J&J Sports Productions Inc. v. Long et al
Plaintiff: J&J Sports Productions Inc.
Defendant: International Mix Artist Group Entity, LLC and Carlos Long
Case Number: 1:2018cv05117
Filed: September 11, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: William F Kuntz
Referring Judge: Cheryl L Pollak
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 47:605
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC STATUS REPORT ORDER: The parties are directed to provide a status letter to this Court within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. Status Report due by 11/26/2018. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 10/26/2018. (Caggiano, Diana)
October 18, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by J&J Sports Productions Inc.. International Mix Artist Group Entity, LLC served on 9/24/2018, answer due 10/15/2018. (Loughlin, Joseph)
September 12, 2018 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Williams, Erica)
September 12, 2018 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Williams, Erica)
September 11, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to International Mix Artist Group Entity, LLC, Carlos Long. (Attachments: #1 Summons2) (Williams, Erica)
September 11, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge William F. Kuntz, II and Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Williams, Erica)
September 11, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against International Mix Artist Group Entity, LLC, Carlos Long filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-10718123 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -yes,, filed by J&J Sports Productions Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons) (Loughlin, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J&J Sports Productions Inc. v. Long et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Mix Artist Group Entity, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlos Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J&J Sports Productions Inc.
Represented By: Joseph P. Loughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?