Williams v. Waypoint Resource Group, LLC
Plaintiff: Shana Williams
Defendant: Waypoint Resource Group, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv04921
Filed: August 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Robert M Levy
Referring Judge: Allyne R Ross
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shana Williams. Waypoint Resource Group, LLC served on 9/6/2018, answer due 10/29/2018. (Sanders, Craig)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Conference set for 12/7/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11B South before Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 9/25/2018. (Marino, Janine)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Waypoint Resource Group, LLC: answer due on 10/29/2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 9/25/2018. (Marino, Janine)
September 24, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Joshua Horowitz on behalf of Waypoint Resource Group, LLC (aty to be noticed) (Horowitz, Adam)
September 24, 2018 Filing 7 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Waypoint Resource Group, LLC. (Labbate, Kenneth)
September 24, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth M. Labbate on behalf of Waypoint Resource Group, LLC (aty to be noticed) (Labbate, Kenneth)
September 18, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by David M. Barshay on behalf of Shana Williams (aty to be noticed) (Barshay, David)
August 30, 2018 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Williams, Erica)
August 30, 2018 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Williams, Erica)
August 29, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Waypoint Resource Group, LLC. (Williams, Erica)
August 29, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Allyne R. Ross and Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Williams, Erica)
August 29, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Waypoint Resource Group, LLC filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-10692022 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Shana Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Sanders, Craig)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Waypoint Resource Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waypoint Resource Group, LLC
Represented By: Kenneth M. Labbate
Represented By: Adam Joshua Horowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shana Williams
Represented By: Craig B. Sanders
Represented By: David M. Barshay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?