Commodity Futures Trading Commission v. McDonnell et al
Plaintiff: Commodity Futures Trading Commission
Defendant: CabbageTech, Corp. and Patrick K. McDonnell
Case Number: 1:2018cv00361
Filed: January 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Office: Brooklyn Office
Presiding Judge: Roanne L. Mann
Presiding Judge: Jack B. Weinstein
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 28:1345 USA Plaintiff
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 174 AMENDED MEMORANDUM, FINDINGS OF FACT, CONCLUSIONS OF LAW, AND DIRECTIONS FOR FINAL JUDGMENT AND INJUNCTION. Ordered by Judge Jack B. Weinstein on 8/28/2018. (Barrett, C)
July 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER re: Defendant's 99 Motion for Reconsideration. Upon reconsideration, defendant's motion to dismiss is denied. So Ordered by Judge Jack B. Weinstein on 7/12/2018. (Lee, Tiffeny)
May 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER re 95 Letter filed by Commodity Futures Trading Commission. Having considered the parties' positions, this Court denies the CFTC's request, without prejudice. However, Mr. McDonnell is advised that the CFTC has been generous i n accommodating his frequent requests and that he must recognize that its counsel have other cases and obligations, and may not be able to file his submissions as quickly as he would like. Mr. McDonnell is warned that if he continues to burden the C FTC unnecessarily by requesting the filing of duplicative submissions and/or otherwise abuses the privilege that the CFTC consented to extend to him, the Court will not hesitate to allow the CFTC to withdraw its consent. Ordered by Chief Mag. Judge Roanne L. Mann on 5/25/2018. (Proujansky, Josh)
April 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER re 57 , 58 Letters filed on behalf of defendant McDonnell. The Court adheres to and reiterates its April 17th electronic order directing defendant McDonnell to execute the revised authorizations. Further, McDonnell's request to subpoena records is denied. See attached for discussion. Ordered by Chief Mag. Judge Roanne L. Mann on 4/18/2018. (Proujansky, Josh)
March 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MEMORANDUM & ORDER granting a preliminary injunction in favor of CFTC and denying 18 the individual defendant's pro se motion to "Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction." Ordered by Judge Jack B. Weinstein on 3/6/2018. (Barrett, C)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Commodity Futures Trading Commission v. McDonnell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CabbageTech, Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick K. McDonnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Commodity Futures Trading Commission
Represented By: Gates Salyers Hurand
Represented By: David William Oakland
Represented By: Kenneth B. Tomer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?