Thomas v. The New York City Department of Education et al
Plaintiff: Sandhya Thomas
Defendant: The New York City Department of Education, Kayode Ayetiwa and Ghandi Moussa
Case Number: 1:2018cv04459
Filed: August 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Office: Brooklyn Office
Presiding Judge: Sanket J Bulsara
Referring Judge: Jack B Weinstein
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights (Employment Discrimination)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER: The motion for an extension of time to answer #9 is granted. Defendants have until November 5, 2018 to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. The motion with respect to adjourning the initial conference is denied. The initial conference for October 19, 2018 will proceed as scheduled. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 8/30/2018. (Zhang, Fan)
August 29, 2018 Filing 9 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, #7 Scheduling Order,, by The New York City Department of Education. (Sisnett, Alana)
August 29, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Alana Danielle Sisnett on behalf of The New York City Department of Education (aty to be noticed) (Sisnett, Alana)
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: An in person initial conference will be held on 10/19/2018 at 2:00 P.M. in Courtroom 324N before Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. All counsel must attend. Plaintiff is directed to notify Defendant of this scheduling order at the time Defendant makes an appearance with in this matter. Counsel are also directed to complete the attached Discovery Plan Worksheet and electronically file same with the Court no later than two days before 10/19/2018. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 8/15/2018. (Manson, Eddie)
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 COURT ORDER ON CASE FILING. Magistrate Judge Bulsara is directed to treat this case under Local Rule 72.2 and is respectfully requested to expedite. Respectfully referred to the Magistrate Judge for discovery, settlement. Ordered by Judge Jack B. Weinstein on 8/10/2018. (Barrett, C)
August 8, 2018 Filing 5 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Williams, Erica)
August 8, 2018 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Williams, Erica)
August 7, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to The New York City Department of Education. (Williams, Erica)
August 7, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Jack B. Weinstein and Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Williams, Erica)
August 7, 2018 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. by Sandhya Thomas (Ricotta, Thomas)
August 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kayode Ayetiwa, Ghandi Moussa, The New York City Department of Education filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-10640255 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Sandhya Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Ricotta, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. The New York City Department of Education et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The New York City Department of Education
Represented By: Alana Danielle Sisnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kayode Ayetiwa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ghandi Moussa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandhya Thomas
Represented By: Thomas Ricotta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?