J&J Sports Productions Inc v. Toussaint et al
Plaintiff: J&J Sports Productions Inc and J&J Sports Productions, Inc
Defendant: Charl-Ena Chateau, Inc., Anthony Toussaint and Ann Mary Toussaint
Case Number: 1:2018cv05092
Filed: September 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Nicholas G Garaufis
Referring Judge: Peggy Kuo
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 47:605
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2018 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by J&J Sports Productions, Inc. Anthony Toussaint served on 9/25/2018, answer due 10/16/2018. (Hunter, Robert)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #11 Motion to Adjourn Conference. The Initial Conference set for November 14, 2018 is rescheduled to December 4, 2018 at 11:30 a.m. in Courtroom 11C South before Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo. The parties are reminded to file the Proposed Discovery Plan, referenced at #10 , at least five days before the conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 10/25/2018. (Besingi, Pembe)
October 24, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Charl-Ena Chateau, Inc., Ann Mary Toussaint, Anthony Toussaint. (Wengrovsky, Todd)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: An Initial Conference will be held in this case on November 14, 2018 at 12:00 p.m. before Peggy Kuo, United States Magistrate Judge, in Courtroom 11C South of the United States Courthouse, 225 Cadman Plaza East, Brooklyn, New York. All counsel are required to attend. Counsel are directed to the annexed Initial Conference Order for instructions. At least five days before the Conference, the parties must file a completed copy of the Proposed Discovery Plan, a PDF version of which may be found at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/pub/PK-discovplan.pdf. Any request for adjournment of this or any other conference must be made in writing on notice to opposing parties, and must disclose whether or not all parties consent. No request for adjournment will be considered unless made at least two (2) business days before the scheduled conference, except in the event of an emergency. Counsel with knowledge and authority must be present. Per diem counsel may not appear without prior permission of the Court. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 10/18/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Discovery Plan) (Riquelme, Claudia)
October 18, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by J&J Sports Productions, Inc. Charl-Ena Chateau, Inc. served on 9/24/2018, answer due 10/15/2018. (Loughlin, Joseph)
October 16, 2018 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by All Defendants. (Wengrovsky, Todd)
October 15, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by J&J Sports Productions, Inc. J&J Sports Productions, Inc served on 9/25/2018, answer due 10/16/2018. (Loughlin, Joseph)
October 15, 2018 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Charl-Ena Chateau, Inc., Ann Mary Toussaint, Anthony Toussaint (Wengrovsky, Todd)
September 27, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Todd Wengrovsky on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Wengrovsky, Todd)
September 10, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Charl-Ena Chateau, Inc., Ann Mary Toussaint, Anthony Toussaint. (Attachments: #1 Summon, #2 Summon) (Davis, Kimberly)
September 10, 2018 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
September 10, 2018 Filing 2 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
September 10, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis and Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
September 10, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Charl-Ena Chateau, Inc., Ann Mary Toussaint, Anthony Toussaint filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-10714273 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by J&J Sports Productions Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons) (Loughlin, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J&J Sports Productions Inc v. Toussaint et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J&J Sports Productions Inc
Represented By: Joseph P. Loughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J&J Sports Productions, Inc
Represented By: Joseph P. Loughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charl-Ena Chateau, Inc.
Represented By: Todd Wengrovsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Toussaint
Represented By: Todd Wengrovsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ann Mary Toussaint
Represented By: Todd Wengrovsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?