013 Filing 18 Brief Opposition to Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss Certain Direct Action Plaintiffs' Claims (ECF 2197 In Lead Case No. 07-cv-5944 SC) filed byTech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc.. (Wagner, Scott) (Filed on 11/6/2013) [Transferred from cand on 4/20/2017.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
November 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER RE: DISCOVERY DISPUTES and APPOINTMENT OF A DISCOVERY MASTER. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on November 1, 2013. (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2013) [Transferred from cand on 4/20/2017.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
October 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION AND ORDER Dismissing Defendant LG Electronics Taiwan Taipei Co. LTD in case 3:07-cv-05944-SC. Associated cases C13-00157 SC; C13-01173 SC; C13-02171 SC. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 10/15/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2013) [Transferred from cand on 4/20/2017.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
September 9, 2013 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Beijing Matsushita Color CRT Co Ltd, Chunghwa Picture Tubes (Malaysia), Chunghwa Picture Tubes, LTD., Hitachi America Ltd, Hitachi Asia Ltd, Hitachi Displays, Ltd., Hitachi Electronic Devices (USA), Inc., Hitachi, Ltd., IRICO Display Devices Co Ltd, IRICO Group Electronics Co Ltd, Irico Group Corporation, Koninklijke Pilips Electronics N.V., LG ELECTRONICS INC, LG Electronics U.S.A. Inc., LG ElectronicsTaiwan Taipei Co., Ltd., LP Displays International Ltd, MT Picture Display Co Ltd, Panasonic Corporation, Panasonic Corporation of North America, Philips Electronics Industries (Taiwan) Ltd, Philips Electronics North America Corporation, Philips da Amazonia Industria Electronica Ltda, Samsung SDI (Malaysia) SDN BHD, Samsung SDI America Inc, Samsung SDI Brasil LTDA, Samsung SDI Co Ltd, Samsung SDI Mexico S.A. de C.V., Samtel Color Ltd, Shenzhen SEG Hitachi Color Display Devices Ltd, Shenzhen Samsung SDI Co Ltd, Thai CRT Co Ltd, Tianjin Samsung SDI Co Ltd, Toshiba America Consumer Products LLC, Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc., Toshiba America Inc, Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Thomson Consumer Electronics, Inc., Thomson SA, Technicolor SA, Technicolor USA, Inc., Mitsubishi Digital Electronics America, Inc., Mitsubishi Electric & Electronics, USA, Inc., Mitsubishi Electric Corporation. Filed byTech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons)(Wagner, Scott) (Filed on 9/9/2013) [Transferred from cand on 4/20/2017.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
September 6, 2013 Filing 14 STATUS REPORT DAP's Position Statement Regarding September 13, 2013 Status Conference by Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wagner, Scott) (Filed on 9/6/2013) [Transferred from cand on 4/20/2017.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
August 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER re (1841 in 3:07-cv-05944-SC) Tech Data Corporation's Notice of Unavailability for Status Conference. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on August 13, 2013. (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2013) [Transferred from cand on 4/20/2017.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
August 12, 2013 Filing 12 NOTICE by Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc. Unavailability for Status Conference (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wagner, Scott) (Filed on 8/12/2013) [Transferred from cand on 4/20/2017.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
July 30, 2013 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Eliot A. Adelson Hitachi, LTD., Hitachi Asia, LTD., Hitachi America, LTD., Hitachi Electronic Devices (USA), Inc. and Hitachi Displays, LTD. (n/k/a Japan Display Inc.) Notice of Appearance of Additional Counsel (Adelson, Eliot) (Filed on 7/30/2013) [Transferred from cand on 4/20/2017.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
February 13, 2013 Filing 10 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding the Complaint filed by Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc.. (Wagner, Scott) (Filed on 2/13/2013) [Transferred from cand on 4/20/2017.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
January 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 1. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 4/4/08. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2013) [Transferred from cand on 4/20/2017.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
January 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL MASTER. Charles A. Legge appointed.. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 6/16/08. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2013) [Transferred from cand on 4/20/2017.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
January 15, 2013 Filing 7 CLERKS NOTICE: Informing Parties that this case is now with the United States District Court for the Northern District of California. Re #6 Transfer Order (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2013) [Transferred from cand on 4/20/2017.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
January 11, 2013 Filing 6 Case transferred in from District of Florida Middle; Case Number 8:12-cv-02795. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/15/2013: #2 Initial Transferred Documents) (aaa, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from cand on 4/20/2017.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
January 7, 2013 Filing 5 MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION panel order transferring case to: Northern District of California MDL case number: 1917 (AG) [Transferred from cand on 4/20/2017.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
December 21, 2012 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc.. (Turken, Robert) [Transferred from cand on 4/20/2017.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
December 13, 2012 Filing 3 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 3 issued by Deputy Clerk on 12/13/2012. (SMB) [Transferred from cand on 4/20/2017.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
December 12, 2012 Filing 2 Summons issued as to All Defendants. (CD) [Transferred from cand on 4/20/2017.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]
December 11, 2012 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 350 receipt number TPA14773) filed by Tech Data Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(CD) [Transferred from cand on 4/20/2017.] [Transferred from Florida Middle on 11/27/2017.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tech Data Corporation et al v. Hitachi, Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Irico Group Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung SDI Co., LTD.
Represented By: Michael S. Feldberg
Represented By: Bradley S. Pensyl
Represented By: Michael W. Scarborough
Represented By: John Roberti
Represented By: Leo David Caseria
Represented By: Jacob Pultman
Represented By: Helen Cho Eckert
Represented By: James Landon McGinnis
Represented By: Daniel Rashbaum
Represented By: Bradley Stephen Pensyl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shenzhen Seg Hitachi Color Display Devices, LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Electronics America Inc.
Represented By: Bradley S. Pensyl
Represented By: Jacob Pultman
Represented By: Daniel Rashbaum
Represented By: Bradley Stephen Pensyl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toshiba America Inc.
Represented By: Lucius Bernard Lau
Represented By: James Nial Robinson, II
Represented By: Christopher M. Curran
Represented By: Dana E. Foster
Represented By: Christopher Mark Curran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomson Consumer Electronics, Inc.
Represented By: Scott Konopka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Panasonic Corporation of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitsubishi Digital Electronics America, Inc.
Represented By: Michael T. Brody
Represented By: Shaun M. Van Horn
Represented By: Terrence Joseph Truax
Represented By: Gabriel A. Fuentes
Represented By: Molly McGrail Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shenzhen Samsung SDI Co. LTD.
Represented By: Michael S. Feldberg
Represented By: Bradley S. Pensyl
Represented By: Michael W. Scarborough
Represented By: John Roberti
Represented By: Leo David Caseria
Represented By: Jacob Pultman
Represented By: Helen Cho Eckert
Represented By: James Landon McGinnis
Represented By: Daniel Rashbaum
Represented By: Bradley Stephen Pensyl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitsubishi Electric & Electronics USA, Inc.
Represented By: Michael T. Brody
Represented By: Brent Caslin
Represented By: Shaun M. Van Horn
Represented By: Terrence Joseph Truax
Represented By: Gabriel A. Fuentes
Represented By: Molly McGrail Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Koninklijke Pilips Electronics N.V.
Represented By: Darryl M. Bloodworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc.
Represented By: Lucius Bernard Lau
Represented By: James Nial Robinson, II
Represented By: Christopher M. Curran
Represented By: Dana E. Foster
Represented By: Christopher Mark Curran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toshiba Corporation
Represented By: Lucius Bernard Lau
Represented By: James Nial Robinson, II
Represented By: Christopher M. Curran
Represented By: Dana E. Foster
Represented By: Christopher Mark Curran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tianjin Samsung SDI Co., LTD.
Represented By: Michael S. Feldberg
Represented By: Bradley S. Pensyl
Represented By: Michael W. Scarborough
Represented By: John Roberti
Represented By: Leo David Caseria
Represented By: Jacob Pultman
Represented By: Helen Cho Eckert
Represented By: James Landon McGinnis
Represented By: Daniel Rashbaum
Represented By: Bradley Stephen Pensyl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thai Crt Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chunghwa Picture Tubes (Malaysia)
Represented By: Rachel S. Brass
Represented By: Joel S. Sanders
Represented By: Austin Van Schwing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Panasonic Corporation
Represented By: Pravin Rajesh Patel
Represented By: Edward Soto
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Kessler
Represented By: Adam C. Hemlock
Represented By: David E. Yolkut
Represented By: David L. Yohai
Represented By: Kajetan Rozga
Represented By: Molly M. Donovan
Represented By: David Yohai
Represented By: Sofia Roa Arguello
Represented By: Kevin Benjamin Goldstein
Represented By: Jennifer Maryon Stewart
Represented By: David Efrem Yolkut
Represented By: Eva W. Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philips Da Amazonia Industria Electronica LTDA.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Electronics Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hitachi Electronic Devices (USA) Inc.
Represented By: James Maxwell Cooper
Represented By: Eliot A. Adelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Irico Display Devices Co., LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chunghwa Picture Tubes, LTD
Represented By: Rachel S. Brass
Represented By: Joel S. Sanders
Represented By: Austin Van Schwing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Technicolor SA
Represented By: Scott Konopka
Represented By: Kathy Lynn Osborn
Represented By: Calvin Lee Litsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomson SA
Represented By: Scott Konopka
Represented By: Calvin Lee Litsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hitachi America, Ltd.
Represented By: James Maxwell Cooper
Represented By: Eliot A. Adelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hitachi Ltd.
Represented By: James Maxwell Cooper
Represented By: Eliot A. Adelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd.
Represented By: Bradley S. Pensyl
Represented By: Jacob Pultman
Represented By: Daniel Rashbaum
Represented By: Bradley Stephen Pensyl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toshiba America Consumer Products, L.L.C.
Represented By: Lucius Bernard Lau
Represented By: James Nial Robinson, II
Represented By: Christopher M. Curran
Represented By: Dana E. Foster
Represented By: Christopher Mark Curran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samtel Color, LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Irico Group Electronics Co., LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philips Electronics Industries (Taiwan), LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG ElectronicsTaiwan Taipei Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung SDI (Malaysia) SDN BHD
Represented By: Michael S. Feldberg
Represented By: Bradley S. Pensyl
Represented By: Michael W. Scarborough
Represented By: John Roberti
Represented By: Leo David Caseria
Represented By: Jacob Pultman
Represented By: Helen Cho Eckert
Represented By: James Landon McGinnis
Represented By: Daniel Rashbaum
Represented By: Bradley Stephen Pensyl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung SDI America, Inc.
Represented By: Michael S. Feldberg
Represented By: Bradley S. Pensyl
Represented By: Michael W. Scarborough
Represented By: John Roberti
Represented By: Leo David Caseria
Represented By: Jacob Pultman
Represented By: Helen Cho Eckert
Represented By: James Landon McGinnis
Represented By: Daniel Rashbaum
Represented By: Bradley Stephen Pensyl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tatung Company of America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beijing Matsushita Color CRT Co Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hitachi Displays, LTD
Represented By: James Maxwell Cooper
Represented By: Eliot A. Adelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung SDI Mexico S.A. DE C.V.
Represented By: Michael S. Feldberg
Represented By: Bradley S. Pensyl
Represented By: Michael W. Scarborough
Represented By: John Roberti
Represented By: Leo David Caseria
Represented By: Jacob Pultman
Represented By: Helen Cho Eckert
Represented By: James Landon McGinnis
Represented By: Daniel Rashbaum
Represented By: Bradley Stephen Pensyl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LP Displays International, LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Technicolor USA, Inc.
Represented By: Scott Konopka
Represented By: Kathy Lynn Osborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toshiba America Information Systems Inc.
Represented By: Lucius Bernard Lau
Represented By: James Nial Robinson, II
Represented By: Christopher M. Curran
Represented By: Dana E. Foster
Represented By: Christopher Mark Curran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MT Picture Display Co Ltd
Represented By: Pravin Rajesh Patel
Represented By: Edward Soto
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Kessler
Represented By: Adam C. Hemlock
Represented By: David E. Yolkut
Represented By: David L. Yohai
Represented By: Kajetan Rozga
Represented By: Molly M. Donovan
Represented By: David Yohai
Represented By: Sofia Roa Arguello
Represented By: Kevin Benjamin Goldstein
Represented By: Jennifer Maryon Stewart
Represented By: David Efrem Yolkut
Represented By: Eva W. Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung SDI Brasil LTDA
Represented By: Michael S. Feldberg
Represented By: Bradley S. Pensyl
Represented By: Michael W. Scarborough
Represented By: John Roberti
Represented By: Leo David Caseria
Represented By: Jacob Pultman
Represented By: Helen Cho Eckert
Represented By: James Landon McGinnis
Represented By: Daniel Rashbaum
Represented By: Bradley Stephen Pensyl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hitachi Asia, LTD.
Represented By: Eliot A. Adelson
Represented By: James Maxwell Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitsubishi Electric Corporation
Represented By: Michael T. Brody
Represented By: Brent Caslin
Represented By: Shaun M. Van Horn
Represented By: Terrence Joseph Truax
Represented By: Gabriel A. Fuentes
Represented By: Molly McGrail Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philips Electronics North America Corporation
Represented By: Darryl M. Bloodworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Breivik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmy Jahar Thule
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramzi Yusef
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Wirth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tech Data Product Management, Inc.
Represented By: Scott N. Wagner
Represented By: Robert William Turken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Donnelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tech Data Corporation
Represented By: Stuart Harold Singer
Represented By: William A. Isaacson
Represented By: Scott N. Wagner
Represented By: Philip J. Iovieno
Represented By: Robert William Turken
Represented By: Mitchell Edward Widom
Represented By: Melissa Willett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special master: Honorable Charles A. Legge
Represented By: Charles A. Legge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?