Fischler v. Greystar Real Estate Partners, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Brian Fischler
Defendant: Greystar Real Estate Partners, LLC and Greystar Management Services, L.P.
Case Number: 1:2018cv04049
Filed: July 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Office: Brooklyn Office
Presiding Judge: Nicholas G Garaufis
Referring Judge: Vera M Scanlon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: An in person Status Conference is set for 11/1/2018 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 13A South before Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. Plaintiff to serve a copy of this Order and file proof of service by 9/17/2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 8/20/2018. (Quinlan, Krista)
July 25, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Greystar Real Estate Partners, LLC. (Lee, Tiffeny)
July 20, 2018 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Brian Fischler (Lipsky, Douglas)
July 16, 2018 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Williams, Erica)
July 16, 2018 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Williams, Erica)
July 13, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Greystar Management Services, L.P. (Williams, Erica)
July 13, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis and Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Williams, Erica)
July 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Greystar Management Services, L.P., Greystar Real Estate Partners, LLC filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-10583856 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Brian Fischler. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Lipsky, Douglas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fischler v. Greystar Real Estate Partners, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Fischler
Represented By: Douglas Brian Lipsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greystar Real Estate Partners, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greystar Management Services, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?