J&J Sports Productions Inc v. Europe et al
Plaintiff: J&J Sports Productions Inc and J&J Sports Productions, Inc
Defendant: Wilfred Europe, Juliet Europe, Brooklyn Exposure Incorporated and Jacqueline Europe
Case Number: 1:2018cv05094
Filed: September 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Margo K Brodie
Referring Judge: Cheryl L Pollak
2 Judge: Jack B Weinstein
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 47:605
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2018 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by J&J Sports Productions, Inc. Brooklyn Exposure Incorporated served on 10/4/2018, answer due 10/25/2018. (Hunter, Robert)
November 5, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by J&J Sports Productions, Inc. Wilfred Europe served on 10/16/2018, answer due 11/6/2018. (Hunter, Robert)
November 5, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by J&J Sports Productions, Inc. Juliet Europe served on 10/16/2018, answer due 11/6/2018. (Hunter, Robert)
October 17, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by J&J Sports Productions, Inc. Jacqueline Europe served on 10/2/2018, answer due 10/23/2018. (Loughlin, Joseph)
September 25, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Brooklyn Exposure Incorporated. (Lee, Tiffeny)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Jack B. Weinstein recused. Case reassigned to Judge Margo K. Brodie for all further proceedings Type of Recusal case type. Ordered by Judge Jack B. Weinstein on 9/24/2018. (Bowens, Priscilla)
September 13, 2018 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by J&J Sports Productions, Inc (Loughlin, Joseph)
September 10, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Jacqueline Europe, Juliet Europe, Wilfred Europe. (Attachments: #1 Summon, #2 Summon) (Davis, Kimberly)
September 10, 2018 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
September 10, 2018 Filing 2 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
September 10, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Jack B. Weinstein and Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
September 10, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Brooklyn Exposure Incorporated, Jacqueline Europe, Juliet Europe, Wilfred Europe filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-10714415 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by J&J Sports Productions Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons) (Loughlin, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J&J Sports Productions Inc v. Europe et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J&J Sports Productions Inc
Represented By: Joseph P. Loughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J&J Sports Productions, Inc
Represented By: Joseph P. Loughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilfred Europe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juliet Europe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brooklyn Exposure Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacqueline Europe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?