Abbas v. Hestia Tobacco, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Randy Abbas
Defendant: Hestia Tobacco, LLC and David Sley
Case Number: 1:2018cv05151
Filed: September 12, 2018
Court: New York Eastern District Court
0 Judge: Ramon E Reyes
1 Judge: Eric N Vitaliano
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 2, 2018 Featured Case ORDER denying #9 Motion for Pre-Motion Conference. Plaintiff seeks to amend the complaint to address several of the arguments raised in defendants' pre-motion conference letter. The parties are directed to confer regarding whether defendants consent to such amendment and file a joint status report by November 16, 2018. If defendants consent to amendment, the status report should propose a deadline for plaintiff to file the amended complaint as well as briefing deadlines for the motion to dismiss on the remaining grounds raised by defendants' pre-motion letter. Ordered by Judge Eric N. Vitaliano on 11/2/2018. (Syed, Sofie)
November 1, 2018 11 Letter Reply to pre-motion conference letter by Randy Abbas (Cohen, Richard)
October 25, 2018 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard B. Cohen on behalf of Randy Abbas (aty to be noticed) (Cohen, Richard)
October 25, 2018 9 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference to Judge Vitaliano from Kimberly A. Haviv, dated October 25, 2018 by Hestia Tobacco, LLC, David Sley. (Haviv, Kimberly)
October 15, 2018 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Randy Abbas. All Defendants. (Bost Seaton, Christina)
October 6, 2018 Featured Case ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants Hestia Tobacco, LLC and David Sley answers are due 10/25/2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 10/6/2018. (Vertus, Miriam)
October 5, 2018 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, / Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Hestia Tobacco, LLC, David Sley. (Haviv, Kimberly)
October 5, 2018 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly Anne Haviv on behalf of Hestia Tobacco, LLC, David Sley (aty to be noticed) (Haviv, Kimberly)
September 13, 2018 5 Summons Issued as to Hestia Tobacco, LLC, David Sley. (Attachments: #1 Summon) (Davis, Kimberly)
September 13, 2018 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
September 13, 2018 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
September 13, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Eric N. Vitaliano and Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
September 13, 2018 2 Proposed Summons.Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint, by Randy Abbas (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons) (Bost Seaton, Christina)
September 12, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-10723360 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Randy Abbas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit) (Bost Seaton, Christina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abbas v. Hestia Tobacco, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hestia Tobacco, LLC
Represented By: Kimberly Anne Haviv
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Sley
Represented By: Kimberly Anne Haviv
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy Abbas
Represented By: Christina Heather Bost Seaton
Represented By: Richard B. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?