Millennium Sports Management Company LLC v. LW Retail Associates LLC

Plaintiff: Millennium Sports Management Company LLC
Defendant: LW Retail Associates LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv04251
Filed: July 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Office: Brooklyn Office
Presiding Judge: Brian M Cogan
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawl
Cause of Action: 28:1334
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2018 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of Eastern District of New York (jwh) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/27/2018.]
July 18, 2018 Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk. Transmitted re: #5 Order to the Docket Assistant Clerk for case processing. (ft) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/27/2018.]
July 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Defendant removed this case to federal court on July 16, 2018; the Notice of Removal states that after removing the case, Defendant will promptly seek to transfer venue of this action pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404, to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of New York, where Defendant has pending Chapter 11 bankruptcy proceedings. (Dkt. #1). On July 17, 2018, Defendant submitted a letter to the Court (erroneously addressed to the Magistrate Judge assigned to this matter), requesting an order transferring this case to the Eastern District, where Defendant intends to seek an order of reference to the Bankruptcy Court. (Dkt. #4). Good cause appearing, Defendants request is GRANTED. This case is hereby TRANSFERRED to the Eastern District of New York. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 7/18/2018) (ft) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/27/2018.]
July 17, 2018 Filing 4 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker from Julie Cvek Curley, Esq. dated July 17, 2018 re: Transfer to EDNY Bankruptcy Court. Document filed by LW Retail Associates LLC.(Cvek, Julie) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/27/2018.]
July 17, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Julie Anna Cvek to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason: the civil cover sheet was not signed. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (pne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/27/2018.]
July 17, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Julie Anna Cvek. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York; Fee Status code due (due). The following corrections have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to Westchester; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (pne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/27/2018.]
July 17, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (pne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/27/2018.]
July 17, 2018 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/27/2018.]
July 17, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/27/2018.]
July 16, 2018 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by LW Retail Associates LLC.(Cvek, Julie) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/27/2018.]
July 16, 2018 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - SIGNATURE ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Cvek, Julie) Modified on 7/17/2018 (pne). [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/27/2018.]
July 16, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 155153/2018. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-15325715).Document filed by LW Retail Associates LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint)(Cvek, Julie) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/27/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Millennium Sports Management Company LLC v. LW Retail Associates LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Millennium Sports Management Company LLC
Represented By: Joseph Shalom Goldsmith
Represented By: Ranakdevi Chudasama Londoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LW Retail Associates LLC
Represented By: Julie Anna Cvek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?