Leckie v. Department of Corrections et al

Plaintiff: Naquan M. Leckie
Defendant: Correction Officer Ling, Department of Corrections and Captain Jones
Interested Party: Corporation Counsel of the City of New York
Case Number: 1:2018cv03917
Filed: July 9, 2018
Court: New York Eastern District Court
Office: Brooklyn Office
0 Judge: Lois Bloom
1 Judge: Roslynn R Mauskopf
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
July 9, 2018 5 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 9, 2018 4 Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:18-cv-05766. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
July 2, 2018 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of Eastern District of New York (anc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/9/2018.]
July 2, 2018 Mailed a copy of #3 Order to Naquan M. Leckie 02587424Q Brooklyn Detention Center 275 Atlantic Avenue Brooklyn, NY 11201. (mhe) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/9/2018.]
July 2, 2018 Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk. Transmitted re: #3 Order, to the Docket Assistant Clerk for case processing. (mro) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/9/2018.]
July 2, 2018 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Colleen McMahon. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (mro) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/9/2018.]
July 2, 2018 3 Featured Case TRANSFER ORDER: The Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to my docket, mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff, and note service on the docket. The Clerk of Court is further directed to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of New York. Whether Plaintiff should be permitted to proceed further without prepayment of fees is a determination to be made by the transferee court. A summons shall not issue from this Court. This order closes this case. The Court certifies, under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 7/2/2018) (mro) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/9/2018.]
June 26, 2018 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis SEE ENTRY #1 by Naquan M. Leckie. (Bowens, Priscilla)
June 26, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (rdz) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/9/2018.]
June 26, 2018 2 COMPLAINT against Captain Jones, Department of Corrections, Ling. Document filed by Naquan M. Leckie.(rdz) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/9/2018.]
June 26, 2018 1 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Naquan M. Leckie.(rdz) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/9/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leckie v. Department of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correction Officer Ling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Naquan M. Leckie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Corporation Counsel of the City of New York
Represented By: Rruhija Matai-Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?